Keller v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Melanie Keller
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02077
Filed: December 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Settlement as to Equifax only by Melanie Keller (Garibian, Antranig)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer complaint to February 28, 2019 filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 2/28/2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/30/2019. (fms)
January 29, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer complaint to February 28, 2019 - filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Grivner, Karen)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to April 1, 2019 filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 4/1/2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/28/2019. (fms)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to April 1, 2019 - filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Hunter, Travis)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melanie Keller. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 1/8/2019, answer due 1/29/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melanie Keller. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 1/8/2019, answer due 1/29/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
January 2, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
January 2, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Equifax Information Services, LLC on 1/2/2019; Experian Information Solutions, Inc. on 1/2/2019. (Summons forms mailed to Counsel at Philadelphia office). (rwc)
December 31, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc)
December 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2533993.) - filed by Melanie Keller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(rwc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keller v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Karen M. Grivner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Travis Steven Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Keller
Represented By: Antranig N. Garibian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?