Lutz v. Higgins et al

Plaintiff: Charles Lutz
Defendant: Samuel R. Saks, Matthew M. Gosling, Gavin T. Molinelli, Louis J. Lavigne, Jr., Robert G. Savage, James A. Schoeneck, William T. McKee, James L. Tyree, Arthur Joseph Higgins, August J. Moretti, Srinivas G. Rao, Karen A. Dawes, Vicente Anido, Jr., Peter D. Staple, David B. Zenoff and James P. Fogarty
Nominal Defendant: Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02044
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 REDACTED VERSION of #2 Complaint,, by Vicente Anido, Jr, Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Karen A. Dawes, James P. Fogarty, Matthew M. Gosling, Arthur Joseph Higgins, Louis J. Lavigne, Jr, William T. McKee, Gavin T. Molinelli, August J. Moretti, Srinivas G. Rao, Samuel R. Saks, Robert G. Savage, James A. Schoeneck, Peter D. Staple, James L. Tyree, David B. Zenoff. (Farnan, Kelly)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER To Stay Litigation granting #5 Stipulation, Case stayed. (See Stipulation and Order for further details and deadlines) Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/11/2019. (fms)
January 9, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Stay Litigation by Vicente Anido, Jr, Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Karen A. Dawes, James P. Fogarty, Matthew M. Gosling, Arthur Joseph Higgins, Louis J. Lavigne, Jr, William T. McKee, Gavin T. Molinelli, August J. Moretti, Srinivas G. Rao, Samuel R. Saks, Robert G. Savage, James A. Schoeneck, Peter D. Staple, James L. Tyree, David B. Zenoff. (Farnan, Kelly)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion to Seal Complaint. A redacted, public version of the Complaint shall be filed within seven (7) days of this Order. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/2/2019. (nmf)
December 26, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 26, 2018 Remark: Case submitted for routine judicial assignment. (nmg)
December 21, 2018 No Summons Issued. (nmg)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 [SEALED] Verified Stockholder Derivative COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Vicente Anido, Jr, Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Karen A. Dawes, James P. Fogarty, Matthew M. Gosling, Arthur Joseph Higgins, Louis J. Lavigne, Jr, William T. McKee, Gavin T. Molinelli, August J. Moretti, Srinivas G. Rao, Samuel R. Saks, Robert G. Savage, James A. Schoeneck, Peter D. Staple, James L. Tyree, David B. Zenoff - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2531073.) - filed by Charles Lutz. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to File Complaint Under Seal - filed by Charles Lutz. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lutz v. Higgins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel R. Saks
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew M. Gosling
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavin T. Molinelli
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis J. Lavigne, Jr.
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert G. Savage
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Schoeneck
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William T. McKee
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L. Tyree
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Joseph Higgins
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: August J. Moretti
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Srinivas G. Rao
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen A. Dawes
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicente Anido, Jr.
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter D. Staple
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David B. Zenoff
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James P. Fogarty
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Lutz
Represented By: Gina M. Serra
Represented By: Brian D. Long
Represented By: Seth D. Rigrodsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?