Burmeister et al v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Joshua Burmeister and Kristin Burmeister
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Trans Union, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv02078
Filed: December 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Settlement as to Equifax only by Joshua Burmeister, Kristin Burmeister (Garibian, Antranig)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer complaint to February 28, 2019 filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 2/28/2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/30/2019. (fms)
January 29, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer complaint to February 28, 2019 - filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Grivner, Karen)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to April 1, 2019 filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 4/1/2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/28/2019. (fms)
January 28, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Trans Union, LLC.(Bennett, Blake)
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to April 1, 2019 - filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Hunter, Travis)
January 15, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Christopher A. Ferguson for Trans Union, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
January 15, 2019 Corporate Affiliates/Parents added per Disclosure Statement: identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC. (fms)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher A. Ferguson filed by Trans Union, LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/15/2019. (fms)
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher A. Ferguson - filed by Trans Union, LLC. (Bennett, Blake)
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC filed by Trans Union, LLC. (Bennett, Blake)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua Burmeister, Kristin Burmeister. Trans Union, LLC served on 1/8/2019, answer due 1/29/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua Burmeister, Kristin Burmeister. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 1/8/2019, answer due 1/29/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua Burmeister, Kristin Burmeister. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 1/8/2019, answer due 1/29/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
January 2, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
January 2, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Equifax Information Services, LLC on 1/2/2019; Experian Information Solutions, Inc. on 1/2/2019; Trans Union, LLC on 1/2/2019. (Summons forms mailed to counsel at Philadelphia office). (rwc)
December 31, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc)
December 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2533994.) - filed by Joshua Burmeister, Kristin Burmeister. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(rwc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burmeister et al v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Karen M. Grivner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Travis Steven Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Represented By: Christopher A. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Burmeister
Represented By: Antranig N. Garibian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Burmeister
Represented By: Antranig N. Garibian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?