Woodson v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Sherry L. Woodson
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2018cv01928
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Benderson on behalf of Nancy Berryhill (Benderson, Heather)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Clerk of Court shall notify the United States Attorney's Office for the District of Delaware of this in forma pauperis action filed pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Within fourteen (14) days from the entry of this Order, an entry of appearance shall be filed identifying the Special Assistant United States Attorney who will appear to defend the Acting Commissioner of Social Security within ninety (90) days from filing the entry of appearance, the Acting Commissioner of Social Security shall serve and file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint and shall also file the transcript of Social Security proceedings. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/14/2018. (lak) Modified on 12/14/2018 (nms).
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/12/2018. (ceg)
December 12, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 6, 2018 No Summons Issued. (lak)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
December 5, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT - filed against Nancy Berryhill - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. - filed by Sherry L. Woodson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lak)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Sherry L. Woodson. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodson v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Represented By: Heather Benderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry L. Woodson
Represented By: Angela Pinto Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?