Molchan v. Delmar Fire Department, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: April D. Molchan
Defendant: Delmar Fire Department, Inc., Andrew Rementer and Town of Delmar
Case Number: 1:2019cv00082
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Ashley A. Bosche and Robin R. Cockey for Delmar Fire Department, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ddp)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME To File a Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss to through and including March 25th, 2019 (Set Briefing Schedule: re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - Answering Brief due 3/25/2019). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/7/2019. (dlw)
March 7, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME To File a Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss to through and including March 25th, 2019 - filed by April D. Molchan. (Alderson, Gary) Modified on 3/7/2019 (dlw).
March 5, 2019 Set Answering Brief Deadline re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/18/2019. (dlw)
March 5, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 9 and 10 have been replaced on the docket with signed versions of the documents.(dlw)
March 4, 2019 Filing 11 First Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Delmar Fire Department, Inc.. (Allen, Michele)
March 4, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Delmar Fire Department, Inc., Andrew Rementer.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/18/2019. (Allen, Michele) (Main Document 10 replaced on 3/5/2019) (dlw).
March 4, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Delmar Fire Department, Inc., Andrew Rementer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Motion to Dismiss Proposed Order)(Allen, Michele) (Main Document 9 replaced on 3/5/2019) (dlw).
March 4, 2019 Summons Reissued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Andrew Rementer. (sar)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robin R. Cockey, #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ashley B. Bosche filed by Delmar Fire Department, Inc. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/28/2019. (dlw)
February 28, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The PDFs at D.I. 7 and 8 have been updated. The certifications were reversed - Bosche was attached to Cockey and Cockey to Bosche. (dlw)
February 27, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robin R. Cockey - filed by Delmar Fire Department, Inc.. (Allen, Michele) (Main Document 8 replaced on 2/28/2019) (dlw).
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ashley B. Bosche - filed by Delmar Fire Department, Inc.. (Allen, Michele) (Main Document 7 replaced on 2/28/2019) (dlw).
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Delmar Fire Department, Inc., Andrew Rementer- filed by April D. Molchan.(Alderson, Gary)
February 19, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 6 has been deleted from the docket. Counsel is directed to file a clean, non-blacklined version of the Amended Complaint. Counsel is further directed to pick the defendants to which this Amended Complaint is being filed against, not all of the previously named defendants as the Amended Complaint seems to drop a defendant. (dlw)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise plead to the complaint to 2/28/2019 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Delmar Fire Department, Inc. answer due 2/28/2019; Andrew Rementer answer due 2/28/2019; Town of Delmar answer due 2/28/2019). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/6/2019. (dlw)
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise plead to the complaint to 2/28/2019 - filed by Delmar Fire Department, Inc.. (Allen, Michele)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michele D. Allen on behalf of Delmar Fire Department, Inc. (Allen, Michele)
January 24, 2019 Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Delmar Fire Department, Inc. answer due 2/7/2019; Andrew Rementer answer due 2/7/2019; Town of Delmar answer due 2/7/2019. (dlw)
January 23, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on 3 on 01/17/2019, filed by April D. Molchan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Alderson, Gary)
January 16, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: Replaced Exhibits A & D to Complaint with redacted versions. (redacted Date of Birth). Counsel is encouraged to review the Court's Privacy policy on the Court's website. (rwc)
January 16, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Delmar Fire Department, Inc. on 1/16/2019; Andrew Rementer on 1/16/2019; Town of Delmar on 1/16/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (rwc)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against Delmar Fire Department, Inc., Andrew Rementer, Town of Delmar - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number DEX031122.) - filed by April D. Molchan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(rwc) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/16/2019) (rwc). (Attachment 4 replaced on 1/16/2019) (rwc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Molchan v. Delmar Fire Department, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delmar Fire Department, Inc.
Represented By: Michele D. Allen
Represented By: Robin R. Cockey
Represented By: Ashley A. Bosche
Represented By: Caitlyn E. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Rementer
Represented By: Michele D. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Delmar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April D. Molchan
Represented By: Gary W. Alderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?