Cunningham et al v. Prof-2013-S3 Legal Title Trust et al

Plaintiff: EL, Cunningham Butler, Bozeman Heirs Fam Trust and Joseph A. Cunningham, Jr.
Defendant: Fay Servicing, Orlans Law Group and Prof-2013-S3 Legal Title Trust
Case Number: 1:2018cv01792
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Remark: D.I. #5 edited and correct document added. (lak)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER, EL, Cunningham Butler, Bozeman Heirs Fam Trust DISMISSED without prejudice for not complying with the Court's November 27, 2018 Order. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/3/2019. (lak)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting D.I. #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The trust shall pay the required to pay the $400 filing fee and retain counsel within thirty (30) days from the date of this order or it will be dismissed as a plaintiff. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/27/2018. (nmg)
November 21, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed Pro Se with Jury Demand against Fay Servicing, Orlans Law Group, Prof-2013-S3 Legal Title Trust - filed by Joseph A. Cunningham, Jr, EL, Cunningham Butler, Bozeman Heirs Fam Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Joseph A. Cunningham, Jr. (nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cunningham et al v. Prof-2013-S3 Legal Title Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EL, Cunningham Butler, Bozeman Heirs Fam Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph A. Cunningham, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fay Servicing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orlans Law Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prof-2013-S3 Legal Title Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?