Inventergy LBS, LLC v. Global Cloud Fleet Inc.

Plaintiff: Inventergy LBS, LLC
Defendant: Global Cloud Fleet Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02063
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Ricardo J. Bonilla,Neil J. McNabnay for Global Cloud Fleet Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Neil J. McNabnay and Ricardo J. Bonilla filed by Global Cloud Fleet Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/8/19. (ntl)
February 1, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Neil J. McNabnay and Ricardo J. Bonilla - filed by Global Cloud Fleet Inc.. (Anderson, Jeremy)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER Complaint to February 27, 2019 filed by Global Cloud Fleet Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/29/19. (ntl)
January 25, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER Complaint to February 27, 2019 - filed by Global Cloud Fleet Inc.. (Anderson, Jeremy)
January 9, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark (related to 1:18-cv-01801-LPS and 1:19-cv-00028-LPS). Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-02063-LPS, 1:18-cv-02064-LPS (rjb)
January 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Inventergy LBS, LLC. Global Cloud Fleet Inc. served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019. (Devlin, Timothy)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Inventergy LBS, LLC. (Devlin, Timothy)
January 2, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-02063-CFC, 1:18-cv-02064-CFC (rjb)
December 28, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Global Cloud Fleet Inc. on 12/28/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (lak)
December 28, 2018 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 9,219,978 B2. (lak)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against Global Cloud Fleet Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2533524.) - filed by Inventergy LBS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Inventergy LBS, LLC v. Global Cloud Fleet Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inventergy LBS, LLC
Represented By: Timothy Devlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Cloud Fleet Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy Douglas Anderson
Represented By: Neil J. McNabnay
Represented By: Ricardo J. Bonilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?