Technical Services and Supplies General Trading and Contracting Co. W.L.L. v. Applied Biosystems International Inc.
Plaintiff: Technical Services and Supplies General Trading and Contracting Co. W.L.L.
Defendant: Applied Biosystems International Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02029
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 CASE CLOSED per D.I. #9 . (nms)
February 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Technical Services and Supplies General Trading and Contracting Co. W.L.L. as to Defendant Applied Biosystems International, Inc. (Nwaeze, Oderah)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to Motion to Dismiss Complaint to February 13, 2019 (*Reset Briefing Schedule: re #6 MOTION to Dismiss. Answering Brief due 2/13/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/30/2019. (nms)
January 29, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiff Technical Services and Supplies General Trading and Contracting Co. W.L.L to respond to Defendant Applied Biosystems International, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint to February 13, 2019 - filed by Technical Services and Supplies General Trading and Contracting Co. W.L.L.. (Nwaeze, Oderah)
January 16, 2019 Set Answering Brief Deadline re #6 MOTION to Dismiss. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/30/2019. (nms)
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc. for Applied Biosystems International Inc. filed by Applied Biosystems International Inc.. (Heyden, Michael)
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by Applied Biosystems International Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(Heyden, Michael) Modified on 1/16/2019 (nms).
January 9, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Brett L Messinger for Technical Services and Supplies General Trading and Contracting Co. W.L.L. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brett L. Messinger, filed by Technical Services and Supplies General Trading and Contracting Co. W.L.L.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/2/2019. (nms)
December 31, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brett L. Messinger - filed by Technical Services and Supplies General Trading and Contracting Co. W.L.L.. (Nwaeze, Oderah)
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Technical Services and Supplies General Trading and Contracting Co. W.L.L.. Applied Biosystems International Inc. served on 12/26/2018, answer due 1/16/2019. (Nwaeze, Oderah)
December 26, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 20, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Applied Biosystems International Inc. on 12/20/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (ddp)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Al-Essa Medical & Scientific Equipment Company W.L.L. for Technical Services and Supplies General Trading and Contracting Co. W.L.L. filed by Technical Services and Supplies General Trading and Contracting Co. W.L.L.. (ddp)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ddp)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR THE RECOGNITION OF FOREIGN COUNTRY MONEY JUDGMENT filed against Applied Biosystems International Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2529849.) - filed by Technical Services and Supplies General Trading and Contracting Co. W.L.L.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Technical Services and Supplies General Trading and Contracting Co. W.L.L. v. Applied Biosystems International Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Applied Biosystems International Inc.
Represented By: Michael C. Heyden, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Technical Services and Supplies General Trading and Contracting Co. W.L.L.
Represented By: Oderah C. Nwaeze
Represented By: Brett L Messinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?