Commtech IP LLC v. Avaya Inc.

Plaintiff: Commtech IP LLC
Defendant: Avaya Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02065
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Filing 8 Alias SUMMONS Returned Executed by Commtech IP LLC. Avaya Inc. served on 1/18/2019, answer due 2/27/2019. (Devlin, Timothy)
January 17, 2019 Summons Reissued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Avaya Inc. (nmg)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to February 27, 2019 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Avaya Inc. answer due 2/27/2019). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/11/2019. (dlw)
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to February 27, 2019 - filed by Commtech IP LLC. (Devlin, Timothy)
January 10, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney David R. Bennett for Commtech IP LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-02065-MN, 1:18-cv-02066-MN, 1:18-cv-02067-MN, 1:18-cv-02068-MN(ceg)
January 8, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Commtech IP LLC. Avaya Inc. served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019. (Devlin, Timothy)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David R. Bennett filed by Commtech IP LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/7/2019. (dlw)
January 7, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David R. Bennett - filed by Commtech IP LLC. (Devlin, Timothy)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Commtech IP LLC. (Devlin, Timothy)
January 2, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-02065-MN, 1:18-cv-02066-MN, 1:18-cv-02067-MN, 1:18-cv-02068-MN (rjb)
December 28, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Avaya Inc. on 12/28/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (ceg)
December 28, 2018 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,577,715 B1. (ceg)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ceg)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Avaya Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2533538.) - filed by Commtech IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ceg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Commtech IP LLC v. Avaya Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avaya Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commtech IP LLC
Represented By: Timothy Devlin
Represented By: David R. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?