Henkel v. Tower Hill School Association

Plaintiff: Francis J. Henkel
Defendant: Tower Hill School Association
Case Number: 1:2018cv01944
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Francis J. Henkel: For Tower Hill School Association waiver sent on 12/14/2018, answer due 2/12/2019. (DiBianca, Margaret)
December 12, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 10, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Tower Hill School Association on 12/10/2018. (sar)
December 10, 2018 No Summons Issued. (lak)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against Tower Hill School Association - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2520825.) - filed by Francis J. Henkel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henkel v. Tower Hill School Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tower Hill School Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis J. Henkel
Represented By: Margaret M. DiBianca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?