Mimzi, LLC v. Foursquare Labs, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mimzi, LLC
Defendant: Foursquare Labs, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01767
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jonathan P. Froemel and Michael A. Carrillo for Foursquare Labs, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ddp)
December 31, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney David A. Dorey by Foursquare Labs, Inc. re #9 Notice of Appearance (Dorey, David)
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad S.C. Stover on behalf of Foursquare Labs, Inc. (Stover, Chad)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan P. Froemel and Michael A. Carrillo filed by Foursquare Labs, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/21/18. (ntl)
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan P. Froemel and Michael A. Carrillo - filed by Foursquare Labs, Inc.. (Stover, Chad)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to February 1, 2019 filed by Mimzi, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/30/18. (ntl)
November 29, 2018 Filing 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to February 1, 2019 - filed by Mimzi, LLC. (Evain, Eric)
November 29, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Dorey on behalf of Foursquare Labs, Inc. (Dorey, David)
November 14, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01767-LPS, 1:18-cv-01768-LPS (rjb)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mimzi, LLC. Foursquare Labs, Inc. served on 11/9/2018, answer due 11/30/2018. (Evain, Eric)
November 9, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Foursquare Labs, Inc. on 11/9/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (sar)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Mimzi, LLC. (sar)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) U.S. 9,128,981 B1. (sar)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sar)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Foursquare Labs, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2500865.) - filed by Mimzi, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(sar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mimzi, LLC v. Foursquare Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mimzi, LLC
Represented By: Eric James Evain
Represented By: Edward Marshall Lilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foursquare Labs, Inc.
Represented By: David A. Dorey
Represented By: Jonathan P. Froemel
Represented By: Michael A. Carrillo
Represented By: Chad S.C. Stover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?