Vertiv Corporation v. SVO Building One, LLC
Plaintiff: Vertiv Corporation and Vertiv Group Corporation
Defendant: SVO Building One, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01776
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 37 [SEALED] APPENDIX re #35 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) and 9 U.S.C. 3,by SVO Building One, LLC. (nms)
January 2, 2019 Filing 36 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #35 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint, filed by SVO Building One, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/16/2019. (nms)
January 2, 2019 Filing 35 [SEALED] MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) and 9 U.S.C 3 - filed by SVO Building One, LLC. (nms)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting #30 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/2/2019. (nms)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #32 STIPULATION to Extend Briefing Schedule (*Reset Briefing Schedule: re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Answering Brief due 2/1/2019, Reply Brief due 3/15/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/2/2019. (nms)
December 28, 2018 Filing 33 REDACTED VERSION of #30 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by SVO Building One, LLC. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
December 26, 2018 Filing 32 STIPULATION to Extend Briefing Schedule - filed by SVO Building One, LLC. (Dorsney, Kenneth) Modified on 12/28/2018 (nms).
December 21, 2018 Filing 31 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Sacramento Venture One LLC for SVO Building One, LLC filed by SVO Building One, LLC. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
December 21, 2018 Filing 30 [SEALED] Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal - filed by SVO Building One, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Dorsney, Kenneth) Modified on 12/28/2018 (nms).
December 19, 2018 Filing 29 REDACTED VERSION of #20 Declaration of Nikola Rosic, by Vertiv Corporation. (O'Rourke, Gerard) Modified on 12/19/2018 (nms).
December 19, 2018 Filing 28 REDACTED VERSION of #19 Declaration of Mislav Crnogorac, by Vertiv Corporation. (O'Rourke, Gerard) Modified on 12/19/2018 (nms).
December 19, 2018 Filing 27 REDACTED VERSION of #18 Declaration of Ivan Draganic, by Vertiv Corporation. (O'Rourke, Gerard) Modified on 12/19/2018 (nms).
December 19, 2018 Filing 26 REDACTED VERSION of #17 Declaration of Robert Pfleging, by Vertiv Corporation. (O'Rourke, Gerard) Modified on 12/19/2018 (nms).
December 19, 2018 Filing 25 REDACTED VERSION of #16 Appendix, by Vertiv Corporation. (O'Rourke, Gerard) Modified on 12/19/2018 (nms).
December 19, 2018 Filing 24 REDACTED VERSION #15 Memorandum In Support, by Vertiv Corporation. (O'Rourke, Gerard) Modified on 12/19/2018 (nms).
December 19, 2018 Filing 23 REDACTED VERSION of #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, by Vertiv Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Rourke, Gerard) Modified on 12/20/2018 (nms).
December 19, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Robert H. Sloss for Vertiv Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
December 19, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Victor M. Felix for Vertiv Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ddp)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #22 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Victor M. Felix, filed by Vertiv Corporation, and #21 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert H. Sloss, filed by Vertiv Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/13/2018. (nms)
December 13, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Victor M. Felix - filed by Vertiv Corporation. (O'Rourke, Gerard)
December 13, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert H. Sloss - filed by Vertiv Corporation. (O'Rourke, Gerard)
December 12, 2018 Filing 20 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Nikola Rosic re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, by Vertiv Corporation. (nms)
December 12, 2018 Filing 19 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Mislav Crnogorac re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, by Vertiv Corporation. (nms)
December 12, 2018 Filing 18 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Ivan Draganic re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, by Vertiv Corporation. (nms)
December 12, 2018 Filing 17 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Robert Pfleging re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, by Vertiv Corporation. (nms)
December 12, 2018 Filing 16 [SEALED] APPENDIX of Evidence in support of #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, by Vertiv Corporation. (nms)
December 12, 2018 Filing 15 [SEALED] MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Vertiv Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/26/2018. (nms)
December 12, 2018 Filing 14 [SEALED] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - filed by Vertiv Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(nms)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (D.I. #10 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/12/2018. (nms)
December 11, 2018 Filing 12 7.1.1 STATEMENT re Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (not yet filed), by Vertiv Corporation. (O'Rourke, Gerard) Modified on 12/12/2018 (nms).
December 11, 2018 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Anthony Marchese re #10 SEALED Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, by Vertiv Corporation. (O'Rourke, Gerard) Modified on 12/12/2018 (nms).
December 11, 2018 Filing 10 [SEALED] Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal - filed by Vertiv Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(O'Rourke, Gerard) Modified on 12/12/2018 (nms). Modified on 12/12/2018 (nms).
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sean P. DeBruine, filed by SVO Building One, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/11/2018. (nms)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 Stipulation and Order on Filing and Briefing Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/11/2018. (nms)
December 11, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sean P. DeBruine - filed by SVO Building One, LLC. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
December 11, 2018 Filing 8 STIPULATION and Proposed Order, by Vertiv Corporation. (O'Rourke, Gerard) Modified on 12/11/2018 (nms).
December 7, 2018 Filing 7 First AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement and Misappropriation of Trade Secrets against SVO Building One, LLC- filed by Vertiv Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(O'Rourke, Gerard) Modified on 12/7/2018 (nms).
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to December 18, 2018 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: SVO Building One, LLC answer due 12/18/2018). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/4/2018. (nms)
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant SVO Building One, LLC to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to December 18, 2018 - filed by SVO Building One, LLC. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
November 20, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vertiv Corporation. SVO Building One, LLC served on 11/13/2018, answer due 12/4/2018. (O'Rourke, Gerard)
November 14, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 9, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to SVO Building One, LLC on 11/9/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (nmg)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Vertiv Group Corporation for Vertiv Corporation; Corporate Parent Vertiv Intermediate Holding II Corporation for Vertiv Group Corporation filed by Vertiv Corporation, Vertiv Group Corporation. (nmg)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,352,082; 7,459,804; 9,038,404; 9,316,424; 6,917,124; 6,563,048. (nmg)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against SVO Building One, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2501271.) - filed by Vertiv Group Corporation, Vertiv Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vertiv Corporation v. SVO Building One, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SVO Building One, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vertiv Corporation
Represented By: Gerard M. O'Rourke
Represented By: Robert H. Sloss
Represented By: Victor M. Felix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vertiv Group Corporation
Represented By: Gerard M. O'Rourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?