Eaton v. Archtelecom

Plaintiff: Chavez Eaton
Defendant: Archtelecom
Case Number: 1:2019cv00026
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2003
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (D.I. #1 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/10/2019. (lak) Modified on 1/11/2019 (nms).
January 9, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel - filed by Chavez Eaton. (ceg)
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ceg)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed Pro Se against Archtelecom - filed by Chavez Eaton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ceg)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (*originally filed 11/27/18 without complaint) - filed by Chavez Eaton. (ceg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eaton v. Archtelecom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archtelecom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chavez Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?