Estate of Beverly M. Berland v. U.S. Bank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Estate of Beverly M. Berland
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A. and Lavastone Capital LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv02002
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #3 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer complaint to March 15, 2019 filed by U.S. Bank, N.A., Lavastone Capital LLC, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Lavastone Capital LLC answer due 3/15/2019; U.S. Bank, N.A. answer due 3/15/2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/24/2019. (fms)
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer complaint to March 15, 2019 - filed by Lavastone Capital LLC, U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Cascio, Megan)
December 19, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 18, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Lavastone Capital LLC on 12/18/2018; U.S. Bank, N.A. on 12/18/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (lak)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against Lavastone Capital LLC, U.S. Bank, N.A. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2527254.) - filed by Estate of Beverly M. Berland. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Beverly M. Berland v. U.S. Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Beverly M. Berland
Represented By: Donald L. Gouge, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Megan Ward Cascio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lavastone Capital LLC
Represented By: Megan Ward Cascio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?