Abdelfattahfathy v. St. Michael's School & Nursery, Inc.

Plaintiff: Sherine Abdelfattahfathy
Defendant: St. Michael's School & Nursery, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01955
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (*second copy provided by Clerk's Office) (ceg)
January 14, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to St. Michael's School & Nursery, Inc. on 1/14/2019. (ceg)
December 19, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 12, 2018 No Summons Issued. (ddp)
December 11, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ddp)
December 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed Pro Se with Jury Demand against St. Michael's School & Nursery, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 030803.) - filed by Sherine Abdelfattahfathy. (Attachments: #1 Acknowledgement of Rule 4, #2 Acknowledgement of Consent Form, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abdelfattahfathy v. St. Michael's School & Nursery, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherine Abdelfattahfathy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Michael's School & Nursery, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?