Inventergy LBS, LLC v. Xirgo Technologies, LLC

Plaintiff: Inventergy LBS, LLC
Defendant: Xirgo Technologies, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv02064
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to April 1, 2019 - filed by Inventergy LBS, LLC. (Devlin, Timothy)
January 25, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: Stipulation filed at D.I. 8 was removed from the docket at the request of counsel. (ntl)
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 Alias SUMMONS Returned Executed by Inventergy LBS, LLC. Xirgo Technologies, LLC served on 1/18/2019, answer due 2/8/2019. (Devlin, Timothy)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to February 27, 2019 filed by Inventergy LBS, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/17/19. (ntl)
January 17, 2019 Summons Reissued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Xirgo Technologies, LLC. (sar)
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to February 27, 2019 - filed by Inventergy LBS, LLC. (Devlin, Timothy)
January 9, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark (related to 1:18-cv-01801-LPS and 1:19-cv-00028-LPS). Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-02063-LPS, 1:18-cv-02064-LPS (rjb)
January 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Inventergy LBS, LLC. Xirgo Technologies, LLC served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019. (Devlin, Timothy)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Inventergy LBS, LLC. (Devlin, Timothy)
January 2, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-02063-CFC, 1:18-cv-02064-CFC (rjb)
December 28, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Xirgo Technologies, LLC on 12/28/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (lak)
December 28, 2018 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 9,781,558 B2. (lak)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against Xirgo Technologies, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2533529.) - filed by Inventergy LBS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Inventergy LBS, LLC v. Xirgo Technologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xirgo Technologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inventergy LBS, LLC
Represented By: Timothy Devlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?