Madril v. Ad Astra Recovery Services, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Mark Madril
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Ad Astra Recovery Services, Inc. and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02079
Filed: December 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate Vantagescore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Hunter, Travis)
February 27, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Hunter, Travis)
February 27, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra M. Ewing on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Ewing, Alexandra)
February 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Settlement as to Equifax only by Mark Madril (Garibian, Antranig)
February 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Mark Madril as to Ad Astra Recovery Services only (Garibian, Antranig)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer complaint to February 27, 2019 filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/29/19. (ntl)
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer complaint to February 27, 2019 - filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Grivner, Karen)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to February 27, 2019 filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/17/19. (ntl)
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Settlement as to Ad Astra Recovery Services only by Mark Madril (Garibian, Antranig)
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to February 27, 2019 - filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Hunter, Travis)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Madril. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Madril. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Madril. Ad Astra Recovery Services, Inc. served on 1/8/2019, answer due 1/29/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
January 2, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
January 2, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Ad Astra Recovery Services, Inc. on 1/2/2019; Equifax Information Services, LLC on 1/2/2019; Experian Information Solutions, Inc. on 1/2/2019. (Summons mailed to Philadelphia office per filing party's request) (lak)
December 31, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
December 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against Ad Astra Recovery Services, Inc., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2533998.) - filed by Mark Madril. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Madril v. Ad Astra Recovery Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Karen M. Grivner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ad Astra Recovery Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Represented By: Travis Steven Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Madril
Represented By: Antranig N. Garibian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?