Lane v. Main Street Business Funding, LLC

Plaintiff: John P. Lane
Defendant: Main Street Business Funding, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01910
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John P. Lane. Main Street Business Funding, LLC served on 1/2/2019, answer due 1/23/2019. (ceg)
December 26, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Main Street Business Funding, LLC on 12/26/2018. (ceg)
December 6, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 3, 2018 No Summons Issued. (nmg)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed Pro Se against Main Street Business Funding, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number DEX030690.) - filed by John P. Lane. (Attachments: #1 Acknowledgement of Rule 4, #2 Acknowledgement of Consent Form, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lane v. Main Street Business Funding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Main Street Business Funding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John P. Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?