Averett et al v. PF Participation Funding Trust

Plaintiff: Norma Averett and Amy L. Garner
Defendant: PF Participation Funding Trust
Case Number: 1:2019cv00244
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Norma Averett, Amy L. Garner: For PF Participation Funding Trust waiver sent on 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Cowles, Randal)
February 25, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Stephen P. Denittis for Norma Averett and Amy L. Garner added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ddp)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephen P. DeNittis, filed by Amy L. Garner, Norma Averett, and #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph A. Osefchen, filed by Amy L. Garner, Norma Averett. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/21/2019. (nms)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph A. Osefchen - filed by Norma Averett, Amy L. Garner. (Cowles, Randal)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephen P. DeNittis - filed by Norma Averett, Amy L. Garner. (Cowles, Randal)
February 13, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
February 8, 2019 Remark : Summons mailed to Edward Corma, Esq., 750 Route 73 South, Suite 307B, Marlton, NJ 08053 per request of counsel. (rwc)
February 6, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to PF Participation Funding Trust on 2/6/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (lak)
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against PF Participation Funding Trust - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2563565.) - filed by Norma Averett, Amy L. Garner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Averett et al v. PF Participation Funding Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Averett
Represented By: Randal Cowles
Represented By: Stephen P. Denittis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy L. Garner
Represented By: Randal Cowles
Represented By: Stephen P. Denittis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PF Participation Funding Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?