Cipla Ltd. et al v. Amgen Inc.
Plaintiff: Cipla USA, Inc. and Cipla Ltd.
Defendant: Amgen Inc. and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00044
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 118 REDACTED VERSION of #113 Statement by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc.. (Farnan, Brian)
March 8, 2019 Filing 117 REDACTED VERSION of #114 MOTION to Redact D.I. 100 and D.I. 110 re #110 Letter, #100 Letter by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Keller, Karen)
March 8, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Status Conference held on 3/8/2019. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00044-LPS, 1:19-cv-00369-LPS, 1:19-cv-00396-LPS (ntl)
March 8, 2019 Filing 116 REDACTED VERSION of #115 MOTION re #103 Letter, #112 Letter -- Motion to Redact -- by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-4)(Egan, Brian)
March 7, 2019 Filing 115 [SEALED] MOTION re #103 Letter, #112 Letter -- Motion to Redact -- - filed by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-4)(Egan, Brian)
March 7, 2019 Filing 114 [SEALED] MOTION to Redact D.I. 100 and D.I. 110 re #110 Letter, #100 Letter - filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Keller, Karen)
March 7, 2019 Filing 113 [SEALED] STATEMENT Plaintiffs' Brief in Support of Proposed Redactions by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Farnan, Michael)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #107 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the Parties to file redacted versions of their letters (D.I. 100, 101, 103) and briefs in support to 3/7/2019 filed by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/7/19. (ntl)
March 6, 2019 Filing 112 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding response to the Court's February 28, 2019 Order (D.I. 90) and Cipla's letter dated March 5, 2019 (D.I. 101). (Blumenfeld, Jack)
March 6, 2019 Filing 111 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Michael J. Farnan regarding Response to Defendants' Letters - re #103 Letter, #100 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Michael)
March 6, 2019 Filing 110 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen E. Keller regarding Response to March 5, 2019 Letters - re #103 Letter, #101 Letter,. (Keller, Karen)
March 6, 2019 Filing 109 [SEALED] Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on February 15, 2019 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. (bpg)
March 6, 2019 Filing 108 REDACTED VERSION of #102 Statement, by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-J)(Farnan, Michael)
March 6, 2019 Filing 107 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the Parties to file redacted versions of their letters (D.I. 100, 101, 103) and briefs in support to 3/7/2019 - filed by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc.. (Farnan, Michael)
March 6, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: Corrected Exhibit A added to D.I. 104 and 105; Corrected main document added to D.I. 106 per request of counsel. (ntl)
March 6, 2019 Filing 106 REDACTED VERSION of #105 MOTION re #104 Redacted Document (to Redact D.I. 78) by Amgen Inc.. (Egan, Brian) (Main Document 106 replaced on 3/6/2019) (ntl).
March 5, 2019 Filing 105 [SEALED] MOTION re #104 Redacted Document (to Redact D.I. 78) - filed by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Egan, Brian) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/6/2019) (ntl).
March 5, 2019 Filing 104 REDACTED VERSION of #78 Letter by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Egan, Brian) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/6/2019) (ntl).
March 5, 2019 Filing 103 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding prospective hearing - re #90 Memorandum and Order,, Set Hearings,, Terminate Hearings,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
March 5, 2019 Filing 102 [SEALED] STATEMENT Brief in Support of Proposed Redactions by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Farnan, Brian)
March 5, 2019 Filing 101 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Michael J. Farnan regarding Response to February 28, 2019 Order - re #90 Memorandum and Order,, Set Hearings,, Terminate Hearings,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Farnan, Brian)
March 5, 2019 Filing 100 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen E. Keller regarding the Issues Raised in the Court's February 28, 2019 Order - re #90 Memorandum and Order,, Set Hearings,, Terminate Hearings,. (Keller, Karen)
March 5, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Henninger S. Bullock for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ddp)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORAL ORDER: Having received requests from Plaintiffs' counsel in C.A. Nos. 19-369 and 19-396 to appear at the status conference scheduled in 19-44 for Friday, March 8 at 12:00 p.m., and understanding that the parties to 19-44 evidently oppose these requests, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the requests are GRANTED. It will be helpful to the Court to have present on Friday all counsel who represent anyone interested in being heard as the Court considers how to proceed in these likely related matters. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/5/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00044-LPS, 1:19-cv-00369-LPS, 1:19-cv-00396-UNA (ntl)
March 4, 2019 Filing 98 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Tiffany J. Cramer, Esquire regarding Requesting Permission to Appear at Status Conference - re #90 Memorandum and Order,, Set Hearings,, Terminate Hearings,. (Cramer, Tiffany)
March 4, 2019 Filing 97 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Ned Weinberger, Esq. regarding Requesting Permission to Appear at Status Conference - re #90 Memorandum and Order,, Set Hearings,, Terminate Hearings,. (Weinberger, Ned)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #95 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Henninger S. Bullock filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/4/19. (ntl)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #87 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file redactions to the redlined version of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (D.I. 78) and the February 26, 2019 letter (D.I. 79) to March 5, 2019 filed by Amgen Inc., #72 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to jointly submit redacted hearing transcripts to 2/26/2019 filed by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc., #82 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit redactions to Plaintiffs' February 25, 2019 filings to 3/5/2019 filed by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/4/19. (ntl)
March 1, 2019 Filing 96 REDACTED VERSION of #94 Statement by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B)(Farnan, Michael)
March 1, 2019 Filing 95 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Henninger S. Bullock - filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Keller, Karen)
February 28, 2019 Filing 94 [SEALED] STATEMENT re #55 Memorandum and Order Plaintiffs' Brief in Support of Proposed Redactions by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Farnan, Michael)
February 28, 2019 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Fry on behalf of Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Fry, David)
February 28, 2019 Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen Elizabeth Keller on behalf of Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Keller, Karen)
February 28, 2019 Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by John W. Shaw on behalf of Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Shaw, John)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MEMORANDUM ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the hearing scheduled for March 8 is CANCELLED and is CONVERTED to an in-court Status Conference on March 8 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 6B. All other dates and deadlines previously ordered by the Court are VACATED. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/28/19. (ntl) (ntl).
February 28, 2019 Filing 89 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc.. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. (Farnan, Michael)
February 27, 2019 Filing 88 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Robert G. Cunard on February 28, 2019 filed by Amgen Inc..(Egan, Brian)
February 27, 2019 Filing 87 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file redactions to the redlined version of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (D.I. 78) and the February 26, 2019 letter (D.I. 79) to March 5, 2019 - filed by Amgen Inc.. (Egan, Brian)
February 27, 2019 Filing 86 MOTION to Redact #81 Letter re #85 Redacted Document - filed by Amgen Inc.. (Egan, Brian)
February 27, 2019 Filing 85 REDACTED VERSION of #81 Letter by Amgen Inc.. (Egan, Brian)
February 27, 2019 Filing 84 REDACTED VERSION of #80 Statement, Plaintiffs' Brief in Support of Proposed Redactions by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-D)(Farnan, Michael)
February 27, 2019 Filing 83 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Michael J. Farnan regarding Response to Amgen's February 26, 2019 Letter - re #81 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Farnan, Michael)
February 26, 2019 Filing 82 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit redactions to Plaintiffs' February 25, 2019 filings to 3/5/2019 - filed by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc.. (Farnan, Michael)
February 26, 2019 Filing 81 [SEALED] Letter to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding Revised Objection to Expert. (Egan, Brian)
February 26, 2019 Filing 80 [SEALED] STATEMENT re #55 Memorandum and Order Plaintiffs' Brief in Support of Proposed Redactions by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Farnan, Michael)
February 26, 2019 Filing 79 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Michael J. Farnan regarding Response to Amgen's February 26, 2019 Letter - re #77 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Farnan, Michael)
February 26, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. on 2/26/2019. (ddp)
February 26, 2019 Filing 78 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding Redline of Cipla's Amended Complaint - re #77 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Redline)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
February 26, 2019 Filing 77 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Jack B. Blumenfeld - re #73 Amended Complaint. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
February 25, 2019 Filing 76 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #74 Statement of David E. Lansky by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-8)(Farnan, Michael)
February 25, 2019 Filing 75 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #74 Statement of Robert G. Cunard by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-G)(Farnan, Michael)
February 25, 2019 Filing 74 [SEALED] STATEMENT re #35 Memorandum and Order, Set Hearings Plaintiffs' Opening Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Declaratory Relief by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc.. (Farnan, Michael)
February 25, 2019 Filing 73 [SEALED] First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Amgen Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.- filed by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-7)(Farnan, Michael)
February 25, 2019 Filing 72 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to jointly submit redacted hearing transcripts to 2/26/2019 - filed by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc.. (Farnan, Michael)
February 25, 2019 Filing 71 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding March 8 hearing - re #52 Memorandum and Order, Set Hearings. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
February 25, 2019 Filing 70 REDACTED VERSION of #69 Statement by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Farnan, Michael)
February 25, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Eric J. Stock for Amgen Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
February 22, 2019 Filing 69 [SEALED] STATEMENT re #67 Letter Memorandum in Support of Proposed Redactions by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Farnan, Michael)
February 22, 2019 Filing 68 REDACTED VERSION of #66 Statement, by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc.. (Farnan, Michael)
February 21, 2019 Filing 67 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Michael J. Farnan regarding Protective Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Michael)
February 21, 2019 Filing 66 [SEALED] STATEMENT re #55 Memorandum and Order Plaintiffs' Brief in Support of Proposed Redactions by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Farnan, Michael)
February 21, 2019 Filing 65 REDACTED VERSION of #38 Letter by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Michael)
February 21, 2019 Filing 64 REDACTED VERSION of #22 Letter by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc.. (Farnan, Michael)
February 21, 2019 Filing 63 REDACTED VERSION of #17 Letter by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc.. (Farnan, Michael)
February 21, 2019 Filing 62 REDACTED VERSION of #9 Letter by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc.. (Farnan, Michael)
February 21, 2019 Filing 61 REDACTED VERSION of #8 MOTION for Relief and Conference by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-G, #2 Rule 7.1.1 Certification, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Farnan, Michael)
February 21, 2019 Filing 60 REDACTED VERSION of #2 Complaint by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc.. (Farnan, Michael)
February 21, 2019 Filing 59 REDACTED VERSION of #42 Letter, #43 Redacted Document by Amgen Inc.. (Egan, Brian)
February 20, 2019 Filing 58 REDACTED VERSION of #23 Letter by Amgen Inc.. (Egan, Brian)
February 20, 2019 Filing 57 REDACTED VERSION of #18 Letter by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Egan, Brian)
February 19, 2019 Filing 56 [SEALED] NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena filed by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Michael)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Regarding Redactions. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/19/19. (ntl)
February 19, 2019 Filing 54 REDACTED VERSION of #49 Declaration of Ashley E. Johnson by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Egan, Brian)
February 19, 2019 Filing 53 REDACTED VERSION of #48 Opening Brief in Support by Amgen Inc.. (Egan, Brian)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER: Hearing is set for 3/8/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6B. Each side will be allocated two (2) hours for its presentation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/19/19. (ntl)
February 19, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Ashley E. Johnson for Amgen Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
February 15, 2019 Filing 51 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Michael J. Farnan regarding Sealing February 15, 2019 Teleconference Transcript. (Farnan, Michael)
February 15, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Telephone Conference held on 2/15/2019. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
February 15, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: Corrected Exhibit A added to D.I. 49 per request of counsel. (ntl)
February 15, 2019 Filing 50 Letter to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Stamatios Stamoulis regarding Requesting Permission to Attend Status Conference - re 46 Order Setting Teleconference. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
February 14, 2019 Filing 49 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #47 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Ashley E. Johnson) by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Egan, Brian) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/15/2019) (ntl).
February 14, 2019 Filing 48 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #47 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Amgen Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/28/2019. (Egan, Brian)
February 14, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Amgen Inc.. (Egan, Brian)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court will hold a status teleconference on Friday, February 15 beginning at 1:00 p.m. Plaintiffs counsel shall initiate the call to (302) 573-4571. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/14/19. (ntl)
February 13, 2019 Filing 45 REDACTED VERSION of #44 Letter by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Michael)
February 12, 2019 Filing 44 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Michael J. Farnan regarding Response to Amgen's February 11, 2019 Letter - re #42 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Michael)
February 12, 2019 Filing 43 REDACTED VERSION of #42 Letter by Amgen Inc.. (Egan, Brian)
February 11, 2019 Filing 42 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding March 8, 2019 hearing - re #35 Memorandum and Order, Set Hearings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-2)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
February 8, 2019 Filing 41 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF regarding [D.I. 36] Memorandum filed by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-4)(Egan, Brian)
February 8, 2019 Filing 40 [SEALED] RESPONSE to Motion re #37 MOTION to Redact re #2 Complaint, #8 MOTION for Relief and Conference filed by Cipla USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian)
February 8, 2019 Filing 39 REDACTED VERSION of #38 Letter by Cipla USA, Inc.. (Farnan, Brian)
February 7, 2019 Filing 38 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Brian E. Farnan regarding March 8, 2019 Hearing - re #35 Memorandum and Order, Set Hearings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian)
February 6, 2019 Filing 37 [SEALED] MOTION to Redact re #2 Complaint, #8 MOTION for Relief and Conference - filed by Amgen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-4)(Egan, Brian)
February 6, 2019 Filing 36 [SEALED] MEMORANDUM in Support of Proposed Redactions filed by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Farnan, Brian)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER regarding hearing and briefing schedule -- hearing is set for 3/8/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6B. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/4/19. (ntl)
February 1, 2019 Filing 34 [SEALED] STATUS REPORT by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Michael)
February 1, 2019 Filing 33 REDACTED VERSION of #23 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding response to Cipla's letter - re 17 Letter, 13 Order by Amgen Inc.. (Egan, Brian)
February 1, 2019 Filing 32 REDACTED VERSION of #18 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Jack B. Blumenfeld - re 14 Order, 13 Order by Amgen Inc.. (Egan, Brian)
February 1, 2019 Filing 31 REDACTED VERSION of #22 Letter by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc.. (Farnan, Michael)
February 1, 2019 Filing 30 REDACTED VERSION of #17 Letter by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc.. (Farnan, Michael)
February 1, 2019 Filing 29 REDACTED VERSION of #9 Letter by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc.. (Farnan, Michael)
February 1, 2019 Filing 28 REDACTED VERSION of #8 MOTION for Relief and Conference by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc.. (Farnan, Michael)
February 1, 2019 Filing 27 REDACTED VERSION of #2 Complaint by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc.. (Farnan, Michael)
January 31, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Amgen Inc.'s document productions made under D. Del. LR 26.2 responsive to Request Nos. 1 and 2 of Plaintiffs' First Request for Production of Documents and Things attached as Exhibit G to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Conference with the Court and Limited Expedited Discovery (D.I. 8) filed by Amgen Inc..(Egan, Brian)
January 28, 2019 Filing 25 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from John M. Seaman, Esq. regarding potential intervenor Torrent Pharmaceuticals, Ltd. - re #8 MOTION for Relief and Conference , #13 Order, Set Hearings. (Seaman, John)
January 28, 2019 Filing 24 [SEALED] Transcript of Telephone Conference held on January 25, 2019 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. (bpg)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #19 Stipulation and Order filed by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/25/19. (ntl)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Adam H. Offenhartz of GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER LLP filed by Amgen Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/28/19. (ntl)
January 25, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Telephone Conference held on 1/25/2019. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
January 24, 2019 Filing 23 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding response to Cipla's letter - re #17 Letter, #13 Order, Set Hearings. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
January 24, 2019 Filing 22 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Michael J. Farnan regarding Response to Amgen's January 23, 2019 Letter - re #18 Letter. (Farnan, Michael)
January 24, 2019 Filing 21 Letter to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Stamatios Stamoulis regarding Response to Oral Order - re 14 Order. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
January 24, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Adam H. Offenhartz of GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER LLP - filed by Amgen Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney M. Sean Royall and Ashley E. Johnson of GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER LLP filed by Amgen Inc., #16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric J. Stock filed by Amgen Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/24/19. (ntl)
January 24, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION regarding Redacted Motion to Expedite by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc.. (Farnan, Michael)
January 23, 2019 Filing 18 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Jack B. Blumenfeld - re 14 Order, #13 Order, Set Hearings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
January 23, 2019 Filing 17 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Michael J. Farnan regarding January 25, 2019 teleconference - re #13 Order, Set Hearings. (Farnan, Michael)
January 23, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric J. Stock - filed by Amgen Inc.. (Egan, Brian)
January 22, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney M. Sean Royall and Ashley E. Johnson of GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER LLP - filed by Amgen Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that in the letter briefs already ordered, the parties shall also address whether a redacted public version of the complaint should be filed. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/22/19. (ntl)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 [SEALED] ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/18/2019.This order has been emailed to local counsel. (etg)
January 18, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Lynn M. Russo, Deanne K. Cevasco, James W. Dabney, Dina R. Hoffer, Patrice P. Jean, and David E. Lansky for Cipla Ltd. and Cipla USA, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ddp)
January 17, 2019 Filing 12 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Michael J. Farnan regarding Response to Amgen's January 17, 2019 Letter - re #11 Letter. (Farnan, Michael)
January 17, 2019 Filing 11 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding response to Cipla's request - re #8 MOTION for Relief and Conference , #9 Letter. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James W. Dabney, Patrice P. Jean, Dina Hoffer, Deanne K. Cevasco, David E. Lansky, and Lynn M. Russo filed by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/17/19. (ntl)
January 16, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James W. Dabney, Patrice P. Jean, Dina Hoffer, Deanne K. Cevasco, David E. Lansky, and Lynn M. Russo - filed by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc.. (Farnan, Brian)
January 16, 2019 Filing 9 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Michael J. Farnan regarding Motion and Conference with the Court - re #8 MOTION for Relief and Conference . (Farnan, Michael)
January 16, 2019 Filing 8 [SEALED] MOTION for Relief and Conference - filed by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Rule 7.1.1 Certification, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Farnan, Michael)
January 16, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 [SEALED] Letter to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Stamatios Stamoulis regarding miscellaneous relief. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Stamoulis, Stamatios) Modified on 1/14/2019 (ntl).
January 10, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Sealed Complaint and Summons served on Amgen Inc. on 1/9/2019, filed by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Michael)
January 9, 2019 Remark: Case submitted for routine Judicial assignment. (lak)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting D.I. #1 MOTION to file Complaint under seal. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/9/2019. (lak)
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Cipla Ltd. for Cipla USA, Inc. filed by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc.. (Farnan, Michael)
January 9, 2019 Remark: Exit copies to Duty Judge (LPS). (lak)
January 9, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Amgen Inc. on 1/9/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (lak)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 [SEALED] COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Amgen Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2539420.) - filed by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lak)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to file Complaint under seal - filed by Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cipla Ltd. et al v. Amgen Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amgen Inc.
Represented By: Brian P. Egan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Ashley E. Johnson
Represented By: Eric J. Stock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Henninger S. Bullock
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Represented By: John W. Shaw
Represented By: David M. Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cipla USA, Inc.
Represented By: Sue L. Robinson
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Deanne K. Cevasco
Represented By: Dina R. Hoffer
Represented By: Lynn M. Russo
Represented By: James W. Dabney
Represented By: David E. Lansky
Represented By: Patrice P. Jean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cipla Ltd.
Represented By: Sue L. Robinson
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Deanne K. Cevasco
Represented By: Dina R. Hoffer
Represented By: Lynn M. Russo
Represented By: James W. Dabney
Represented By: David E. Lansky
Represented By: Patrice P. Jean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?