Genentech, Inc. v. Lupin Ltd. et al.
Plaintiff: Genentech, Inc. and InterMune, Inc.
Defendant: Lupin Ltd. and Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00110
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Lupin Atlantic Holdings S.A. for Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Murphy, Francis)
March 15, 2019 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Lupin Ltd.. (Murphy, Francis)
March 15, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Genentech, Inc., InterMune, Inc. by Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Lupin Ltd..(Murphy, Francis)
March 8, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Ryan Hagglund, Warren K. MacRae, and Mark E. Waddell for Genentech, Inc. and InterMune, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00078-RGA et al.(ddp)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer to Complaint to March 15, 2019 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Lupin Ltd. answer due 3/15/2019; Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. answer due 3/15/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/11/2019. (nms)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (11 in 19-cv-78-RGA, 8 in 19-cv-154-RGA, 7 in 19-cv-202-RGA, 8 in 19-cv-130-RGA, 9 in 19-cv-103-RGA, 9 in 19-cv-110-RGA, 9 in 19-cv-123-RGA, 8 in 19-cv-205-RGA, 8 in 19-cv-219-RGA, 10 in 19-cv-178-RGA, 13 in 19-cv-131-RGA, 7 in 19-cv-223-RGA, 7 in 19-cv-142-RGA, 7 in 19-cv-136-RGA, 11 in 19-cv-104-RGA, 8 in 19-cv-190-RGA, 7 in 19-cv-141-RGA, 8 in 19-cv-177-RGA, 13 in 19-cv-132-RGA, 9 in 1:19-cv-00120-RGA, 8 in 19-cv-111-RGA, 8 in 19-cv-195-RGA, 9 in 19-cv-105-RGA, 9 in 1:19-cv-00109-RGA, 7 in 19-cv-203-RGA, 10 in 19-cv-164-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark E. Waddell, Warren K. MacRae and Ryan Hagglund of LOEB & LOEB LLP filed by Genentech, Inc., InterMune, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/12/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00078-RGA et al.(nms)
February 11, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark E. Waddell, Warren K. MacRae and Ryan Hagglund of LOEB & LOEB LLP - filed by Genentech, Inc., InterMune, Inc.. (Jacobs, Karen)
February 8, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer to Complaint to March 15, 2019 - filed by Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Murphy, Francis)
January 24, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf for D.I. #7 has been replaced with a corrected version per counsel's request. (nms)
January 23, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Mailing, by Genentech, Inc., InterMune, Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 1/24/2019 (nms). (Main Document 7 replaced on 1/24/2019) (nms).
January 23, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by InterMune, Inc., Genentech, Inc.. Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 1/22/2019, answer due 2/12/2019. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
January 23, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00103-RGA through 1:19-cv-00105-RGA and 1:19-cv-00109-RGA through 1:19-cv-00111-RGA (rjb)
January 22, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Lupin Ltd. on 1/22/2019; Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. on 1/22/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (rwc)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Roche Holding Ltd., Corporate Parent Novartis Ltd., Corporate Parent Roche Holdings, Inc. for Genentech, Inc.; Corporate Parent Genentech Inc. for InterMune, Inc. filed by Genentech, Inc., InterMune, Inc. (rwc)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,566,729 B1 ;7,635,707 B1 ;7,767,700 B2 ;7,816,383 B1 ;7,910,610 B1. (rwc)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 12/8/18. Date of Expiration of Patent: SEE ATTACHED.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 4/15/2022. (rwc)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed against Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2547963.) - filed by InterMune, Inc., Genentech, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-15, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rwc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Genentech, Inc. v. Lupin Ltd. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genentech, Inc.
Represented By: Karen Jacobs
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Ryan Hagglund
Represented By: Mark E. Waddell
Represented By: Warren K. MacRae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: InterMune, Inc.
Represented By: Karen Jacobs
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Ryan Hagglund
Represented By: Mark E. Waddell
Represented By: Warren K. MacRae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Ltd.
Represented By: Francis J. Murphy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Francis J. Murphy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?