Realtime Data LLC v. Masergy Communications, Inc.

Plaintiff: Realtime Data LLC
Defendant: Masergy Communications, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00031
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, / Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Defendant Masergy Communications, Inc. to Respond to the Complaint until April 1, 2019 filed by Realtime Data LLC, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Masergy Communications, Inc. answer due 4/1/2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/4/2019. (fms)
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, / Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Defendant Masergy Communications, Inc. to Respond to the Complaint until April 1, 2019 - filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen)
January 14, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Jay C. Chung, Marc A. Fenster, Paul Kroeger, and Reza Mirzaie for Realtime Data LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-02062-CFC, 1:19-cv-00031-CFC(ddp)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (5 in 1:19-cv-00031-CFC, 5 in 1:18-cv-02062-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney C. Jay Chung, Marc A. Fenster, Reza Mirzaie, and Paul A. Kroeger filed by Realtime Data LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/11/2019. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-02062-CFC, 1:19-cv-00031-CFC(fms)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney C. Jay Chung, Marc A. Fenster, Reza Mirzaie, and Paul A. Kroeger - filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Marc A. Fenster, #2 Certification of Reza Mirzaie, #3 Certification of C. Jay Chung, #4 Certification of Paul A. Kroeger)(Brauerman, Stephen)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Realtime Data LLC. Masergy Communications, Inc. served on 1/9/2019, answer due 1/30/2019. (Brauerman, Stephen)
January 9, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
January 8, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Masergy Communications, Inc. on 1/8/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (rwc)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,054,728 ;9,667,751 ;7,415,530 ;9,116,908. (rwc)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against Masergy Communications, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2538457.) - filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(rwc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Realtime Data LLC v. Masergy Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Masergy Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Realtime Data LLC
Represented By: Stephen B. Brauerman
Represented By: Sara E. Bussiere
Represented By: Reza Mirzaie
Represented By: Jay C. Chung
Represented By: Paul Kroeger
Represented By: Marc A. Fenster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?