Glanfield et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Dorothy Glanfield and John Glanfield
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, DeLaval Inc., Ford Motor Company, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Warren Pumps LLC, General Electric Company, Volkswagen of America, Inc., Hajoca Corporation, Crane Co., CBS Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Hopeman Brothers, Inc. and Nosroc Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00106
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Sherry R Fallon
Referring Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 SO ORDERED re #51 Stipulation of Dismissal. Party DeLaval Inc., terminated. Attorney Jason A. Cincilla; Nicholas D. Picollelli, Jr; Amaryah K. Bocchino and Ryan William Browning terminated as to DeLaval Inc. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 8/22/2019. (dlw)
August 20, 2019 Filing 51 STIPULATION of Dismissal by DeLaval Inc.. (Picollelli, Nicholas) Modified on 8/20/2019 (lih).
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #50 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christina A. Gonzales. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 7/30/2019. (lih)
July 25, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christina A. Gonzales - filed by Hajoca Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Attorney Certification)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Florax, Joelle)
July 11, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Plaintiff, John Glanfield on Thursday, August 1, 2019 at 10:00AM filed by Foster Wheeler LLC.(Texter, Allison)
May 22, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Joint Witness and Exhibit List filed by Foster Wheeler LLC.(Texter, Allison)
May 10, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Witness and Exhibit Lists filed by Dorothy Glanfield, John Glanfield.(Crumplar, David)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #45 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Plaintiff's Initial Witness and Exhibit List to May 10, 2019. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/24/2019. (lih)
April 22, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's medical records and misc. materials filed by Dorothy Glanfield, John Glanfield.(Crumplar, David)
April 22, 2019 Filing 45 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Plaintiff's Initial Witness and Exhibit List to May 10, 2019 - filed by Foster Wheeler LLC. (Texter, Allison)
April 15, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure filed by Hopeman Brothers, Inc..(Tome, Brian)
April 15, 2019 Filing 43 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Hopeman Brothers, Inc.. (Tome, Brian)
April 15, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Tome on behalf of Hopeman Brothers, Inc. (Tome, Brian)
April 10, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The text of D.I. #39 has been modified to correct the name of the filer. (lih)
April 10, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures filed by Ford Motor Company.(Singewald, Christian)
April 10, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Rule 26 Initial Disclosures filed by Dorothy Glanfield, John Glanfield.(Crumplar, David)
April 10, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Volkswagen of America, Inc. .(Singewald, Christian) Modified on 4/10/2019 (lih).
April 4, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by DeLaval Inc..(Picollelli, Nicholas)
April 1, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant, Warren Pumps, LLC's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Warren Pumps LLC.(Tyler, Jessica)
April 1, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Ingersoll Rand Company's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Ingersoll-Rand Company.(Tyler, Jessica)
March 29, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Hajoca Corporation.(Florax, Joelle)
March 28, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Crane Co..(Gondek, Francis)
March 28, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by CBS Corporation.(Valocchi, Beth)
March 28, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by General Electric Company(Successor by Merger to RCA Corporation).(Texter, Allison)
March 28, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Foster Wheeler LLC.(Texter, Allison)
March 27, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon for Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at # http://www.ded.uscourts.gov/general-orders/magistrate-judges-standing-order-adr-mediation (cak)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 5/2/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 5/2/2019. Discovery due by 2/14/2020. Status Report due by 3/10/2020. A Status Conference is set for 3/24/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon Dispositive Motions due by 4/15/2020. (PLEASE REFER TO ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/27/2019. (lih)
March 27, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Telephone Conference held on 3/27/2019. (Court Reporter T. Carroll (Hawkins Reporting).) (lih)
March 22, 2019 Filing 29 Joint PROPOSED Scheduling ORDER by Foster Wheeler LLC. (Texter, Allison) Modified on 3/27/2019 (lih).
March 22, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: Pursuant to conversation with counsel, the proposed scheduling order previously filed as D.I. 29 has been deleted and will be re-filed at a later time. (lih)
March 22, 2019 Filing 28 Letter to U.S. Magistrate Judge S. R. Fallon from Allison Texter, Esq.; as Defense Liaison regarding Joint Proposed Scheduling Order. (Texter, Allison)
March 21, 2019 Filing 27 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Alfa Laval AB for DeLaval Inc. filed by DeLaval Inc.. (Picollelli, Nicholas)
March 1, 2019 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Hajoca Corporation. (Florax, Joelle)
March 1, 2019 Filing 25 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Hajoca Corporation. (Florax, Joelle)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) CONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) A scheduling teleconference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) will be held on 3/27/2019 at 3:30 P.m. Counsel for Plaintiff shall organize and initiate the teleconference to the Chambers of Sherry R. Fallon at 302-573-4557. (2) The parties are required to prepare for the teleconference by conferring on all matters under Rule 16 and D. Del. LR 16 and shall submit a proposed Scheduling Order to the Court no later than 3/22/2019. The Court's form asbestos scheduling order is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Fallon, Forms). If the parties have any suggestions or modifications to the standard Scheduling Order, they may be included in the proposed order for consideration by the Court. (3) If any disputed issue exists regarding the proposed Scheduling Order, it shall be noted therein, along with the parties proposed language on the issue for consideration by the Court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/27/2019. (lih)
February 26, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis C. Gondek on behalf of Crane Co. (Gondek, Francis)
February 22, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Rochelle Libid Gumapac on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Gumapac, Rochelle)
February 22, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Ford Motor Company.(Singewald, Christian)
February 22, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian J. Singewald on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Singewald, Christian)
February 21, 2019 Filing 20 Letter STATUS REPORT by John Glanfield. (Crumplar, David)
February 14, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Joelle Florax on behalf of Hajoca Corporation (Florax, Joelle)
February 7, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas D. Picollelli, Jr on behalf of DeLaval Inc. (Picollelli, Nicholas)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER- Within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order: (1) Plaintiff(s) shall submit a statement to the Court that: (a) identifies those Defendants who have not yet been served with the Complaint; (b) identifies those Defendants who have been served with the Complaint but have not yet filed an Answer; (c) provides any reason why a Rule 16 conference should not occur within 30 days of the date of its submission; and (d) notes any other pending matters which require judicial action. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/7/2019. (lih)
February 6, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the notice of appearance previously filed as D.I. 17. Counsel is advised to file a revised version that lists the correct name of the defendant. The previously filed document listed the defendants name as "Alfa Laval". (lih)
January 31, 2019 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll Rand PLC for Ingersoll-Rand Company filed by Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Tyler, Jessica)
January 31, 2019 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Colfax Corporation, Other Affiliate IMO Industries, Inc. for Warren Pumps LLC filed by Warren Pumps LLC. (Tyler, Jessica)
January 31, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Lee Tyler on behalf of Ingersoll-Rand Company (Tyler, Jessica)
January 31, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Lee Tyler on behalf of Warren Pumps LLC (Tyler, Jessica)
January 31, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian J. Singewald on behalf of Volkswagen of America, Inc. (Singewald, Christian)
January 29, 2019 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Crane Co.. (Skiles, Nicholas)
January 29, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas E. Skiles on behalf of Crane Co. (Skiles, Nicholas)
January 23, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon. (rjb)
January 23, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
January 22, 2019 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Ampco-Pittsburgh Corporation for Air & Liquid Systems Corporation filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Sullivan, Timothy)
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Nosroc Corporation. (Sullivan, Timothy)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy A. Sullivan, III on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Sullivan, Timothy)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy A. Sullivan, III on behalf of Nosroc Corporation (Sullivan, Timothy)
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 JOINDER by General Electric Company(Successor by Merger to RCA Corporation) and General Electric Company joining in #1 Notice of Removal. (nmg)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 JOINDER by CBS Corporation, joining in #1 Notice of Removal. (nmg)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent John Wood Group plc (Scotland) for Foster Wheeler LLC filed by Foster Wheeler LLC. (nmg)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior Ct, Case Number N17C-12-210 ASB (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0311-2547249)- filed by Foster Wheeler LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Certificate of Compliance, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glanfield et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeLaval Inc.
Represented By: Ryan William Browning
Represented By: Nicholas D. Picollelli, Jr.
Represented By: Jason A. Cincilla
Represented By: Amaryah K. Bocchino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Rochelle Libid Gumapac
Represented By: Christian J. Singewald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Timothy A. Sullivan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Represented By: Jessica Lee Tyler
Represented By: Armand J. Della Porta, Jr.
Represented By: Ana Marina McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Kapes
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagen of America, Inc.
Represented By: Christian J. Singewald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hajoca Corporation
Represented By: Joelle Florax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Nicholas E. Skiles
Represented By: Francis C. Gondek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Kapes
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Jessica Lee Tyler
Represented By: Armand J. Della Porta, Jr.
Represented By: Ana Marina McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopeman Brothers, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Tome
Represented By: Tianna Bethune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nosroc Corporation
Represented By: Timothy A. Sullivan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Glanfield
Represented By: David Thomas Crumplar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Glanfield
Represented By: David Thomas Crumplar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?