Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Europe v. Bolivarian Republic of Venezuela et al
Plaintiff: Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Europe
Defendant: Bolivarian Republic of Venezuela and Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01963
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 09:207
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Alexander A. Yanos, Carlos Ramos-Mrosovsky, and Rajat Rana for Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Europe added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Carlos Ramos-Mrosovsky filed by Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Europe, #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Rajat Rana filed by Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Europe, #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Alexander A. Yanos filed by Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Europe. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/20/18. (ntl)
December 19, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:18-mc-00343-LPS, 1:18-cv-01963-LPS (rjb)
December 13, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Rajat Rana - filed by Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Europe. (Jones, Laura)
December 13, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Carlos Ramos-Mrosovsky - filed by Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Europe. (Jones, Laura)
December 13, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Alexander A. Yanos - filed by Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Europe. (Jones, Laura)
December 13, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Bolivarian Republic of Venezuela on 12/13/2018; Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A. on 12/13/2018. (nmg)
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Compagnie de Saint-Gobain, Corporate Parent Societe de Participations Financieres et Industrielles for Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Europe filed by Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Europe. (Jones, Laura)
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 DECLARATION re #1 Complaint, of Alexander A. Yanos In Support of Complaint to Register and Enforce ICSID Arbitration Award as a Foreign Judgment by Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Europe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Jones, Laura)
December 13, 2018 No Summons Issued. (nmg)
December 12, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Register and Enforce ICSID Arbitration Award as a Foreign Judgment filed against Bolivarian Republic of Venezuela, Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2523429.) - filed by Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Europe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Europe v. Bolivarian Republic of Venezuela et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bolivarian Republic of Venezuela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Europe
Represented By: Peter James Keane
Represented By: Laura Davis Jones
Represented By: Alexander A. Yanos
Represented By: Carlos Ramos-Mrosovsky
Represented By: Rajat Rana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?