State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al v. Delaware Diagnostic & Rehabilitation Center, P.A. et al

Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Defendant: Damon D. Cary, D.O., Delaware Diagnostic & Rehabilitation Center, P.A., Conrad K. King, Jr., M.D., P.A., William R. Atkins, Jr., M.D., LLC,, William R. Atkins Jr. M.D., Damon D. Cary, D.O., P.A. and Conrad K. King, Jr., M.D.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01806
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Filing 21 JOINDER by William R. Atkins Jr. M.D., William R. Atkins, Jr., M.D., LLC,, Delaware Diagnostic & Rehabilitation Center, P.A., joining in #18 MEMORANDUM in Support, #17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, . (Anderson, Melony)
January 7, 2019 Filing 20 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by William R. Atkins Jr. M.D., William R. Atkins, Jr., M.D., LLC,, Delaware Diagnostic & Rehabilitation Center, P.A..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/22/2019. (Anderson, Melony)
January 7, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by William R. Atkins Jr. M.D., William R. Atkins, Jr., M.D., LLC,, Delaware Diagnostic & Rehabilitation Center, P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Motion to Dismiss)(Anderson, Melony)
January 7, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The proposed order for the Motion to Dismiss at D.I. #17 has been attached and the Memorandum in Support removed. (fms)
January 7, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Damon D. Cary, D.O., Damon D. Cary, D.O., P.A., Conrad K. King, Jr., M.D., Conrad K. King, Jr., M.D., P.A..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/22/2019. (Allen, Michele)
January 7, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Damon D. Cary, D.O., Damon D. Cary, D.O., P.A., Conrad K. King, Jr., M.D., Conrad K. King, Jr., M.D., P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Allen, Michele) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/7/2019) (fms).
January 7, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Andrew Baratta for Damon D. Cary, D.O., Damon D. Cary, D.O., P.A., Conrad K. King, Jr., M.D., and Conrad K. King, Jr., M.D., P.A. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew Baratta filed by Conrad K. King, Jr., M.D., Damon D. Cary, D.O., Damon D. Cary, D.O., P.A., Conrad K. King, Jr., M.D., P.A. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/3/2019. (fms)
January 3, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew Baratta - filed by Damon D. Cary, D.O., Damon D. Cary, D.O., P.A., Conrad K. King, Jr., M.D., Conrad K. King, Jr., M.D., P.A.. (Allen, Michele)
December 18, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kayla Pragid,David Spector,Adam K. Hodges,S. Montaye Sigmon for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
December 18, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: The stipulation at D.I. #15 has been removed and replaced with a corrected version and the 12/17/18 so ordered has been adjusted to reflect the corrections. (fms)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #15 Stipulation filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: William R. Atkins Jr. M.D. answer due 1/7/2019; William R. Atkins, Jr., M.D., LLC, answer due 1/7/2019; Damon D. Cary, D.O. answer due 1/7/2019; Damon D. Cary, D.O., P.A. answer due 1/7/2019; Delaware Diagnostic & Rehabilitation Center, P.A. answer due 1/7/2019; Conrad K. King, Jr., M.D. answer due 1/7/2019; Conrad K. King, Jr., M.D., P.A. answer due 1/7/2019.. Additionally, should Defendants file a motion pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12, then the parties agree that Plaintiffs' deadline to respond to the motion or otherwise amend their complaint will be through and including Friday, February 1, 2019 Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/17/2018. (fms) Modified on 12/18/2018 (fms).
December 17, 2018 Filing 15 Amended STIPULATION - FIRST AMENDED STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME - The parties seek to modify the Stipulation to Extend Time [D.I. 13] re SO ORDERED,,,, Set/Reset Answer Deadline(s),,, by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Joyce, Alexandra) (Main Document 15 replaced on 12/18/2018) (fms).
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Adam K. Hodges, Esq., Kayla L. Pragid, Esq., S. Montaye Sigmon, Esq. and David I. Spector, Esq. filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/7/2018. (fms)
December 7, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Adam K. Hodges, Esq., Kayla L. Pragid, Esq., S. Montaye Sigmon, Esq. and David I. Spector, Esq. - filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification by Counsel for Adam K. Hodges, Esq., Kayla L. Pragid, Esq., S. Montaye Sigmon, Esq. and David I. Spector, Esq. of Akerman LLP)(Dupre, Andrew)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: William R. Atkins Jr. M.D. answer due 12/18/2018; William R. Atkins, Jr., M.D., LLC, answer due 12/18/2018; Damon D. Cary, D.O. answer due 12/18/2018; Damon D. Cary, D.O., P.A. answer due 12/18/2018; Delaware Diagnostic & Rehabilitation Center, P.A. answer due 12/18/2018; Conrad K. King, Jr., M.D. answer due 12/18/2018; Conrad K. King, Jr., M.D., P.A. answer due 12/18/2018. Additionally, should Defendants file a motion pursuant to Federal Rule of civil Procedure 12, then the parties agree that Plaintiffs' deadline to respond to the motion or otherwise amend their complaint will be through and including Friday, February 1, 2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/6/2018. (fms)
December 6, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer - filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Dupre, Andrew)
December 4, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michele D. Allen on behalf of Damon D. Cary, D.O., Damon D. Cary, D.O., P.A., Conrad K. King, Jr., M.D., Conrad K. King, Jr., M.D., P.A. (Allen, Michele)
November 21, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 20, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Delaware Diagnostic & Rehabilitation Center, P.A. served on 11/20/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. (Joyce, Alexandra)
November 20, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Conrad K. King, Jr., M.D. served on 11/19/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Joyce, Alexandra)
November 20, 2018 Summons Reissued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Delaware Diagnostic & Rehabilitation Center, P.A. (lak)
November 20, 2018 Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: William R. Atkins, Jr., M.D., LLC, answer due 12/10/2018. (rwc)
November 19, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Conrad K. King, Jr., M.D., P.A. served on 11/19/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Joyce, Alexandra)
November 19, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Damon D. Cary, D.O., P.A. served on 11/19/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Joyce, Alexandra)
November 19, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. William R. Atkins Jr. M.D. served on 11/19/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Joyce, Alexandra)
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. William R. Atkins, Jr., M.D., LLC, served on 11/19/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Joyce, Alexandra) Modified on 11/20/2018 (rwc).
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Mailing regarding service on Defendant Damon D. Cary, D.O made on November 19, 2018 by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Joyce, Alexandra)
November 16, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to William R. Atkins Jr. M.D., William R. Atkins, Jr., M.D., LLC,, Damon D. Cary, D.O., Damon D. Cary, D.O., P.A., Delaware Diagnostic & Rehabilitation Center, P.A., Conrad K. King, Jr., M.D., Conrad K. King, Jr., M.D., P.A.. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (sar)
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (sar)
November 15, 2018 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (sar)
November 15, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sar)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against William R. Atkins Jr. M.D., William R. Atkins, Jr., M.D., LLC,, Damon D. Cary, D.O., Damon D. Cary, D.O., P.A., Delaware Diagnostic & Rehabilitation Center, P.A., Conrad K. King, Jr., M.D., Conrad K. King, Jr., M.D., P.A. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2505286.) - filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-9, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(sar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al v. Delaware Diagnostic & Rehabilitation Center, P.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Andrew S. Dupre
Represented By: David Spector
Represented By: Kayla Pragid
Represented By: Adam K. Hodges
Represented By: S. Montaye Sigmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Andrew S. Dupre
Represented By: David Spector
Represented By: Kayla Pragid
Represented By: Adam K. Hodges
Represented By: S. Montaye Sigmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damon D. Cary, D.O.
Represented By: Andrew Baratta
Represented By: Michele D. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delaware Diagnostic & Rehabilitation Center, P.A.
Represented By: Melony Rose Anderson
Represented By: Adam Balick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conrad K. King, Jr., M.D., P.A.
Represented By: Andrew Baratta
Represented By: Michele D. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William R. Atkins, Jr., M.D., LLC,
Represented By: Melony Rose Anderson
Represented By: Adam Balick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William R. Atkins Jr. M.D.
Represented By: Melony Rose Anderson
Represented By: Adam Balick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damon D. Cary, D.O., P.A.
Represented By: Andrew Baratta
Represented By: Michele D. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conrad K. King, Jr., M.D.
Represented By: Andrew Baratta
Represented By: Michele D. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?