Fahmy v. Phelps et al
Plaintiff: Paul A. Fahmy
Defendant: Lt. Burman, RN Irene Fuh, RN Eric Neba, Estate of Lt. Floyd, Capt. Marcello Rispoli, Commissioner Perry Phelps, Lt. Michael Welcome, Officer Thomas P. Runyon, Jane/John Does, Lt. Heishman and David Pierce
Case Number: 1:2018cv01997
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 CASE CLOSED per D.I. #8 . (nms)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Civil Action 18-1042-RGA is REOPENED. The Clerk of Court is directed to DOCKET the Complaint (D.I. 1) and sealed exhibits (D.I. 2) from Civil Action No. 18-1997-RGA as the Amended Complaint and sealed exhibits in Civil action No. 18-1042-RGA. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE Civil Action No. 18-1997-RGA. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/11/2019. (nms)
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 Letter to Paul Fahmy, from the Clerk of Court, responding to #6 Letter requesting clarification concerning filing fee payments. (ceg) Modified on 1/4/2019 (nms).
January 4, 2019 Filing 6 Letter to Judge Andrews, from Paul Fahmy, received on 1/4/2019, requesting clarification concerning filing fee payments. (ceg) Modified on 1/4/2019 (nms).
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Filing Fee of $350.00 Assessed. Plaintiff shall submit IFP application and certified copy of trust fund account statement. Failure to submit items within 30 days will result in dismissal of action without prejudice (Copy to pltf. with Mag. Consent Form). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/19/2018. (lak) Modified on 12/21/2018 (nms).
December 19, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 [SEALED] EXHIBITS to D.I. #1 Complaint, by Paul A. Fahmy. (nmg)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed pursuant to 42:1983 with Jury Demand against Burman, Jane/John Does, Estate of Lt. Floyd, Irene Fuh, Heishman, Eric Neba, Perry Phelps, David Pierce, Marcello Rispoli, Thomas P. Runyon, Michael Welcome (No IFP, No Fee Paid) - filed by Paul A. Fahmy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fahmy v. Phelps et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Burman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN Irene Fuh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN Eric Neba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Lt. Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt. Marcello Rispoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Perry Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Michael Welcome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Thomas P. Runyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane/John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Heishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul A. Fahmy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?