McCullough et al v. Lewis et al

Plaintiff: Robert McCullough, Jr. and Dr. Zhongxi Zheng
Defendant: William Austin Lewis, Dr. John Abeles, Joel Kanter, Lewis Opportunity Fund, L.P., Medite Cancer Diagnostics, Inc., Gregory Fortunoff and Stephen Von Rump
Case Number: 1:2018cv01829
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER: The Motion for Extension of Time to Obtain Delaware Counsel (D.I. #68 ) is GRANTED. Defendants' time to obtain local counsel is extended from December 20, 2018 to January 21, 2019. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/21/2018. (nms)
December 20, 2018 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin A. Smyth on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Smyth, Benjamin)
December 20, 2018 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M. Silver on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Silver, Daniel)
December 19, 2018 Filing 68 MOTION for Extension of Time to Obtain Delaware Counsel - filed by Medite Cancer Diagnostics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Letter)(nmg) Modified on 12/20/2018 (nms).
November 27, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 20, 2018 Filing 67 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 12/20/2018. (rwc)
November 20, 2018 Filing 66 Record of case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number in Other District: 3:18-cv-02864. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
November 19, 2018 Transferring case electronically to the District Court for the District of Delaware. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: #64 TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF DELAWARE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/19/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
November 16, 2018 Filing 64 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Robert McCullough, Jr, Zhongxi Zheng. (Mader, Christopher) (Filed on 11/16/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
November 5, 2018 Set/Reset as to #58 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing previously set for 11/29/2018 has been continued to 12/13/2018 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER CONTINUING MOTION HEARING. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/5/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 62 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference previously set for November 15, 2018 is continued to November 29, 2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by November 21, 2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
November 1, 2018 Filing 61 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Robert McCullough, Jr, Zhongxi Zheng. (Mader, Christopher) (Filed on 11/1/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
October 30, 2018 Filing 60 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
October 23, 2018 Filing 59 EXHIBITS re #58 MOTION to Dismiss filed byMedite Cancer Diagnostics, Inc.. (Related document(s) #58 ) (Fellner, Jason) (Filed on 10/23/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
October 23, 2018 Filing 58 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Medite Cancer Diagnostics, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 11/21/2018. Replies due by 11/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss; Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declarations of John G. Moon In Support Thereof, #2 Proposed Order [proposed] Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Complaint, #3 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Declaration of John G. Moon, Esq In Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint)(Fellner, Jason) (Filed on 10/23/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #32 Motion to Set Aside Default; denying #34 Motion for Default Judgment. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
September 28, 2018 Filing 56 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 11/8/2018. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 11/8/2018 has been continued to 11/15/2018 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 55 REPLY (re #34 MOTION for Default Judgment ) filed byRobert McCullough, Jr, Zhongxi Zheng. (Mader, Christopher) (Filed on 9/18/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #52 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Richard W. Nicholson Jr. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #51 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to John G. Moon. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
September 10, 2018 Filing 52 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Richard W. Nicholson Jr.) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12663221.) filed by Medite Cancer Diagnostics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Nicholson, Richard) (Filed on 9/10/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
September 10, 2018 Filing 51 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (John G. Moon) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12663150.) filed by Medite Cancer Diagnostics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Moon, John) (Filed on 9/10/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
August 28, 2018 Filing 50 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing as to #34 MOTION for Default Judgment, #32 MOTION to Set Aside Default . Motion Hearing previously set for 9/27/2018 has been continued to 10/4/2018 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 49 Renotice motion hearing re #32 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed byLewis Opportunity Fund, L.P., Medite Cancer Diagnostics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Defendant Stephen Von Rump in Further Support of Nominal Defendant Medite Cancer Diagnostics, Inc. And Defendant Lewis Opportunity Fund, L.P.'s Re-Notice of Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default)(Related document(s) #32 ) (Fellner, Jason) (Filed on 8/27/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 48 REPLY in Further Support (re #32 MOTION to Set Aside Default ) filed by Lewis Opportunity Fund, L.P., Medite Cancer Diagnostics, Inc.. (Fellner, Jason) (Filed on 8/27/2018) Modified on 8/28/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
August 23, 2018 Filing 47 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING MOTION HEARING. Motion Hearing as to #34 MOTION for Default Judgment, #32 MOTION to Set Aside Default . Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2018 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #37 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
August 22, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE by Robert McCullough, Jr, Zhongxi Zheng re #42 Opposition/Response to Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Mader, Christopher) (Filed on 8/22/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
August 21, 2018 Filing 44 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #34 MOTION for Default Judgment ) filed byLewis Opportunity Fund, L.P., Medite Cancer Diagnostics, Inc.. (Millstein, David) (Filed on 8/21/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
August 21, 2018 Filing 43 Renotice motion hearing re #37 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed byGregory Fortunoff. (Related document(s) #37 ) (Millstein, David) (Filed on 8/21/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
August 20, 2018 Filing 42 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #32 MOTION to Set Aside Default ) filed byRobert McCullough, Jr, Zhongxi Zheng. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration)(Mader, Christopher) (Filed on 8/20/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
August 20, 2018 Filing 41 CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. All pending motions will be taken off-calendar and must be re-noticed by the moving party for a new hearing according to Judge Seeborg's available dates, which are listed on his webpage under the section "Scheduling Notes." The new hearing date must be at least five weeks from the date the motion was filed and at least three weeks from the date the re-notice is filed. The due date for any opposition or reply papers not yet filed shall be calculated in accordance with Civil Local Rule 7-3. Case Management Statement due by 11/1/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/8/2018 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Richard Seeborg. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/20/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/17/2018. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
August 17, 2018 Filing 38 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants Gregory Fortunoff and Lewis Opportunity Fund L.P shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 8/31/2018. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
August 16, 2018 Filing 37 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Gregory Fortunoff. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richelson ISO Motion, #2 Declaration of Fortunoff ISO Motion, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Millstein, David) (Filed on 8/16/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
August 10, 2018 Filing 36 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. To all parties and counsel of record:Please take notice that due to the pending motions, the case management conference currently scheduled for August 16, 2018 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley is hereby vacated. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
August 8, 2018 Filing 35 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Robert McCullough, Jr, Zhongxi Zheng. (Mader, Christopher) (Filed on 8/8/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 34 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Robert McCullough, Jr, Zhongxi Zheng. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Mader, Christopher) (Filed on 8/7/2018) Modified on 8/8/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 33 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants Medite Cancer Diagnostics, Inc. and Lewis Opportunity Fund, L.P. shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 8/21/2018. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 32 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Medite Cancer Diagnostics, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/13/2018 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 8/20/2018. Replies due by 8/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Points & Authorities, #2 Declaration Declaration of William Austin Lewis, #3 Declaration Declaration of Stephen Von Romp, #4 Declaration Declaration of John G. Moon, #5 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default)(Fellner, Jason) (Filed on 8/6/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
July 9, 2018 Filing 31 Clerk's DECLINATION OF DEFAULTS. (Related documents(s) #26 , #27 , #28 , #29 , 36 )(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
July 6, 2018 Filing 30 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant Von Rump filed by Robert McCullough, Jr, Zhongxi Zheng. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Mader, Christopher) (Filed on 7/6/2018) Modified on 7/9/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
July 6, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant Abeles filed by Robert McCullough, Jr, Zhongxi Zheng. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Mader, Christopher) (Filed on 7/6/2018) Modified on 7/9/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
July 6, 2018 Filing 28 for Entry of Default as to Defendant Kanter filed by Robert McCullough, Jr, Zhongxi Zheng. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration)(Mader, Christopher) (Filed on 7/6/2018) Modified on 7/9/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
July 6, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant Lewis filed by Robert McCullough, Jr, Zhongxi Zheng. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration)(Mader, Christopher) (Filed on 7/6/2018) Modified on 7/9/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
July 6, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant Fortunoff filed by Robert McCullough, Jr, Zhongxi Zheng. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration)(Mader, Christopher) (Filed on 7/6/2018) Modified on 7/9/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
July 6, 2018 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zhongxi Zheng, Robert McCullough, Jr. Gregory Fortunoff served on 6/14/2018, answer due 7/5/2018. (Mader, Christopher) (Filed on 7/6/2018) Modified on 7/9/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
July 2, 2018 Filing 24 Clerk's Notice: ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to defendant Medite Cancer Diagnostics. (Related documents(s) #22 )(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
July 2, 2018 Filing 23 Clerk's Notice: ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to defendant Lewis Opportunity Fund, L.P. (Related documents(s) #21 )(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
June 27, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION for Entry of Default as to defendant Medite Cancer Diagnostics filed by Robert McCullough, Jr, Zhongxi Zheng. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service, #3 Affidavit)(Mader, Christopher) (Filed on 6/27/2018) Modified on 6/29/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
June 27, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION for Entry of Default as to defendant Lewis Opportunity Fund, L.P. filed by Robert McCullough, Jr, Zhongxi Zheng. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Mader, Christopher) (Filed on 6/27/2018) Modified on 6/29/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
June 22, 2018 Filing 20 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Robert McCullough, Jr, Zhongxi Zheng.. (Mader, Christopher) (Filed on 6/22/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zhongxi Zheng, Robert McCullough, Jr. Medite Cancer Diagnostics, Inc. served on 5/31/2018, answer due 6/21/2018. (Mader, Christopher) (Filed on 6/19/2018) Modified on 6/20/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zhongxi Zheng, Robert McCullough, Jr. Lewis Opportunity Fund, L.P. served on 6/4/2018, answer due 6/25/2018. (Mader, Christopher) (Filed on 6/19/2018) Modified on 6/20/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zhongxi Zheng, Robert McCullough, Jr. Joel Kanter served on 6/14/2018, answer due 7/5/2018. (Mader, Christopher) (Filed on 6/19/2018) Modified on 6/20/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zhongxi Zheng, Robert McCullough, Jr. Steven Von Rump served on 6/14/2018, answer due 7/5/2018. (Mader, Christopher) (Filed on 6/19/2018) Modified on 6/20/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zhongxi Zheng, Robert McCullough, Jr. John Abeles served on 6/14/2018, answer due 7/5/2018. (Mader, Christopher) (Filed on 6/19/2018) Modified on 6/20/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zhongxi Zheng, Robert McCullough, Jr. William Austin Lewis served on 6/14/2018, answer due 7/5/2018. (Mader, Christopher) (Filed on 6/19/2018) Modified on 6/20/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
June 8, 2018 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 6/22/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
May 18, 2018 Filing 12 Summonses Issued as to John Abeles, Gregory Fortunoff, Joel Kanter, William Austin Lewis, Lewis Opportunity Fund, L.P., Medite Cancer Diagnostics, Inc., Stephen Von Rump. (Attachments: #1 Von Rump, #2 Kanter, #3 Fortunoff, #4 Lewis Opportunity, #5 Medite Cancer, #6 Abeles)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
May 17, 2018 Filing 11 Proposed Summons. (Mader, Christopher) (Filed on 5/17/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
May 17, 2018 Filing 10 Proposed Summons. (Mader, Christopher) (Filed on 5/17/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
May 17, 2018 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. (Mader, Christopher) (Filed on 5/17/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
May 17, 2018 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. (Mader, Christopher) (Filed on 5/17/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
May 17, 2018 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Mader, Christopher) (Filed on 5/17/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
May 17, 2018 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Mader, Christopher) (Filed on 5/17/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
May 17, 2018 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Mader, Christopher) (Filed on 5/17/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/9/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/16/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/30/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Robert McCullough, Jr, ZHONGXI ZHENG . (Mader, Christopher) (Filed on 5/16/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]
May 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Abeles, Gregory Fortunoff, Joel Kanter, William Austin Lewis, Lewis Opportunity Fund, L.P., Medite Cancer Diagnostics, Inc., Stephen Von Rump (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12356623). Filed by Zhongxi Zheng, Robert McCullough, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Mader, Christopher) (Filed on 5/15/2018) Modified on 5/16/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 11/20/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCullough et al v. Lewis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Austin Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. John Abeles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Kanter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis Opportunity Fund, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medite Cancer Diagnostics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Fortunoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Von Rump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert McCullough, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin A. Smyth
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Zhongxi Zheng
Represented By: Benjamin A. Smyth
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?