Adger et al v. Carney et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Crumpler, Antoine Jones, Eugene W. Wiggins, Andrew D. Long, Wade T. Smith, Michael A. Brown, Christopher H. West, Fred T. Caldwell, Alonzo I. Cannon, Tyrone Mathis, David R. Smith, Kevin McCray, Christopher Porter, Jermaine Dickerson, Chris E. Craig, Ryan Sinclair, Ivan Carabello, Aaron K. Carter, Sylvester C. Shockley, John E. Miller, Joseph Wallace, Pablo A. Damiani-Melendez, Nathaniel Bagwell, Kyair J. Fullman, Richard Woodard, Lamont L. Norman, Marquis Boyer-Smith, Theodore Harris, Antwan L. Douglas, Andre A. Rivera, Donald Cole, Henry R. Taylor, Jr., Nigel C. Skyes, Millard E. Price, Russell E. Steedley, James Lawhorne, Kurt Dupree, Jamel Daniels, Dennis O. Willians, Jarad Brown, De Shawn Drumgo, Steven Drake, Raymond H. Wood, Keith J. Miller, Fenel D. Baine, James G. Wells, Charles T. Getz, Robert L. Adger, Kelly L. Hand, Donald D. Parkell, Donald F. Bass, Kenjuan Congo, Joseph N. Bennett, Ben Roten, Daniel E. Schultz, Tony Mozick, Alan Brooks, Justin L. Burrell, Gerard E. Szubielski, Edward McLaughlin, Ronald L. Snead, Brian Conley, Krishan Dillard, Gabriel J. Wallace, Joshua D. Sears, Orin L. Turner, Cornell L. Hester, Kevin C. Brathwaite, Luis G. Cabrera, John C. Mayhew, David McCullough, Dymere T. Berry, Lionel M. Walley, Victor Grantham, Shaquille K. Jackson, Richard D. McCane, Howard A. Walsh, Dana B. Martin, Monir A. George, Marvin Mencia, Regent J. Goddard, Michael L. Wells, Maurice Cruz-Webster, John R. Dupree, Louis W. Rittenhouse, Darrin L. Swiggett, Lamont E. Stevenson, Frederick O. Clifton, Henry J. Anderson, Eubanks White, Calvin L. Allen, Alfred M. Lewis, Jr., Curtis M. Collins, Cliff Wilson, Robert L. Worley, Samuel B. Bishop, Ronaldo Williams, John Boyer, Raymond Q. Sawyer, Elwood E. Teagle, Hassan J. Perry, Keenan Wheeler, Michael A. Carello, David D. Foreman, Ezra S. Pendleton, Micheal E. Keyser, Claude LaComb, Anthony J. Ortiz, Greg Dickson, Ron Roundtree, Marcus Rosser, Jeffrey R. Fogg, Larry J. Sartin, Mark C. Purnell, Robert W. Chandler, Deric Forney, Stephanie Cabrera, Terek Downing and James J. Durham
Defendant: Sgt. Ronald Frederick, Lt. Justin Atherholt, Governor John Carney, C/O Richard L. Griffith, Deputy Warden Phil Parker, Lt. Larry Savage, Sgt. Vincent E. Hazzard, Warden Timothy Radcliff, Lt. James P. Satterfield, Major Jeffrey Carruthers, C/O Norman Figueroa, Jr., Lt. Melvin B. Harris, III, C/O Joshua A. Connor, C/O Michael J. Arabia, Former Commissioner Robert Coupe, C/O William Estrada, Sgt. Vincent May, C/O Michael Chester Landon, Deputy Warden James Scarborough, C/O Thomas Patrick Runyon, Jr., C/O Paul O. Barone, Lt. Sean R. Milligan, Lt. George J. Gill, Lt. Charles D. Sennett, Jr., C/O Aaron Forkum, Sgt. Lawrence O. Coverdale, Sgt. John R. Faulkner, Jr., C/O Abigail West, C/O Jack Evans, C/O Joshua D. Stewart, Lt. Jason T. Coviello, Lt. Nathan D. Atherhold, Sgt. Todd Scott Drace, Sgt. Robert Mock, Sgt. Kevin R. McKenna, C/O Brett Foraker, Sgt. Charles H. Radcliffe, Sgt. Wilfred Beckles, Commissioner Perry Phelps, Lt. Karen Hawkins, Lt. Teddy D. Tyson, Sgt. Dennis P. Russell, Cpl. Nathaniel C. Payton, Warden Dana Metzger, Warden David Pierce, Cpl. Dale Lee Rains, Captain Bruce Burton, C/O Joshua Peppers, C/O Timothy R. Young, C/O Lance N. Green and Robert May
Case Number: 1:2018cv02048
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert L. Adger. Abigail West served on 2/17/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (Hampton, Stephen)
February 21, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert L. Adger. Jeffrey Carruthers served on 2/16/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (Hampton, Stephen)
February 21, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert L. Adger. Robert May served on 2/11/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (Hampton, Stephen)
February 21, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: Entries previously filed at D.I. 11 and 12 were filed incorrectly and have been removed. Counsel will re-file using the correct event code. (nmg)
February 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Notice of Dismissal of all Civil Claims of Plaintiff Michael A. Carello by Robert L. Adger (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hampton, Stephen)
February 14, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Dismissal of all civil claims of Plaintiff Donald D. Parkell - filed by Robert L. Adger. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hampton, Stephen)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Amended Complaint to March 15, 2019 filed by John Carney. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/14/19. (ntl)
February 13, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Amended Complaint to March 15, 2019 - filed by John Carney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cochran, C.)
February 13, 2019 Address updated per: #7 Notice of Change of Address as to Kevin Brathwaite. (rwc)
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kevin C. Brathwaite (lak)
February 5, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Jeffrey Carruthers on 2/5/2019; Robert May 2/5/2019; Abigail West. (sar)
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants - filed by Robert L. Adger, Terek Downing, Stephanie Cabrera, James J. Durham, Deric Forney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Answers to Form 30's from original Superior Court filing, #5 Rule 3h Responses from original Superior Court filing)(Hampton, Stephen)
February 4, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: Removed Amended Complaint to be re-filed by Counsel. (rwc)
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert B. Young on behalf of Aaron Forkum (Young, Robert)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from C. Malcolm Cochran, IV regarding statement identifying pending matters. (Cochran, C.)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #3 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME DOC Defendants to Respond to Complaint to February 15, 2019 filed by John R. Faulkner, Jr., Lance N. Green, Norman Figueroa, Jr., Lawrence O. Coverdale, Nathaniel C. Payton, Phil Parker, Jason T. Coviello, Teddy D. Tyson, Justin Atherholt, Joshua A. Connor, Perry Phelps, James P. Satterfield, Joshua D. Stewart, Kevin R. McKenna, Paul O. Barone, Bruce Burton, Ronald Frederick, Melvin B. Harris, III, Sean R. Milligan, Joshua Peppers, William Estrada, Robert Coupe, Vincent May, Charles D. Sennett, Jr., Thomas Patrick Runyon, Jr., Brett Foraker, Michael J. Arabia, George J. Gill, Karen Hawkins, Wilfred Beckles, Nathan D. Atherhold, Vincent E. Hazzard, James Scarborough, Michael Chester Landon, Richard L. Griffith, Robert Mock, Dana Metzger. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/9/19. (ntl)
January 2, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
January 2, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME DOC Defendants to Respond to Complaint to February 15, 2019 - filed by Michael J. Arabia, Nathan D. Atherhold, Justin Atherholt, Paul O. Barone, Wilfred Beckles, Bruce Burton, Joshua A. Connor, Robert Coupe, Lawrence O. Coverdale, Jason T. Coviello, William Estrada, John R. Faulkner, Jr, Norman Figueroa, Jr, Brett Foraker, Ronald Frederick, George J. Gill, Lance N. Green, Richard L. Griffith, Melvin B. Harris, III, Karen Hawkins, Vincent E. Hazzard, Michael Chester Landon, Vincent May, Kevin R. McKenna, Dana Metzger, Sean R. Milligan, Robert Mock, Phil Parker, Nathaniel C. Payton, Joshua Peppers, Perry Phelps, Thomas Patrick Runyon, Jr, James P. Satterfield, James Scarborough, Charles D. Sennett, Jr, Joshua D. Stewart, Teddy D. Tyson. (Taylor, James)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ddp)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior Court, Case Number N18C-10-340 EMD CCLD (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0311-2531264)- filed by Governor John Carney, Thomas Patrick Runyon, Jr, Paul O. Barone, Joshua A. Connor, Robert Mock, Dana Metzger, Nathaniel C. Payton, Lance N. Green, Ronald Frederick, Charles D. Sennett, Jr, Bruce Burton, Norman Figueroa, Jr, Robert Coupe, Michael J. Arabia, James Scarborough, Richard L. Griffith, John R. Faulkner, Jr, Teddy D. Tyson, Jason T. Coviello, Sean R. Milligan, Melvin B. Harris, III, Lawrence O. Coverdale, Karen Hawkins, William Estrada, Michael Chester Landon, James P. Satterfield, Justin Atherholt, Joshua Peppers, George J. Gill, Vincent May, Kevin R. McKenna, Phil Parker, Nathan D. Atherhold, Vincent E. Hazzard, Wilfred Beckles, Perry Phelps, Brett Foraker, Joshua D. Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adger et al v. Carney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Crumpler
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoine Jones
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene W. Wiggins
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew D. Long
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wade T. Smith
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Brown
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher H. West
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred T. Caldwell
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alonzo I. Cannon
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Mathis
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David R. Smith
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin McCray
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Porter
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jermaine Dickerson
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris E. Craig
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Sinclair
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivan Carabello
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron K. Carter
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvester C. Shockley
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John E. Miller
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Wallace
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pablo A. Damiani-Melendez
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Bagwell
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyair J. Fullman
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Woodard
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamont L. Norman
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquis Boyer-Smith
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore Harris
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antwan L. Douglas
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre A. Rivera
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Cole
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry R. Taylor, Jr.
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nigel C. Skyes
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Millard E. Price
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell E. Steedley
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Lawhorne
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kurt Dupree
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamel Daniels
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis O. Willians
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarad Brown
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: De Shawn Drumgo
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Drake
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond H. Wood
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith J. Miller
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fenel D. Baine
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James G. Wells
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles T. Getz
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Adger
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly L. Hand
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald D. Parkell
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald F. Bass
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenjuan Congo
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph N. Bennett
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ben Roten
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel E. Schultz
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Mozick
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Brooks
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin L. Burrell
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerard E. Szubielski
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward McLaughlin
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald L. Snead
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Conley
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krishan Dillard
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel J. Wallace
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua D. Sears
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orin L. Turner
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornell L. Hester
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin C. Brathwaite
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis G. Cabrera
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John C. Mayhew
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David McCullough
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dymere T. Berry
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lionel M. Walley
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Grantham
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaquille K. Jackson
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard D. McCane
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard A. Walsh
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana B. Martin
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monir A. George
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Mencia
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regent J. Goddard
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael L. Wells
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Cruz-Webster
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John R. Dupree
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis W. Rittenhouse
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrin L. Swiggett
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamont E. Stevenson
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick O. Clifton
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry J. Anderson
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eubanks White
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin L. Allen
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred M. Lewis, Jr.
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis M. Collins
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cliff Wilson
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Worley
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel B. Bishop
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronaldo Williams
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Boyer
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Q. Sawyer
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elwood E. Teagle
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hassan J. Perry
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keenan Wheeler
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Carello
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David D. Foreman
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ezra S. Pendleton
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micheal E. Keyser
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claude LaComb
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony J. Ortiz
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Dickson
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Roundtree
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Rosser
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey R. Fogg
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry J. Sartin
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark C. Purnell
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert W. Chandler
Represented By: Zachary Abele George
Represented By: Anthony Vito Panicola
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deric Forney
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Cabrera
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terek Downing
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James J. Durham
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Ronald Frederick
Represented By: James Darlington Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Justin Atherholt
Represented By: James Darlington Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor John Carney
Represented By: Chad Michael Shandler
Represented By: Christine Dealy Haynes
Represented By: C. Malcolm Cochran, IV
Represented By: Katharine Lester Mowery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Richard L. Griffith
Represented By: James Darlington Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Warden Phil Parker
Represented By: James Darlington Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Larry Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Vincent E. Hazzard
Represented By: James Darlington Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Timothy Radcliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. James P. Satterfield
Represented By: James Darlington Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Jeffrey Carruthers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Norman Figueroa, Jr.
Represented By: James Darlington Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Melvin B. Harris, III
Represented By: James Darlington Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Joshua A. Connor
Represented By: James Darlington Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Michael J. Arabia
Represented By: James Darlington Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Former Commissioner Robert Coupe
Represented By: James Darlington Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O William Estrada
Represented By: James Darlington Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Vincent May
Represented By: James Darlington Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Michael Chester Landon
Represented By: James Darlington Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Warden James Scarborough
Represented By: James Darlington Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Thomas Patrick Runyon, Jr.
Represented By: James Darlington Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Paul O. Barone
Represented By: James Darlington Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Sean R. Milligan
Represented By: James Darlington Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. George J. Gill
Represented By: James Darlington Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Charles D. Sennett, Jr.
Represented By: James Darlington Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Aaron Forkum
Represented By: Robert B. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Lawrence O. Coverdale
Represented By: James Darlington Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. John R. Faulkner, Jr.
Represented By: James Darlington Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Abigail West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Jack Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Joshua D. Stewart
Represented By: James Darlington Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Jason T. Coviello
Represented By: James Darlington Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Nathan D. Atherhold
Represented By: James Darlington Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Todd Scott Drace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Robert Mock
Represented By: James Darlington Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Kevin R. McKenna
Represented By: James Darlington Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Brett Foraker
Represented By: James Darlington Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Charles H. Radcliffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Wilfred Beckles
Represented By: James Darlington Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Perry Phelps
Represented By: James Darlington Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Karen Hawkins
Represented By: James Darlington Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Teddy D. Tyson
Represented By: James Darlington Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Dennis P. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cpl. Nathaniel C. Payton
Represented By: James Darlington Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Dana Metzger
Represented By: James Darlington Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden David Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cpl. Dale Lee Rains
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Bruce Burton
Represented By: James Darlington Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Joshua Peppers
Represented By: James Darlington Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Timothy R. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Lance N. Green
Represented By: James Darlington Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?