Dietz v. Chesapeake Plumbing and Heating, Inc.

Plaintiff: Regina Dietz
Defendant: Chesapeake Plumbing and Heating, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01882
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Ashley A. Bosche and Robin R. Cockey for Regina Dietz added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ashley B. Bosche, filed by Regina Dietz, and #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robin R. Cockey, filed by Regina Dietz. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/12/2018. (nms)
December 12, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robin R. Cockey - filed by Regina Dietz. (Allen, Michele)
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ashley B. Bosche - filed by Regina Dietz. (Allen, Michele)
December 11, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 4 and 5 have been removed from the docket. The filings appeared to be motions that were filed using the proposed order filing event code. Counsel shall refile the motions using the motion event code. (nms)
December 11, 2018 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Regina Dietz: For Chesapeake Plumbing and Heating, Inc. waiver sent on 12/4/2018, answer due 2/4/2019. (Allen, Michele)
December 6, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 28, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Chesapeake Plumbing and Heating, Inc. on 11/28/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (lak)
November 28, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against Chesapeake Plumbing and Heating, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2513002.) - filed by Regina Dietz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dietz v. Chesapeake Plumbing and Heating, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Plumbing and Heating, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Dietz
Represented By: Michele D. Allen
Represented By: Caitlyn E. Quinn
Represented By: Robin R. Cockey
Represented By: Ashley A. Bosche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?