Malizia v. LM General Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Charles Malizia
Defendant: LM General Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv01908
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: The Motion for Extension of Time to Obtain Local Counsel (D.I. #22 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff is directed to obtain local counsel within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/9/2019. (nms)
January 8, 2019 Filing 23 Letter to the Clerk of Court, dated 1/7/2019, from Thomas More Holland, Esq. enclosing Motion to Extend Time to Find Local Counsel or Dismiss This Action Without Prejudice for filing (see D.I. #22 ). (nms)
January 8, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Extend Time to Find Local Counsel or Dismiss This Action Without Prejudice - filed by Charles Malizia. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(nms)
January 7, 2019 Filing 21 Letter to the Clerk of Court, dated 1/2/2019, from Thomas More Holland, regarding a request for an extension of time to obtain local counsel. (nms)
December 27, 2018 Filing 20 Amended Local Counsel Letter sent. Address Corrected. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 1/28/2019. (lak)
December 27, 2018 Remark: Address corrected on Local Counsel Letter. Re-sent to Allison I. Bressler Goldis, William C. Foster, and Cristin Ann Cavanaugh of Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin. (lak)
December 6, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 3, 2018 Filing 19 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 1/2/2019. (lak)
December 3, 2018 Filing 18 Record of case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number in Other District: 2:18-cv-03260. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDERED: That Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue and Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue Is Granted and the Clerk of Court Shall Transfer the Above-captioned Matter to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware and Close this Case. Signed by Honorable Paul S. Diamond on 10/31/18.11/1/18 Entered and Copies Mailed and Emailed to Counsel.(jaa, ) Modified on 11/1/2018 (jaa, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/3/2018.] Modified on 12/14/2018 (nms).
October 16, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE, PLEASE TAKE NOTE THAT THE PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 17, 2018 AT 11:00 A.M. BEFORE THE HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND IN ROOM 14614, UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19106 IS CANCELED.(rt) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/3/2018.]
October 16, 2018 Filing 15 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT ALL DEADLINES IN THIS MATTER ARE STAYED PENDING FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT.SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 10/16/2018. 10/16/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(rt) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/3/2018.]
October 16, 2018 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by CHARLES MALIZIA. (TREWELLA, KELLY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/3/2018.]
October 16, 2018 Filing 13 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by CHARLES MALIZIA Certificate of Service. (TREWELLA, KELLY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/3/2018.]
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER (DOC. NO. #11 ), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION (DOC. NO. #11 ) NO LATER THAN NOON ON OCTOBER 16, 2018.SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 10/11/2018. 10/12/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(rt) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/3/2018.]
October 11, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(FOSTER, WILLIAM) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/3/2018.]
October 9, 2018 Filing 10 Discovery Plan by LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY.(FOSTER, WILLIAM) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/3/2018.]
September 5, 2018 Filing 9 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/3/2018.]
August 23, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/17/2018 11:00 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND.(rt) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/3/2018.]
August 9, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE by LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY withdrawing Stipulation for Extension of Time (FOSTER, WILLIAM) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/3/2018.]
August 8, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint together with with Affirmative Defenses by LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(CAVANAUGH, CRISTIN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/3/2018.]
August 8, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY Stipuation for Extension of Time (FOSTER, WILLIAM) Modified on 8/9/2018 (lvj, ). (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; FORWARD TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/3/2018.]
August 3, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by CHARLES MALIZIA Track Designation and Jury Demand (TREWELLA, KELLY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/3/2018.]
August 1, 2018 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER OUTLINED HEREIN.SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 8/1/2018. 8/1/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/3/2018.]
August 1, 2018 Case Eligible for Arbitration(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/3/2018.]
August 1, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent LIBERTY MUTUAL GROUP INC., Corporate Parent LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, Corporate Parent LMHC MASSACHUSETTS HOLDINGS INC., Corporate Parent LIBERTY MUTUAL HOLDING COMPANY INC. for LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY.(amas, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/3/2018.]
August 1, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH CERTIFICATION AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY from PHILADELPHIA COURT OF COMMON PLEAS, case number 18060350. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 182399) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, DESIGNATION FORM, CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK FORM)(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/3/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malizia v. LM General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Malizia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LM General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?