Freeman et al v. TrainingWheel Corporation, LLC
Plaintiff: Aireanne Clark and Katrina Freeman
Defendant: TrainingWheel Corporation, LLC and TrainingWheel
Case Number: 1:2018cv01932
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Remark: Case transferred from Delaware has been opened in Middle District of Florida as case 2:19-cv-00052, filed 01/30/2019. (nmg)
January 29, 2019 Case transferred electronically to United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida, Fort Myers Division. (fms)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Joint Stipulation to Transfer Venue. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/28/2019. (fms)
January 22, 2019 Filing 10 Joint STIPULATION Stipulation to Transfer Venue by Aireanne Clark, Katrina Freeman. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Daniel)
January 15, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Olena Savytska for Aireanne Clark and Katrina Freeman added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ddp)
January 10, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of Florida, Fort Myers Division filed by TrainingWheel Corporation, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Arthur Mark Gilbert, Jr.)(Herr, Daniel)
January 10, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of Florida, Fort Myers Division - filed by TrainingWheel Corporation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Herr, Daniel)
January 8, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jason Gunter for TrainingWheel Corporation, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jason L. Gunter, Esq. filed by TrainingWheel Corporation, LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/8/2019. (fms)
January 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jason L. Gunter, Esq. - filed by TrainingWheel Corporation, LLC. (Herr, Daniel)
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Charles Herr on behalf of TrainingWheel Corporation, LLC (Herr, Daniel)
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Mike Gilbert, Vice President for Defendant, TrainingWheel Corporation, LLC a/k/a TrainingWheel, Inc. on 12/20/2018, filed by Aireanne Clark, Katrina Freeman. (Miller, Daniel)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Olena Savytska filed by Aireanne Clark, Katrina Freeman. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/27/2018. (fms)
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Olena Savytska - filed by Aireanne Clark, Katrina Freeman. (Miller, Daniel)
December 18, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Alexandra Piazza,Sarah R. Schalman-Bergen,Shanon J. Carson for Aireanne Clark, Katrina Freeman added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Shanon J. Carson, Sarah Schalman-Bergen and Alexandra Piazza filed by Aireanne Clark, Katrina Freeman. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/13/2018. (nmf)
December 12, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 11, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Shanon J. Carson, Sarah Schalman-Bergen and Alexandra Piazza - filed by Aireanne Clark, Katrina Freeman. (Miller, Daniel)
December 10, 2018 Remark: Summons mailed to council's Philadelphia office per request. (lak)
December 6, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to TrainingWheel Corporation, LLC on 12/6/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (rwc)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 COLLECTIVE ACTION COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against TrainingWheel Corporation, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2518319.) - filed by Katrina Freeman, Aireanne Clark. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(rwc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeman et al v. TrainingWheel Corporation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TrainingWheel Corporation, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Charles Herr
Represented By: Jason Gunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TrainingWheel
Represented By: Daniel Charles Herr
Represented By: Jason Gunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aireanne Clark
Represented By: Daniel R. Miller
Represented By: Olena Savytska
Represented By: Shanon J. Carson
Represented By: Alexandra Piazza
Represented By: Sarah R. Schalman-Bergen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katrina Freeman
Represented By: Daniel R. Miller
Represented By: Olena Savytska
Represented By: Shanon J. Carson
Represented By: Alexandra Piazza
Represented By: Sarah R. Schalman-Bergen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?