Conley v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kimberly Conley
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC and Trans Union, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00033
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Trans Union, LLC.(Bennett, Blake)
January 30, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kimberly Conley. Trans Union, LLC served on 1/17/2019, answer due 2/7/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
January 23, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney J. Robert Weyreter for Trans Union, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ddp)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney J. Robert Weyreter filed by Trans Union, LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/23/2019. (fms)
January 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney J. Robert Weyreter - filed by Trans Union, LLC. (Bennett, Blake)
January 21, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC filed by Trans Union, LLC. (Bennett, Blake)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Settlement as to Portfolio Recovery Associates only by Kimberly Conley (Garibian, Antranig)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Kimberly Conley: For Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC waiver sent on 1/11/2019, answer due 3/12/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
January 9, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
January 8, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC on 1/8/2019; Trans Union, LLC on 1/8/2019. (Summons mailed to Philadelphia office per filing party's request). (lak)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Trans Union, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2538493.) - filed by Kimberly Conley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conley v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Conley
Represented By: Antranig N. Garibian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Represented By: J. Robert Weyreter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?