Musgray v. Verizon Wireless Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Jasper Musgray
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Verizon Wireless Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00061
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #4 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer complaint to March 15, 2019 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 3/15/2019). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/14/2019. (dlw)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer complaint to March 15, 2019 - filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Grivner, Karen)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #3 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer the Complaint to March 15, 2019 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 3/15/2019). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/13/2019. (dlw)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer the Complaint to March 15, 2019 - filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Hunter, Travis)
January 17, 2019 Summons Reissued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Verizon Wireless Inc. (*summons mailed to Philadelphia office) (ceg)
January 16, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
January 10, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Equifax Information Services, LLC on 1/10/2019; Experian Information Solutions, Inc. on 1/10/2019; Verizon Wireless Inc. on 1/10/2019. (sar)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sar)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Verizon Wireless Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2541013.) - filed by Jasper Musgray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(sar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Musgray v. Verizon Wireless Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Karen M. Grivner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Travis Steven Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Wireless Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasper Musgray
Represented By: Antranig N. Garibian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?