Ring Protection LLC v. Sprint Corporation
Plaintiff: Ring Protection LLC
Defendant: Sprint Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv01772
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David E. Finkelson and Justin R. Lowery filed by Sprint Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/3/19. (ntl)
January 2, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David E. Finkelson and Justin R. Lowery - filed by Sprint Corporation. (Attachments: #1 (Certification of David E. Finkelson), #2 (Certification of Justin R. Lowery))(Katona, Shanti)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to February 11, 2019 filed by Ring Protection LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/2/19. (ntl)
December 26, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to February 11, 2019 - filed by Ring Protection LLC. (Devlin, Timothy)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to January 10, 2019 filed by Ring Protection LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/10/18. (ntl)
December 3, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ring Protection LLC. Sprint Corporation served on 11/20/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. (Devlin, Timothy)
December 3, 2018 Filing 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to January 10, 2019 - filed by Ring Protection LLC. (Devlin, Timothy)
November 30, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Shanti Mulpuru Katona on behalf of Sprint Corporation (Katona, Shanti)
November 19, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jean G. Vidal-Font,Eugenio J. Torres-Oyola for Ring Protection LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (5 in 1:18-cv-01773-LPS) (5 in 1:18-cv-01770-LPS) (5 in 1:18-cv-01772-LPS) (5 in 1:18-cv-01771-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eugenio J. Torres-Oyola and Jean G. Vidal-Font filed by Ring Protection LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/19/18. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01770-LPS, 1:18-cv-01771-LPS, 1:18-cv-01772-LPS, 1:18-cv-01773-LPS (ntl)
November 14, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01770-LPS, 1:18-cv-01771-LPS, 1:18-cv-01772-LPS, 1:18-cv-01773-LPS (rjb)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eugenio J. Torres-Oyola and Jean G. Vidal-Font - filed by Ring Protection LLC. (Devlin, Timothy)
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Ring Protection LLC. (Devlin, Timothy)
November 9, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Sprint Corporation on 11/9/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (sar)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,892,329 B2. (sar)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sar)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Sprint Corporation - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2501167.) - filed by Ring Protection LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(sar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ring Protection LLC v. Sprint Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ring Protection LLC
Represented By: Timothy Devlin
Represented By: Eugenio J. Torres-Oyola
Represented By: Jean G. Vidal-Font
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Corporation
Represented By: Shanti Mulpuru Katona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?