MRPC Christiana LLC et al v. Crown Bank

Plaintiff: Paresh Patel, Ganesa, LLC, Chirag Patel, BWI MRPC Hotels, LLC, Krishnas, LLC, MRPC Christiana LLC, Paresh Patel and Ranjan Patel Irrevocable Trust and Ranjan Patel
Defendant: Crown Bank
Case Number: 1:2018cv01755
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY BRIEF re #4 Motion for Permissive Abstention, Or, In the Alternative, For Remand filed by BWI MRPC Hotels, LLC, Ganesa, LLC, Krishnas, LLC, Paresh Patel and Ranjan Patel Irrevocable Trust, Chirag Patel, Paresh Patel, Ranjan Patel. (Anthony, David)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 STIPULATION to Extend Time (*Reset Briefing Schedule: re #4 Motion for Permissive Abstention, Or, In the Alternative, For Remand. Reply Brief due 1/2/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/2/2019. (nms)
December 26, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Extend Time - filed by BWI MRPC Hotels, LLC, Ganesa, LLC, Krishnas, LLC, Paresh Patel and Ranjan Patel Irrevocable Trust, Chirag Patel, Paresh Patel, Ranjan Patel. (Anthony, David) Modified on 12/28/2018 (nms).
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 REPLY re #3 MOTION to Transfer Venue, filed by Crown Bank. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Reilley, Patrick) Modified on 12/28/2018 (nms).
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #4 Motion for Permissive Abstention, Or, In the Alternative, For Remand filed by Crown Bank.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Reilley, Patrick)
December 14, 2018 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #3 MOTION to Transfer Venue, filed by BWI MRPC Hotels, LLC, Ganesa, LLC, Krishnas, LLC, Paresh Patel and Ranjan Patel Irrevocable Trust, Chirag Patel, Paresh Patel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Anthony, David) Modified on 12/17/2018 (nms).
December 5, 2018 Filing 5 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #4 Motion for Permissive Abstention, Or, In the Alternative, For Remand, filed by BWI MRPC Hotels, LLC, Ganesa, LLC, Krishnas, LLC, Paresh Patel and Ranjan Patel Irrevocable Trust, Chirag Patel, Paresh Patel, Ranjan Patel.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Anthony, David) Modified on 12/6/2018 (nms).
December 5, 2018 Filing 4 Motion for Permissive Abstention, Or, In the Alternative, For Remand - filed by BWI MRPC Hotels, LLC, Ganesa, LLC, Krishnas, LLC, Paresh Patel and Ranjan Patel Irrevocable Trust, Chirag Patel, Paresh Patel, Ranjan Patel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Anthony, David) Modified on 12/6/2018 (nms).
November 30, 2018 Set Answering Brief Deadline re #3 MOTION to Transfer Venue. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/14/2018. (nms)
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Transfer Venue - filed by Crown Bank. (Attachments: #1 7.1.1 Certification, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Proposed Order, #10 Certificate of Service)(Reilley, Patrick) Modified on 12/3/2018 (nms).
November 14, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior Ct, Case Number N15C-02-010 EMD (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0311-2499244)- filed by Crown Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(rwc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MRPC Christiana LLC et al v. Crown Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paresh Patel
Represented By: David B. Anthony
Represented By: John G. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ganesa, LLC
Represented By: David B. Anthony
Represented By: John G. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chirag Patel
Represented By: David B. Anthony
Represented By: John G. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BWI MRPC Hotels, LLC
Represented By: David B. Anthony
Represented By: John G. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krishnas, LLC
Represented By: David B. Anthony
Represented By: John G. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MRPC Christiana LLC
Represented By: David B. Anthony
Represented By: John G. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paresh Patel and Ranjan Patel Irrevocable Trust
Represented By: David B. Anthony
Represented By: John G. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ranjan Patel
Represented By: David B. Anthony
Represented By: John G. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Bank
Represented By: Patrick J. Reilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?