Diversified Maintenance-RWS, LLC v. LS1, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Diversified Maintenance-RWS, LLC
Defendant: Rhonda Siegel, Anthony Lepore and LS1, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01747
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: Delaware District Court
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim // Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) or, in the Alternative, Motion to Stay Proceeding Pursuant to to 9 U.S.C. 3 filed by Diversified Maintenance-RWS, LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/4/2019. (Sierra, Jose)
December 28, 2018 15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction And For Expedited Discovery and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof - filed by Diversified Maintenance-RWS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sierra, Jose)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #14 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to RESPOND to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss to December 28, 2018 filed by Diversified Maintenance-RWS, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/21/18. (ntl)
December 21, 2018 14 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to RESPOND to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss to December 28, 2018 - filed by Diversified Maintenance-RWS, LLC. (Sierra, Jose)
December 11, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney James T. Smith for LS1, LLC, Anthony Lepore, Rhonda Siegel added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
December 10, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney William R. Cruse for LS1, LLC, Anthony Lepore, Rhonda Siegel added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James T. Smith and William R. Cruse filed by Rhonda Siegel, Anthony Lepore, LS1, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/10/18. (ntl)
December 7, 2018 13 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim // Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) or, in the Alternative, Motion to Stay Proceeding Pursuant to to 9 U.S.C. 3 filed by LS1, LLC, Anthony Lepore, Rhonda Siegel.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/21/2018. (Orlacchio, Adam)
December 7, 2018 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim // Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) or, in the Alternative, Motion to Stay Proceeding Pursuant to to 9 U.S.C. 3 - filed by LS1, LLC, Anthony Lepore, Rhonda Siegel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orlacchio, Adam)
December 7, 2018 11 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent RW, Inc. for LS1, LLC filed by LS1, LLC. (Orlacchio, Adam)
December 7, 2018 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James T. Smith and William R. Cruse - filed by LS1, LLC, Anthony Lepore, Rhonda Siegel. (Orlacchio, Adam)
December 7, 2018 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig N. Haring on behalf of LS1, LLC, Anthony Lepore, Rhonda Siegel (Haring, Craig)
December 7, 2018 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam V. Orlacchio on behalf of LS1, LLC, Anthony Lepore, Rhonda Siegel (Orlacchio, Adam)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Grant E. Schnell filed by Diversified Maintenance-RWS, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/3/18. (ntl)
November 30, 2018 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Grant E. Schnell - filed by Diversified Maintenance-RWS, LLC. (Sierra, Jose)
November 21, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 4 Subpoena Returned Executed removed from the docket per filing party's request. (ceg)
November 21, 2018 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Diversified Maintenance-RWS, LLC. Rhonda Siegel served on 11/16/2018, answer due 12/7/2018. (Sierra, Jose)
November 21, 2018 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Diversified Maintenance-RWS, LLC. LS1, LLC served on 11/16/2018, answer due 12/7/2018. (Sierra, Jose)
November 14, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 7, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to LS1, LLC on 11/7/2018; Anthony Lepore on 11/7/2018; Rhonda Siegel on 11/7/2018. Summons mailed per Counsel's request. (crb)
November 6, 2018 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent DMS Management, LLC, Corporate Parent DMS Parent, LLC for Diversified Maintenance-RWS, LLC filed by Diversified Maintenance-RWS, LLC. (crb)
November 6, 2018 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (crb)
November 6, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against LS1, LLC, Anthony Lepore, Rhonda Siegel - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2498285.) - filed by Diversified Maintenance-RWS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(crb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diversified Maintenance-RWS, LLC v. LS1, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda Siegel
Represented By: William R. Cruse
Represented By: Craig N. Haring
Represented By: James T. Smith
Represented By: Adam V. Orlacchio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Lepore
Represented By: William R. Cruse
Represented By: Craig N. Haring
Represented By: James T. Smith
Represented By: Adam V. Orlacchio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LS1, LLC
Represented By: William R. Cruse
Represented By: Craig N. Haring
Represented By: James T. Smith
Represented By: Adam V. Orlacchio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diversified Maintenance-RWS, LLC
Represented By: Jose P. Sierra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?