Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC et al v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: The Massachusetts Institute of Technology and Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00196
Filed: January 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Referring Judge: Sherry R Fallon
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2021 Filing 149 MANDATE of USCA as to #146 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by The Massachusetts Institute of Technology, Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC. USCA Decision: affirmed. (Attachments: #1 Judgment)(nmf)
February 27, 2020 Filing 148 Official Transcript of Markman heairng held on January 8, 2020 before Judge Connolly. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Email: Valerie_Gunning@ded.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or order/purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/19/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/30/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/27/2020. (vjg)
February 14, 2020 Filing 147 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Federal Circuit re #146 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by The Massachusetts Institute of Technology, Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC. USCA Case Number 2020-1472. (nmf)
February 12, 2020 Notification regarding #146 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) sent to Reporter Gaffigan. (kmd)
February 12, 2020 Notification regarding #146 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) sent to Reporter Triozzi. (kmd)
February 12, 2020 Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit re #146 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit). (kmd)
February 11, 2020 Filing 146 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit of #144 Judgment, #140 Order . Appeal filed by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology. (Farnan, Brian)
February 11, 2020 Filing 145 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,069,839 B2 ;9,255,519 B2 ;9,810,166 B2 ;10,138,826 B2. (Attachments: #1 Final Judgment)(nmf)
February 11, 2020 Filing 144 FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Ford Motor Company against Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology (CASE CLOSED). Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 2/11/2020. (nmf)
February 11, 2020 Filing 143 PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Final Judgment by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology. (Farnan, Michael)
February 11, 2020 Filing 142 Joint STIPULATION of Non-Infringement by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology. (Farnan, Michael)
February 11, 2020 APPEAL - Credit Card Payment of $505.00 received re #146 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by The Massachusetts Institute of Technology, Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC. ( Filing fee $505, receipt number 0311-2850279.) (Farnan, Brian)
February 7, 2020 Filing 141 STIPULATION Regarding Ford's Production by Ford Motor Company. (Flynn, Michael) Modified on 2/7/2020 (lih).
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #141 STIPULATION Regarding Ford's Production. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/7/2020. (lih)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 140 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER re #139 Letter. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/28/2020. (nmf)
January 24, 2020 Filing 139 Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Brian E. Farnan regarding Proposed Markman Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Farnan, Brian)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- Having been notified by the parties that the pending disputes outlined in #119 MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Disputes have been resolved, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the discovery dispute teleconference previously set in this matter for 1/29/2020 is CANCELLED. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 1/22/2020. (lih)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #138 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Ford to complete its production of documents pursuant to Magistrate Judge Fallon's Oral Order of December 12, 2019 to February 10, 2020. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 1/22/2020. (lih)
January 21, 2020 Filing 138 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Ford to complete its production of documents pursuant to Magistrate Judge Fallon's Oral Order of December 12, 2019 to February 10, 2020 - filed by Ford Motor Company. (Smith, Rodger)
January 8, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colm F. Connolly - Markman Hearing held on 1/8/2020. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) Counsel to submit a final proposed order to the Court. (nmf)
January 7, 2020 Filing 137 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Massachusetts Institute of Technology on March 2, 2020 filed by Ford Motor Company.(Flynn, Michael)
January 7, 2020 Filing 136 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC on March 3, 2020 filed by Ford Motor Company.(Flynn, Michael)
January 7, 2020 Filing 135 Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Rodger D. Smith II regarding the January 8, 2020 Markman hearing. (Smith, Rodger)
January 3, 2020 Filing 134 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Ford Motor Company's Fourth Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs and (ii) Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Defendant's Fourth Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiffs filed by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology.(Farnan, Brian)
January 2, 2020 Filing 133 Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on December 12, 2019 before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan; e-mail: Brian_Gaffigan@ded.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or order/purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/23/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/3/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/1/2020.(bpg)
January 2, 2020 Filing 132 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Tom McCarthy on 1/10/2020 filed by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology.(Farnan, Brian)
December 23, 2019 Filing 131 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jack Turner on January 31, 2020 filed by Ford Motor Company.(Flynn, Michael)
December 23, 2019 Filing 130 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Stephen Russ on 2/18/2020 filed by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology.(Farnan, Brian)
December 23, 2019 Filing 129 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Michael Pierce on 2/12/2020 filed by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology.(Farnan, Brian)
December 23, 2019 Filing 128 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ken Washington on 2/26/2020 filed by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology.(Farnan, Brian)
December 23, 2019 Filing 127 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Joseph Thomas on 2/20/2020 filed by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology.(Farnan, Brian)
December 23, 2019 Filing 126 NOTICE to Take Deposition of John Rollinger on 2/11/2020 filed by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology.(Farnan, Brian)
December 23, 2019 Filing 125 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Greg Brown on 2/27/2020 filed by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology.(Farnan, Brian)
December 23, 2019 Filing 124 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ethan Sanborn on 2/13/2020 filed by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology.(Farnan, Brian)
December 23, 2019 Filing 123 NOTICE to Take Deposition of William Coughlin on 2/25/2020 filed by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology.(Farnan, Brian)
December 20, 2019 Filing 122 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Declaration of Brett Hinds; (2) Declaration of John Rollinger; (3) Declaration of Joseph Thomas; (4) Declaration of Michael Pierce; (5) Declaration of Stephen Russ; (6) Declaration of Ethan Sanborn; (7) Declaration of Edward Krause; and (8) Declaration of Greg Brown, filed by Ford Motor Company.(Flynn, Michael)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #119 MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Disputes. A Telephone Conference is set for 1/29/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Plaintiff's shall initiate the call to 302-573-4557. In preparation for this hearing the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Order regarding discovery matters available at www.ded.uscourts.gov/judge/magistrate-judge-sherry-r-fallon. Set Deadlines: Moving submissions due by no later than close of business on 1/23/2020; Responsive submissions due by no later than close of business on 1/24/2020.) Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/18/2019. (lih)
December 17, 2019 Filing 121 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority for Defendant Ford Motor Company's Claim Construction Positions by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Rodger)
December 17, 2019 Filing 120 REDACTED VERSION of #112 Letter by Ford Motor Company. (Smith, Rodger)
December 17, 2019 Filing 119 MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Disputes - filed by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Farnan, Michael)
December 16, 2019 Filing 118 REDACTED VERSION of #111 Letter by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-5, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Farnan, Brian)
December 13, 2019 Filing 117 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dr. John Heywood on February 5, 2020 filed by Ford Motor Company.(Flynn, Michael)
December 13, 2019 Filing 116 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dr. Leslie Bromberg on January 27, 2020 filed by Ford Motor Company.(Flynn, Michael)
December 13, 2019 Filing 115 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dr. Daniel R. Cohn on January 22, 2020 filed by Ford Motor Company.(Flynn, Michael)
December 13, 2019 Filing 114 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jonathan How on January 17, 2020 filed by Ford Motor Company.(Flynn, Michael)
December 13, 2019 Filing 113 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ryan Johnson on December 20, 2019 filed by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology.(Farnan, Michael)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- re #98 MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery and Protective Order Disputes. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that sworn custodial declarations are due on or before December 19, 2019. Plaintiffs may request up to 10 additional search strings on or before December 16, 2019. Defendant shall provide hit counts for the search strings on or before January 2, 2020. Defendant shall complete its production of documents on or before January 27, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the transcript of the December 12, 2019 discovery dispute teleconference shall serve as the order of the court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/12/2019. (lih)
December 12, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Discovery Dispute Telephone Conference held on 12/12/2019. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (lih)
December 10, 2019 Filing 112 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Rodger D. Smith II regarding Plaintiffs' December 9, 2019 Letter - re #111 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-5)(Smith, Rodger)
December 9, 2019 Filing 111 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Brian E. Farnan regarding Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Farnan, Brian)
December 6, 2019 Filing 110 APPENDIX re #109 Claim Construction Opening Brief by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 - `839 Patent, #3 Exhibit 3 - `519 Patent, #4 Exhibit 4 - `166 Patent, #5 Exhibit 5 - `826 Patent, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15)(Farnan, Michael)
December 6, 2019 Filing 109 Joint CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPENING BRIEF filed by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology. (Farnan, Michael)
December 5, 2019 Filing 108 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Ford Motor Company's Answers and Objections to Plaintiffs Ethanol Boosting Systems LLC and Massachusetts Institute of Technology's First Set of Requests for Admission (Nos. 1-20); and (2) Ford Motor Company's Answers and Objections to Plaintiffs Ethanol Boosting Systems LLC and Massachusetts Institute of Technology's Third Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 14-19), filed by Ford Motor Company.(Smith, Rodger)
December 2, 2019 Filing 107 REDACTED VERSION of #100 Letter, by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 9-11)(Farnan, Michael)
November 27, 2019 Filing 106 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Claim Construction Sur-Reply filed by Ford Motor Company.(Smith, Rodger)
November 26, 2019 Filing 105 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Fourth Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiffs Ethanol Boosting Systems LLC and Massachusetts Institute of Technology (Nos. 51-60); and (2) Fourth Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs Ethanol Boosting Systems LLC and Massachusetts Institute of Technology (Nos. 19-20) filed by Ford Motor Company.(Smith, Rodger)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Defendant's #71 OBJECTIONS are OVERRULED. Plaintiffs may, if they wish, file no later than December 5, 2019 an application with supporting legal authority for reimbursement of the fees and costs they incurred in responding to Defendant's objections. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/25/2019. (nmf)
November 22, 2019 Filing 103 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Maria Zuber on January 14, 2020 filed by Ford Motor Company.(Smith, Rodger)
November 22, 2019 Filing 102 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Karen Gleason on January 15, 2020 filed by Ford Motor Company.(Smith, Rodger)
November 21, 2019 Filing 101 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ed Krause on November 26, 2019 filed by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology.(Farnan, Brian)
November 21, 2019 Filing 100 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Michael J. Farnan regarding Response to Ford's Submission of Supplemental Materials - re #99 Statement,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9, #2 Exhibit 10, #3 Exhibit 11)(Farnan, Michael)
November 21, 2019 Filing 99 [SEALED] STATEMENT re #71 Objections -- Submission of Supplemental Materials in Support of Its Objections to Magistrate Judge Fallon's Oral Order on Discovery Dated September 19, 2019 -- by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-8)(Smith, Rodger)
November 19, 2019 Filing 98 MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery and Protective Order Disputes - filed by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Farnan, Brian)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #98 MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery and Protective Order Disputes. A Telephone Conference is set for 12/12/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate the call to 302-573-4557. In preparation for this hearing the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Order regarding discovery matters available at www.ded.uscourts.gov/judge/magistrate-judge-sherry-r-fallon. Set Deadlines: Moving submission due by no later than 11:00 AM on 12/9/2019; Responsive submission due by no later than 11:00 AM on 12/10/19.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 11/19/2019. (lih)
November 18, 2019 Filing 97 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Ethanol Boosting Systems LLC and The Massachusetts Institute of Technology's Objections and Responses to Ford Motor Company's Third Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs (No. 19) and (ii) Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Defendant's Third Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiffs (No. 50) filed by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology.(Farnan, Brian)
November 12, 2019 Filing 96 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Ethanol Boosting Systems LLC and The Massachusetts Institute of Technology's Objections and Responses to Ford Motor Company's Second Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs (Nos. 12-18) and (ii) Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Defendant's Second Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiffs Nos. 42-49 filed by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology.(Farnan, Brian)
November 12, 2019 Filing 95 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Ford Motor Company's Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs Ethanol Boosting Systems LLC and Massachusetts Institute of Technology's Third Amended Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition, filed by Ford Motor Company.(Smith, Rodger)
November 12, 2019 Filing 94 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ford Motor Company on 11/13/2019 filed by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology.(Farnan, Brian)
November 8, 2019 Filing 93 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jill Crawley Griset - filed by Ford Motor Company. (Smith, Rodger)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #93 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jill Crawley Griset filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/8/2019. (fms)
November 5, 2019 Filing 92 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Admission and (ii) Plaintiffs' Third Set of Interrogatories filed by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC.(Farnan, Brian)
November 5, 2019 Filing 91 REDACTED VERSION of #85 Letter, by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-6)(Farnan, Brian)
November 5, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Discovery Dispute Telephone Conference held on 11/5/2019. (Court Reporter J. Guy.) (lih)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- re #75 Joint MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute. The transcript of the 11/5/2019 discovery dispute teleconference shall serve as the order of the court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 11/5/2019. (lih)
November 4, 2019 Filing 90 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Ford Motor Company's Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs Ethanol Boosting Systems LLC and Massachusetts Institute of Technology's Third Set of Requests for Production, filed by Ford Motor Company.(Smith, Rodger)
November 4, 2019 Filing 89 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Rodger D. Smith II regarding Plaintiffs' Responsive October 29, 2019 Letter - re #85 Letter,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-5)(Smith, Rodger)
November 4, 2019 Filing 88 REDACTED VERSION of #83 Letter by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-5)(Smith, Rodger)
November 4, 2019 Filing 87 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Ethanol Boosting Systems LLC and Massachusetts Institute of Technology's First Supplemental Objections and Responses to Ford Motor Company's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs (Nos. 1-11) filed by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology.(Farnan, Brian)
October 30, 2019 Filing 86 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Ford Motor Company's Answering Claim Construction Brief filed by Ford Motor Company.(Smith, Rodger)
October 29, 2019 Filing 85 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Brian E. Farnan regarding Response to Defendant's October 28, 2019 Letter - re #83 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Farnan, Brian)
October 29, 2019 Filing 84 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Rodger D. Smith II regarding Discovery Dispute - re #82 Letter. (Smith, Rodger)
October 28, 2019 Filing 83 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Rodger D. Smith II regarding Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-5)(Smith, Rodger)
October 28, 2019 Filing 82 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Michael J. Farnan regarding Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Farnan, Michael)
October 23, 2019 Filing 81 REDACTED VERSION of #79 Response to Objections, by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-E)(Farnan, Brian)
October 18, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Third Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs Ethanol Boosting Systems LLC and Massachusetts Institute of Technology (No. 19) and (2) Third Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiffs Ethanol Boosting Systems LLC and Massachusetts Institute of Technology (No. 50) filed by Ford Motor Company.(Flynn, Michael)
October 16, 2019 Filing 79 [SEALED] RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology re #71 Objections . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Farnan, Brian)
October 16, 2019 Filing 78 REDACTED VERSION of #71 Objections by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-10)(Smith, Rodger)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #75 Joint MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute. A Telephone Conference is set for 11/5/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Defendant shall initiate the call to 302-573-4557. In preparation for this hearing the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Order regarding discovery matters available at www.ded.uscourts.gov/judge/magistrate-judge-sherry-r-fallon. Set Deadlines: Moving submissions due by no later than 2:00 PM on 10/28/2019; Responsive submissions due by no later than 2:00 PM on 10/29/2019.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/15/2019. (lih)
October 14, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ford Motor Company on 10/21/2019 filed by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology.(Farnan, Brian)
October 11, 2019 Filing 76 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Ford Motor Company's Second Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiffs Ethanol Boosting Systems LLC and Massachusetts Institute of Technology (Nos. 42-49); and (2) Ford Motor Compamy's Second Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs Ethanol Boosting Systems LLC and Massachusetts Institute of Technology (Nos. 12-18), filed by Ford Motor Company.(Smith, Rodger)
October 10, 2019 Filing 75 Joint MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute - filed by Ford Motor Company. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Smith, Rodger)
October 8, 2019 Filing 74 Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Rodger D. Smith II regarding courtesy copies of the docket items associated with Defendant Ford Motor Company's Objections to the Report & Recommendation - re #71 Objections. (Smith, Rodger)
October 4, 2019 Filing 73 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Third Set of Requests for Production filed by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology.(Farnan, Brian)
October 3, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Al Cockerill on October 17, 2019 filed by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology.(Farnan, Brian)
October 2, 2019 Filing 71 [SEALED] OBJECTIONS by Ford Motor Company . (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-10)(Smith, Rodger)
September 25, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Ford Motor Company's Answers and Objections to Plaintiffs Ethanol Boosting Systems LLC and Massachusetts Institute of Technology's Second Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 6-13) filed by Ford Motor Company.(Smith, Rodger)
September 25, 2019 Filing 69 MOTION for Claim Construction re #67 Claim Construction Chart, - filed by Ford Motor Company. (Smith, Rodger)
September 25, 2019 Motions No Longer Referred: #69 MOTION for Claim Construction re #67 Claim Construction Chart, #68 MOTION for Claim Construction re #67 Claim Construction Chart. The automatic referrals to the magistrate judge generated by the system have been removed for these motions. (nmf)
September 24, 2019 Filing 68 MOTION for Claim Construction re #67 Claim Construction Chart, - filed by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology. (Farnan, Michael)
September 24, 2019 Filing 67 CLAIM Construction Chart by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Farnan, Michael)
September 23, 2019 Filing 66 Official Transcript of Discovery Dispute Teleconference held on 09/18/19 before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Heather M. Triozzi,Telephone number 302-573-6195. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/15/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/24/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/23/2019. (Triozzi, Heather)
September 23, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Objections and Responses to Defendant's Requests for Production Nos. 1-41 filed by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology.(Farnan, Brian)
September 20, 2019 Filing 64 REDACTED VERSION of #57 Letter by Ford Motor Company. (Flynn, Michael)
September 20, 2019 Filing 63 REDACTED VERSION of #55 Letter by Ford Motor Company. (Flynn, Michael)
September 20, 2019 Filing 62 REDACTED VERSION of #58 Letter by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C)(Farnan, Brian)
September 20, 2019 Filing 61 REDACTED VERSION of #56 Letter, by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-G)(Farnan, Brian)
September 20, 2019 Filing 60 REDACTED VERSION of #54 Letter, by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-P)(Farnan, Brian)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #59 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to file a Joint Claim Construction Chart to September 24, 2019 filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/20/2019. (fms)
September 19, 2019 Filing 59 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to file a Joint Claim Construction Chart to September 24, 2019 - filed by Ford Motor Company. (Smith, Rodger)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- Due to a conflict with the courts calendar, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the discovery dispute teleconference set in this matter for 1:00 PM is RESCHEDULED to 1:30 PM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 9/18/2019. (lih)
September 18, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Discovery Dispute Telephone Conference held on 9/18/2019. (Court Reporter H. Triozzi) (lih)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Oral Order: The transcript of the September 18, 2019 discovery dispute teleconference shall serve as the Order of the court. In accordance with the rulings made on the record: (1) Ford shall produce a supplementation of its ESI production on the specific categories of documents identified on the call on or before October 2, 2019. Ford shall also provide deposition dates on or before October 2, 2019 regarding the topic of custodial searching procedures; (2) Plaintiffs request to add one additional search term on the ten existing custodians is granted; and (3) Ford shall produce the agreed-upon source code and a manifest for source code of the fuel management system on or before September 25, 2019. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 9/18/2019. (lih)
September 17, 2019 Filing 58 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Brian E. Farnan regarding Discovery Dispute Letters. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Farnan, Brian)
September 13, 2019 Filing 57 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Michael Flynn - re #54 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exs. 1-3, part 1, #2 Exs. 1-3, part 2)(Flynn, Michael) Modified on 9/13/2019 (lih).
September 13, 2019 Filing 56 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Brian E. Farnan - re #55 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Farnan, Brian) Modified on 9/13/2019 (lih).
September 12, 2019 Filing 55 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Michael Flynn regarding Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-5)(Flynn, Michael)
September 12, 2019 Filing 54 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Brian E. Farnan regarding Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P)(Farnan, Brian)
September 6, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Al Cockerill on September 26, 2019 filed by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology.(Farnan, Brian)
September 5, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Disclosure of Claim Construction Terms/Phrases and Proposed Constructions filed by Ford Motor Company.(Smith, Rodger)
September 3, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Ford Motor Co.'s Initial Invalidity Contentions, filed by Ford Motor Company.(Flynn, Michael)
August 30, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Ford Motor Company's Objections to Plaintiffs Ethanol Boosting Systems LLC and Massachusetts Institute of Technology's First Set of Requests for Inspection and Testing, filed by Ford Motor Company.(Flynn, Michael)
August 22, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Discovery Dispute Telephone Conference held on 8/22/2019. (Court Reporter S. Vickers (Hawkins Reporting).) (lih)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: The transcript of the August 22, 2019, discovery dispute teleconference shall serve as the Order of the court. In accordance with the rulings made on the record: (1) Plaintiffs motion to compel production of core technical documents is denied without prejudice, as the Scheduling Order already requires such production by August 30, 2019 (D.I. 17 at 5-6); (2) Plaintiffs motion to compel production of source code is denied without prejudice, pursuant to Paragraph 6(a) of the Scheduling Order, D.I. 17; (3) Defendants motion to compel production of documents more than six years before the filing of the complaint is denied without prejudice, with the exception of documents related to conception and reduction to practice, pursuant to Paragraph 4(e) of the Default Standard for Discovery; (4) Defendants motion to impose additional restrictions on Plaintiffs outside expert is denied, pursuant to Paragraph 5(d) of the Protective Order (D.I. 34). If, during the course of the retention, Plaintiffs become aware or reasonably should be aware that the expert has become employed by a competitor of the Defendant, then Plaintiffs shall provide written notice to Defendant as soon as is reasonably practicable; and (5) a discovery status telephone conference is set for September 18, 2019 at 1 p.m. before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Plaintiff shall initiate the call to 302-573-4557. In preparation for this hearing, the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Order regarding discovery matters available at www.ded.uscourts.gov/judge/magistrate-judge-sherry-r-fallon. Set deadlines: Moving submission due by no later than 12:00 PM on 9/12/2019; Responsive submission due by no later than 12:00 PM on 9/13/2019. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 8/22/2019. (lih)
August 16, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Second Set of Interrogatories filed by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC.(Farnan, Brian)
August 15, 2019 Filing 48 REDACTED VERSION of #46 Letter by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-4)(Farnan, Brian)
August 15, 2019 Filing 47 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Michael Flynn - re #43 Letter. (Flynn, Michael) Modified on 8/15/2019 (lih).
August 15, 2019 Filing 46 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Brian E. Farnan - re #44 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Farnan, Brian) Modified on 8/15/2019 (lih).
August 14, 2019 Filing 45 REDACTED VERSION of #43 Letter, by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-10)(Farnan, Brian)
August 14, 2019 Filing 44 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Michael Flynn regarding Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-7)(Flynn, Michael)
August 14, 2019 Filing 43 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Brian E. Farnan regarding Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Farnan, Brian)
August 12, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Ford Motor Company's Objections to Plaintiffs Ethanol Boosting Systems LLC and Massachusetts Institute of Technology's Second Set of Requests for Production, filed by Ford Motor Company.(Flynn, Michael)
August 7, 2019 Filing 41 Joint MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute - filed by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Farnan, Michael)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #41 Joint MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute. A Telephone Conference is set for 8/22/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Plaintiff shall initiate the call to 302-573-4557. In preparation for this hearing the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Order regarding discovery matters available at www.ded.uscourts.gov/judge/magistrate-judge-sherry-r-fallon. Set Deadlines: Moving submission due by no later than 12:00 PM on 8/14/2019; Responsive submission due by no later than 12:00 PM on 8/15/2019.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 8/7/2019. (lih)
July 31, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Inspection and Testing filed by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology.(Farnan, Brian)
July 22, 2019 Filing 39 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to exchange a list of claim term(s)/phrase(s) and proposed claim construction of those term(s)/phrase(s) to September 5, 2019 - filed by Ford Motor Company. (Flynn, Michael)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #39 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to exchange a list of claim term(s)/phrase(s) and proposed claim construction of those term(s)/phrase(s) to September 5, 2019 filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/22/2019. (fms)
July 15, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Natalie C. Clayton for Ford Motor Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
July 12, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew J. Ligotti - filed by Ford Motor Company. (Flynn, Michael)
July 12, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for Production filed by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology.(Farnan, Brian)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #38 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew J. Ligotti filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/12/2019. (nmf)
July 10, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Linda Chang as co-counsel. Reason for request: No longer with the firm. (Flynn, Michael)
July 1, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions filed by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology.(Farnan, Brian)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/25/2019. (fms)
June 21, 2019 Filing 33 PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Protective Order by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology. (Farnan, Michael)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- re #28 Joint MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Protective Order Dispute. The transcript of the 6/20/2019 discovery dispute teleconference shall serve as the order of court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 6/20/2019. (lih)
June 20, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Discovery Dispute Telephone Conference held on 6/20/2019. (Court Reporter S. Vickers.) (lih)
June 20, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Steven M. Seigel for Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, for The Massachusetts Institute of Technology added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
June 18, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Ethanol Boosting Systems LLC and Massachusetts Institute of Technology's Objections and Responses to Ford Motor Company's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs (Nos. 1-11) and (ii) Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Defendant's Requests for Production Nos. 1-41 filed by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology.(Farnan, Brian)
June 18, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Ford Motor Company's Answers and Objections to Plaintiffs Ethanol Boosting Systems LLC and Massachusetts Institute of Technology's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-5) and (2) Ford Motor Company's Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs Ethanol Boosting Systems LLC and Massachusetts Institute of Technology's First Set of Requests for Production, filed by Ford Motor Company.(Flynn, Michael)
June 18, 2019 Filing 30 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Michael J. Farnan regarding Response to Defendant's June 17, 2019 Letter - re #29 Letter. (Farnan, Michael)
June 17, 2019 Filing 29 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Michael Flynn regarding the remaining disputes regarding the parties proposed Protective Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Flynn, Michael)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- Due to a conflict with the courts calendar, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the discovery dispute teleconference set in this matter for 6/20/2019 at 02:00 PM is RESCHEDULED to 3:00 PM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Counsel for the defendant shall initiate the call to 302-573-4557. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 6/14/2019. (lih)
June 12, 2019 Filing 28 Joint MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Protective Order Dispute - filed by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Farnan, Michael)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #28 Joint MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Protective Order Dispute. A Telephone Conference is set for 6/20/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Counsel for the defendant shall initiate the call to 302-573-4557. In preparation for this hearing the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Order regarding discovery matters available at www.ded.uscourts.gov/judge/magistrate-judge-sherry-r-fallon. Set Deadlines: (Moving Submission due by no later than 2:00 PM on 6/17/2019, Responsive submission due by no later than 2:00 PM on 6/18/2019.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 6/12/2019. (lih)
June 11, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney William D. O'Connell for Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC and The Massachusetts Institute of Technology added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (amf)
June 10, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William D. O'Connell - filed by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology. (Farnan, Brian)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #27 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William D. O'Connell filed by The Massachusetts Institute of Technology, Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/10/2019. (fms)
June 4, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Linda Chang for Ford Motor Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #26 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit a proposed Stipulated Protective Order to May 31, 2019 filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/28/2019. (fms)
May 24, 2019 Filing 26 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit a proposed Stipulated Protective Order to May 31, 2019 - filed by Ford Motor Company. (Flynn, Michael)
May 23, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Brian D. Hill for Ford Motor Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ddp)
May 22, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures under Section 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information filed by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology.(Farnan, Brian)
May 22, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Ford Motor Company's Disclosures Pursuant to Section 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery, filed by Ford Motor Company.(Flynn, Michael)
May 8, 2019 Filing 23 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit a proposed Stipulated Protective Order to May 24, 2019 - filed by Ford Motor Company. (Smith, Rodger)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #23 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit a proposed Stipulated Protective Order to May 24, 2019 filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/8/2019. (fms)
May 6, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Rule 26 Initial Disclosures filed by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology.(Farnan, Brian)
May 6, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Ford Motor Company's Initial Disclosures, filed by Ford Motor Company.(Smith, Rodger)
May 1, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories filed by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology.(Farnan, Brian)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Setting Teleconference: plaintiffs counsel shall initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 6/11/2019 at 11:30 AM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 5/1/2019. (lih)
April 30, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Ford Motor Company's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs Ethanol Boosting Systems LLC and Massachusetts Institute of Technology (Nos. 1-11) and 2) Ford Motor Company's First Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiffs Ethanol Boosting Systems LLC and Massachusetts Institute of Technology (Nos. 1-41) filed by Ford Motor Company.(Smith, Rodger)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for all disputes relating to discovery or the protective order. Joinder of Parties due by 12/4/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 12/4/2019. Discovery due by 3/13/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 6/26/2020. Answering Brief due 7/17/2020. Reply Brief due 7/31/2020. Joint Claim Construction Brief due by 12/6/2019. A Markman Hearing is set for 1/8/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/2/2020. A Jury Trial is set for 11/16/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/30/2019. (nmf)
April 30, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven M. Seigel - filed by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology. (Farnan, Brian)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven M. Seigel filed by The Massachusetts Institute of Technology, Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/30/2019. (fms)
April 30, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon for Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at # http://www.ded.uscourts.gov/general-orders/magistrate-judges-standing-order-adr-mediation (cak)
April 26, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Request for Production filed by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology.(Farnan, Brian)
April 26, 2019 Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Scheduling Order by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly)(Farnan, Brian)
April 22, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colm F. Connolly - Scheduling Conference held on 4/22/2019. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) Counsel to submit the final proposed scheduling order to the Court. (nmf)
April 17, 2019 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order re #11 Order Setting Scheduling Conference by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly)(Farnan, Brian)
April 15, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology.(Farnan, Brian)
April 5, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael S. Connor for Ford Motor Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Setting Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 4/22/2019 at 02:30 PM in Chambers before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/4/2019. (nmf)
April 2, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Matthew R. Berry and Andres C. Healy for Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC and The Massachusetts Institute of Technology added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ddp)
March 29, 2019 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Ford Motor Company. (Smith, Rodger)
March 27, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew R. Berry and Andres C. Healy - filed by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology. (Farnan, Brian)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew R. Berry and Andres C. Healy filed by The Massachusetts Institute of Technology, Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/27/2019. (fms)
March 25, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology by Ford Motor Company.(Smith, Rodger)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael Conner, Natalie Clayton, Linda Chang, and Brian D. Hill filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/25/2019. (fms)
March 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael Conner, Natalie Clayton, Linda Chang, and Brian D. Hill - filed by Ford Motor Company. (Smith, Rodger)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint for Patent Infringement to March 25, 2019 filed by Ford Motor Company, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Ford Motor Company answer due 3/25/2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 2/19/2019. (nmf)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint for Patent Infringement to March 25, 2019 - filed by Ford Motor Company. (Smith, Rodger)
February 6, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
January 31, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Massachusetts Institute of Technology, Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC. Ford Motor Company served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. (Farnan, Brian)
January 31, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC, The Massachusetts Institute of Technology. (Farnan, Brian)
January 31, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Ford Motor Company on 1/31/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (lak)
January 30, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,069,839 B2 ;US 9,255,519 B2 ;US 9,810,166 B2 ;US 10,138,826 B2. (lak)
January 30, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
January 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against Ford Motor Company - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2557420.) - filed by The Massachusetts Institute of Technology, Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Massachusetts Institute of Technology
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Andres C. Healy
Represented By: Matthew R. Berry
Represented By: Steven M. Seigel
Represented By: William D. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethanol Boosting Systems, LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Andres C. Healy
Represented By: Matthew R. Berry
Represented By: Steven M. Seigel
Represented By: William D. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Rodger Dallery Smith, II
Represented By: Brian D. Hill
Represented By: Linda Chang
Represented By: Michael S. Connor
Represented By: Michael J. Flynn
Represented By: Natalie C. Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?