Meyer v. Discover Bank et al

Plaintiff: Angeline Meyer
Defendant: Discover Bank and Equifax Information Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00019
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Settlement as to Equifax only by Angeline Meyer (Garibian, Antranig)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer complaint to March 6, 2019 filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/6/19. (ntl)
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer complaint to March 6, 2019 - filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Grivner, Karen)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Angeline Meyer. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 1/14/2019, answer due 2/4/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Angeline Meyer. Discover Bank served on 1/14/2019, answer due 2/4/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
January 9, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
January 7, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Discover Bank on 1/7/2019; Equifax Information Services, LLC on 1/7/2019. (Summons mailed to Philadelphia office per filing party's request.) (lak)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Discover Bank, Equifax Information Services, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2537107.) - filed by Angeline Meyer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meyer v. Discover Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angeline Meyer
Represented By: Antranig N. Garibian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discover Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Karen M. Grivner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?