Garnett v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Robin Garnett
Defendant: Joseph Howard Hall and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2018cv02009
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #3 MOTION to Substitute Party: United States of America to replace Joseph Howard Hall. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/28/18. (ntl)
December 26, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter - filed by Joseph Howard Hall. (Steinberg, Dylan)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Substitute Party: United States of America to replace Joseph Howard Hall - filed by Joseph Howard Hall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Steinberg, Dylan)
December 18, 2018 Remark : Docket Sheet and Magistrate Consent Notice mailed to Pro-Se Plaintiff. (rwc)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Justice of the Peace Court No. 13, Case Number JP13-17-015538 - filed by Joseph Howard Hall. (Filing Fee Waived) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(rwc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garnett v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Howard Hall
Represented By: Dylan J. Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Dylan J. Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Garnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?