AstraZeneca AB et al v. Apotex Inc. et al
Plaintiff: AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca AB and Nektar Therapeutics
Defendant: Apotex Inc. and Apotex Corp.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02010
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Andrew M. Alul,Stephen R. Auten,Brian P. Murray,Richard T. Ruzich for Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
January 25, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Sumeet P. Dang for AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Nektar Therapeutics added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 3/1/2019, at 4:15 PM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/24/2019. (nms)
January 24, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Aaron P. Maurer for AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, and Nektar Therapeutics added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-02010-RGA, 1:18-cv-02051-RGA(ddp)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jessamyn S. Berniker, Aaron P. Maurer, Sumeet P. Dang, filed by Nektar Therapeutics, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca AB. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/24/2019. (nms)
January 23, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Nektar Therapeutics.(Silver, Daniel)
January 23, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jessamyn S. Berniker, Aaron P. Maurer, Sumeet P. Dang - filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Nektar Therapeutics. (Attachments: #1 Certifications)(Silver, Daniel) Modified on 1/24/2019 (nms).
January 4, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Mailing regarding service on Apotex Inc. made on December 19, 2018, by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Nektar Therapeutics. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B)(Silver, Daniel) Modified on 1/4/2019 (nms).
January 4, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nektar Therapeutics, AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. Apotex Corp. served on 12/19/2018, answer due 1/9/2019. (Silver, Daniel)
January 2, 2019 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Apotex Pharmaceutical Holdings, Inc. for Apotex Inc.; Corporate Parent Aposherm Delaware Holdings Corporation for Apotex Corp. filed by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
January 2, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Apotex Inc., Apotex Corp..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephen R. Auten, Brian P. Murray, Andrew M. Alul and Richard T. Ruzich, filed by Apotex Inc., Apotex Corp.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/2/2019. (nms)
December 28, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephen R. Auten, Brian P. Murray, Andrew M. Alul and Richard T. Ruzich - filed by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
December 26, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate PRIMECAP Management Company, Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Other Affiliate Fidelity Management and Research LLC for Nektar Therapeutics filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Nektar Therapeutics. (lak)
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent AstraZeneca PLC for AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Nektar Therapeutics. (lak)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,012,469. (lak)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: No earlier than 11/5/2018. Date of Expiration of Patent: 4/4/2032. Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 5/5/2021. (lak)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - filed against Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2528116.) - filed by AstraZeneca AB, Nektar Therapeutics, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(lak)
December 18, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Apotex Corp. on 12/18/2018; Apotex Inc. on 12/18/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AstraZeneca AB et al v. Apotex Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Sumeet P. Dang
Represented By: Aaron P. Maurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AstraZeneca AB
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Sumeet P. Dang
Represented By: Aaron P. Maurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nektar Therapeutics
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Sumeet P. Dang
Represented By: Aaron P. Maurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Inc.
Represented By: Brian P. Murray
Represented By: Richard T. Ruzich
Represented By: Stephen R. Auten
Represented By: Andrew M. Alul
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Corp.
Represented By: Brian P. Murray
Represented By: Richard T. Ruzich
Represented By: Stephen R. Auten
Represented By: Andrew M. Alul
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?