Gilbert et al v. Aurora Pump Company et al
Plaintiff: Anne Gilbert and Donald Gilbert
Defendant: SB Decking, Inc.., Blackmer Pump Company, Cytec Industries, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., ITT Corporation, Shell Oil Company, Union Carbide Corporation, EWB Corporation, General Electric Company, Aurora Pump Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Velan Valve Corporation, Crane Co., Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, CBS Corporation, Henkel Corporation, IMO Industries, Inc., The William Powell Company and Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00011
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Sherry R Fallon
Referring Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2019 Filing 65 MOTION to Amend/Correct - filed by Anne Gilbert. (Attachments: # #4 7.1.1 Statement, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(deBruin, David) Modified on 5/3/2019 (lih).
May 1, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 22 slides and 13 blocks created by Dr. John Maddox from lung retrieval of Decendent, Donald Gilbert filed by Aurora Pump Company.(deBruin, David)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 SO ORDERED re #62 Stipulation of Dismissal. Party IMO Industries, Inc. (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to DELAVAL TURBINE, INC. and successor-in-interest to C. H. WHEELER MANUFACTURING COMPANY) terminated. Attorney Eileen M. Ford and Megan Trocki Mantzavinos terminated. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/29/2019. (dlw)
March 29, 2019 Filing 62 STIPULATION of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE by IMO Industries, Inc.. (Ford, Eileen) Modified on 3/29/2019 (lih).
March 22, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Witness and Exhibit List and Notice of Adoption filed by Donald Gilbert.(deBruin, David)
March 21, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Pathology Slides filed by Donald Gilbert.(deBruin, David)
March 21, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Medical, billing and ss records filed by Donald Gilbert.(deBruin, David)
March 21, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by EWB Corporation.(Texter, Allison)
March 21, 2019 Filing 57 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Front Street Management Inc., Other Affiliate CBS Operations, Inc. for EWB Corporation filed by EWB Corporation. (Texter, Allison)
March 21, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Velan Valve Corporation.(Bradley, Paul)
March 21, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Cytec Industries, Inc..(Bradley, Paul)
March 21, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Aurora Pump Company.(Bradley, Paul)
March 20, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Blackmer Pump Company's Federal Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Blackmer Pump Company.(Doner, Joel)
March 20, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE OF SERVICE of [AMENDED NOTICE OF SERVICE] Defendant Shell Oil Company's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure Statement filed by Shell Oil Company.(Bilson, David)
March 20, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Shell Oil Company's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure Statement filed by Shell Oil Company.(Bilson, David)
March 18, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant IMO Industries Inc.'s Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure filed by IMO Industries, Inc..(Ford, Eileen)
March 14, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Service filed by The William Powell Company.(Seelaus, Anne)
March 14, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by SB Decking, Inc...(Viceconte, Christopher)
March 12, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Warren Pumps, LLC.(Tyler, Jessica)
March 12, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Henkel Corporation.(Smith, Bryan)
March 12, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by General Electric Company.(Texter, Allison)
March 12, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Crane Co..(Gondek, Francis)
March 11, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon for Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at # http://www.ded.uscourts.gov/general-orders/magistrate-judges-standing-order-adr-mediation (cak)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 4/30/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 4/30/2019. Discovery due by 12/10/2019. Status Report due by 12/16/2019. A Status Conference is set for 1/6/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon Dispositive Motions due by 1/10/2020.. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/11/2019. (lih)
March 11, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Telephone Conference held on 3/11/2019. (Court Reporter D. Hawkins.) (lih)
March 11, 2019 Filing 42 Letter to Magistrate Judge Fallon from Bryan P. Smith, Esquire regarding Union Carbide Corporation's Dismissal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Smith, Bryan)
March 5, 2019 Filing 41 Joint PROPOSED Scheduling Order by Crane Co.. (Gondek, Francis) Modified on 3/5/2019 (lih).
March 5, 2019 Filing 40 Letter to U.S. Magistrate Judge S. R. Fallon from Francis C. Gondek, Esq. as Defense Liaison regarding Joint Proposed Scheduling Order. (Gondek, Francis)
February 27, 2019 Filing 39 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Atwood & Morrill Company Inc. for Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. filed by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.. (Grabey, Elizabeth)
February 27, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Grabey on behalf of Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. (Grabey, Elizabeth)
February 26, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis C. Gondek on behalf of Crane Co. (Gondek, Francis)
February 12, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures filed by Anne Gilbert.(deBruin, David)
February 12, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the discovery previously filed as D.I. 36 pursuant to L.R. 5.4(b). (lih)
February 1, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The text of D.I. #34 has been modified to reflect that the document is a ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal). It is requested that counsel use the ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) event code when filing documents of this nature in the future. (lih)
February 1, 2019 Filing 35 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Colfax Corporation, Other Affiliate IMO for Warren Pumps, LLC filed by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Tyler, Jessica)
February 1, 2019 Filing 34 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Warren Pumps, LLC.(Tyler, Jessica) Modified on 2/1/2019 (lih).
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) CONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) A scheduling teleconference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) will be held on 3/11/2019 at 10:00 a.m. Counsel for Plaintiff shall organize and initiate the teleconference to the Chambers of Sherry R. Fallon at 302-573-4557. (2) The parties are required to prepare for the teleconference by conferring on all matters under Rule 16 and D. Del. LR 16 and shall submit a proposed Scheduling Order to the Court no later than 3/6/2019. The Court's form asbestos scheduling order is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Fallon, Forms). If the parties have any suggestions or modifications to the standard Scheduling Order, they may be included in the proposed order for consideration by the Court. (3) If any disputed issue exists regarding the proposed Scheduling Order, it shall be noted therein, along with the parties proposed language on the issue for consideration by the Court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 1/31/2019. (lih)
January 31, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Lee Tyler on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC (Tyler, Jessica)
January 29, 2019 Filing 32 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by Blackmer Pump Company. (Doner, Joel)
January 29, 2019 Filing 31 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from David deBruin regarding in response to 1/25/19 Order. (deBruin, David) Modified on 1/30/2019 (lih).
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SO ORDERED re #29 Stipulation of Dismissal. Party CBS Corporation (a Delaware Corporation) terminated. Attorney Beth E. Valocchi terminated as to CBS Corporation only. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/28/2019. (dlw)
January 28, 2019 Filing 29 STIPULATION of Dismissal by CBS Corporation. (Texter, Allison)
January 25, 2019 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Viking Pump, Inc.. (Sullivan, Timothy)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER- Within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order: (1) Plaintiff(s) shall submit a statement to the Court that: (a) identifies those Defendants who have not yet been served with the Complaint; (b) identifies those Defendants who have been served with the Complaint but have not yet filed an Answer; (c) provides any reason why a Rule 16 conference should not occur within 30 days of the date of its submission; and (d) notes any other pending matters which require judicial action. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 1/25/2019. (lih)
January 24, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Change of Address by David W. deBruin (deBruin, David)
January 22, 2019 Filing 25 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation, Corporate Parent IMO Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent CLFX, LLC for IMO Industries, Inc. filed by IMO Industries, Inc.. (Ford, Eileen)
January 22, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Eileen M. Ford on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. (Ford, Eileen)
January 22, 2019 Filing 23 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent IDEX Corporation for Viking Pump, Inc. filed by Viking Pump, Inc.. (Sullivan, Timothy)
January 18, 2019 Filing 22 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Pfizer Inc. for Cytec Industries, Inc. filed by Cytec Industries, Inc.. (Bradley, Paul)
January 17, 2019 Filing 21 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent SPX Corporation for Aurora Pump Company filed by Aurora Pump Company. (Bradley, Paul)
January 15, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy A. Sullivan, III on behalf of Viking Pump, Inc. (Sullivan, Timothy)
January 14, 2019 Filing 19 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by The William Powell Company. (Seelaus, Anne)
January 14, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Kai Seelaus on behalf of The William Powell Company (Seelaus, Anne)
January 14, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Bilson on behalf of Shell Oil Company (Bilson, David)
January 14, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Phillips, Jr on behalf of Shell Oil Company (Phillips, John)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Dana C. Simon. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 1/11/2019. (lih)
January 11, 2019 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Quaker Chemical Company for SB Decking, Inc.. filed by SB Decking, Inc... (Viceconte, Christopher)
January 11, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Viceconte on behalf of SB Decking, Inc.. (Viceconte, Christopher)
January 11, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Dana C. Simon - filed by Anne Gilbert, Donald Gilbert. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Dana C. Simon, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(deBruin, David)
January 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A. Bradley on behalf of Cytec Industries, Inc. (Bradley, Paul)
January 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A. Bradley on behalf of Aurora Pump Company (Bradley, Paul)
January 10, 2019 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Velan Inc. for Velan Valve Corporation filed by Velan Valve Corporation. (Bradley, Paul)
January 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A. Bradley on behalf of Velan Valve Corporation (Bradley, Paul)
January 9, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon. (rjb)
January 9, 2019 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Other Affiliate Viacom Inc., Other Affiliate National Amusements, Inc., Other Affiliate NAI Entertainment Holdings LLC for CBS Corporation filed by CBS Corporation. (Valocchi, Beth)
January 9, 2019 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate General Electric Capital Corporation, Other Affiliate GE Capital, Other Affiliate NBC Universal Inc., Other Affiliate GE Capital Equity, Other Affiliate General Electric Capital Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Universal City Development Partners, Ltd., Other Affiliate NBC Universal Media, LLC (a/k/a NBC Universal), Other Affiliate Value Vision Media, Inc. for General Electric Company filed by General Electric Company. (Texter, Allison)
January 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison L. Texter on behalf of General Electric Company (Texter, Allison)
January 9, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
January 9, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Dexter Hysol Aerospace, LLC, Other Affiliate Henkel AG & Co. KGaA, Other Affiliate Henkel of America, Inc.,, Other Affiliate Henkel of America I LLC, Other Affiliate Henkel US Operations Corporation for Henkel Corporation filed by Henkel Corporation. (Valocchi, Beth)
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth E. Valocchi on behalf of Henkel Corporation (Valocchi, Beth)
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Crane Co.. (sar)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sar)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from Superior Court of the State of Delaware, Case Number N18C-08-128 ASB (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0311-2536519)- filed by Crane Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 3B, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 4A, #7 Exhibit 4A-1, #8 Exhibit 4B-C, #9 Exhibit 4D-F, #10 Exhibit 4G, #11 Exhibit 4H-I, #12 Exhibit 4J-K, #13 Exhibit 4L-M, #14 Exhibit 4N, #15 Exhibit 4O, #16 Exhibit 4P-Q, #17 Exhibit 4R-S, #18 Exhibit 4T, #19 Exhibit 4U, #20 Exhibit 5, #21 Exhibit 5A, #22 Exhibit 5A-5, #23 Exhibit 5A-7, #24 Exhibit 5A-16, #25 Exhibit 5A-19, #26 Exhibit 5A-24, #27 Exhibit 5A-26, #28 Exhibit 5A-27, #29 Exhibit 6, #30 certicate of compliance, #31 Civil Cover Sheet)(sar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilbert et al v. Aurora Pump Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SB Decking, Inc..
Represented By: Christopher Viceconte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackmer Pump Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cytec Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Donald Robert Kinsley
Represented By: Paul A. Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Pump, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy A. Sullivan, III
Represented By: James J. Horning, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Company
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EWB Corporation
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Represented By: Donald Robert Kinsley
Represented By: Paul A. Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corporation
Represented By: Donald Robert Kinsley
Represented By: Paul A. Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Nicholas E. Skiles
Represented By: Francis C. Gondek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Ana Marina McCann
Represented By: Armand J. Della Porta, Jr.
Represented By: Jessica Lee Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henkel Corporation
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Eileen M. Ford
Represented By: Megan Trocki Mantzavinos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The William Powell Company
Represented By: Anne Kai Seelaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Grabey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Gilbert
Represented By: David W. deBruin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Gilbert
Represented By: David W. deBruin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?