Realtime Data LLC v. Aryaka Networks, Inc.

Plaintiff: Realtime Data LLC
Defendant: Aryaka Networks, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02062
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, / Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Defendant Aryaka Networks, Inc. to Respond to the Complaint until March 25, 2019 filed by Realtime Data LLC. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Aryaka Networks, Inc. answer due 3/25/2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 2/21/2019. (fms)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, / Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Defendant Aryaka Networks, Inc. to Respond to the Complaint until March 25, 2019 - filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, until February 25, 2019 filed by Realtime Data LLC, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Aryaka Networks, Inc. answer due 2/25/2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/25/2019. (fms)
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, until February 25, 2019 - filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen)
January 14, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Jay C. Chung, Marc A. Fenster, Paul Kroeger, and Reza Mirzaie for Realtime Data LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-02062-CFC, 1:19-cv-00031-CFC(ddp)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (5 in 1:19-cv-00031-CFC, 5 in 1:18-cv-02062-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney C. Jay Chung, Marc A. Fenster, Reza Mirzaie, and Paul A. Kroeger filed by Realtime Data LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/11/2019. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-02062-CFC, 1:19-cv-00031-CFC(fms)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney C. Jay Chung, Marc A. Fenster, Reza Mirzaie, and Paul A. Kroeger - filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Marc A. Fenster, #2 Certification of Reza Mirzaie, #3 Certification of C. Jay Chung, #4 Certification of Paul A. Kroeger)(Brauerman, Stephen)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Realtime Data LLC. Aryaka Networks, Inc. served on 1/4/2019, answer due 1/25/2019. (Brauerman, Stephen)
January 2, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 28, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Aryaka Networks, Inc. on 12/28/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (lak)
December 28, 2018 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,054,728 ;9,667,751 ;7,415,530 ;9,116,908. (lak)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against Aryaka Networks, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2533058.) - filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Realtime Data LLC v. Aryaka Networks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Realtime Data LLC
Represented By: Stephen B. Brauerman
Represented By: Sara E. Bussiere
Represented By: Reza Mirzaie
Represented By: Jay C. Chung
Represented By: Paul Kroeger
Represented By: Marc A. Fenster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aryaka Networks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?