AlmondNet, Inc. et al v. Yahoo! Inc.

Defendant: Yahoo Inc.
Undetermined: Datonics, LLC, Intent IQ, LLC and AlmondNet, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00247
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: Delaware District Court
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 131 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 3/8/2019. (lak)
February 6, 2019 130 Record of case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number in Other District: 1:16-cv-01557. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order 129 MEMORANDUM & ORDER, For the foregoing reasons, I direct that this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware, confident in the belief that the interest of justice requires it. The Clerk of the Court is directed to take the necessary actions to accomplish the transfer. Case transferred to District of Delaware. So Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 12/5/2018.Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Lee, Tiffeny) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
November 20, 2018 128 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge I. Leo Glasser on 11/20/2018: Counsel for all parties present. A conference was held. (Court Reporter Linda Marino.) (Kessler, Stanley) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
November 15, 2018 NOTICE: A status conference will be held on 11/20/2018 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 8B South before Judge I. Leo Glasser. (Kessler, Stanley) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person Technology Tutorial Conference is scheduled for December 13, 2018 at 10:00 AM and a Claim Construction Hearing is scheduled for December 20, 2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 13-D South before the undersigned. As an abundance of caution, in the event more time is needed to hold the conference/hearing, counsel should also be available the following day of each conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 9/12/2018.[Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
September 12, 2018 127 USCA FOR THE FEDERAL CIRCUIT - Notice of Docketing. A petition for a Writ of Mandamus has been filed. USCAFC #18-157 (McGee, Mary Ann) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
September 11, 2018 126 STATUS REPORT by AlmondNet, Inc., Datonics, LLC, Intent IQ, LLC (Crosby, Ian) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
September 5, 2018 125 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on August 30, 2018, before Judge Gold. Court Reporter/Transcriber Transcription Plus II, Inc. Email address: laferrara44@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 9/26/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/8/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/4/2018. (Hong, Loan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
August 30, 2018 124 Minute Entry: Status Conference held on 8/30/2018 before Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Crosby and Hoffman for plaintiffs, Verhoeven and McKee for defendant. Counsel will confer and submit a letter by September 11 reporting on (1) whether they intend to renew settlement discussions and if so, the mediator with whom they intend to do so; and (2) proposing specific dates between December 3 and December 21 for a tutorial and claim construction hearing. (FTR Log #1:34-2:01.) (Gillespie, Saudia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
August 30, 2018 123 Minute Order. for proceedings held before Judge I. Leo Glasser and Magistrate Judge Steven Gold on 8/30/2018: Counsel for all parties present. Defendants motion for a stay pending the resolution of its forthcoming petition for a writ of mandamus is heard. The motion is denied for the reasons stated on the record. Plaintiffs motion to reset a date for the claim construction hearing is heard. The motion is granted. Magistrate Judge Gold will schedule the hearing. (Court Reporter Michele Lucchese.) (Kessler, Stanley) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
August 29, 2018 122 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #117 MOTION for Hearing (Re-set Claim Construction Hearing) and Cross-Motion to Stay filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Opposition, #2 Proposed Order) (Curran, Patrick) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
August 24, 2018 121 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Yahoo! Inc. (Curran, Patrick) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order RE-SCHEDULING ORDER: The conference scheduled for August 30, 2018 at 12:30 p.m. will be jointly held. The conference will take place in Judge Glasser's courtroom 8B South before Judge Glasser and the undersigned. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 8/23/2018. (Gillespie, Saudia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER: Granting #119 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney David P. Berten shall register for ECF, registration is available online at the NYEDs homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 8/22/2018. (Gillespie, Saudia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
August 22, 2018 120 NOTICE by AlmondNet, Inc. re #119 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-10675260. (Berten, David) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
August 22, 2018 119 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-10675260. by AlmondNet, Inc.. (Berten, David) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
August 22, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: The status conference previously set for 8/30/2018 at 11:00 a.m. before Judge Glasser is rescheduled for 12:30 PM on that day, and will be held jointly with Magistrate Judge Gold. (Kessler, Stanley) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person status conference will be held at 12:30 p.m. on August 30, 2018 in Courtroom 13D South before the undersigned. Counsel shall be prepared to address #117 Motion for Hearing. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 8/22/2018. (Gillespie, Saudia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order 118 ORDER denying the defendants motion #97 to reconsider, denying the plaintiffs motion #101 to transfer to the Southern District of New York, and denying plaintiffs conditional motion #113 to consolidate and transfer to Delaware. The parties are directed to appear at 11:00 a.m. on August 30, 2018 for a status conference. Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 8/21/2018. (Kessler, Stanley) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
August 17, 2018 117 MOTION for Hearing (Re-set Claim Construction Hearing) by AlmondNet, Inc., Datonics, LLC, Intent IQ, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Hoffman, Louis) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
July 26, 2018 116 REPLY in Support re #113 MOTION to Change Venue (Conditionally) to District of Delaware filed by All Plaintiffs. (Hoffman, Louis) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
July 20, 2018 115 RESPONSE in Opposition re #113 MOTION to Change Venue (Conditionally) to District of Delaware filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Curran, Patrick) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
July 9, 2018 114 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AlmondNet, Inc., Datonics, LLC, Intent IQ, LLC (Hoffman, Louis) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
July 6, 2018 113 MOTION to Change Venue (Conditionally) to District of Delaware by AlmondNet, Inc., Datonics, LLC, Intent IQ, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Hoffman, Louis) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER: For the reasons described in the Court's Minute Entry dated March 8, 2018 #112 , the status conference previously scheduled for March 29, 2018 at 2:30 p.m. is cancelled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 3/26/2018. (Metzger, Daniel) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
March 8, 2018 112 Minute Entry: Telephone Conference held on 3/8/2018 before Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Crosby for plaintiff, Verhoeven for defendant. The claim construction hearing previously set for March 20 is adjourned pending a decision on defendant's venue motion. Counsel are encouraged to seek the Court's assistance with settlement discussions if they believe doing so might be productive, and to advise the Court if any significant progress toward settlement is made. (FTR Log #2:36-2:39 (only partially on the record).) (Gillespie, Saudia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephone conference will be held at 2:30 p.m. TOMORROW, March 8, 2018. Counsel for plaintiffs are directed to arrange the call and, when all counsel are on the line, to contact chambers at 718-613-2560. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 3/7/2018. (Metzger, Daniel) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
March 1, 2018 111 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge I. Leo Glasser on 3/1/2018: Counsel for all parties present. A settlement conference was held. (Kessler, Stanley) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
February 26, 2018 110 REPLY in Support of Claim Construction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 27, #2 Exhibit 28) (Hoffman, Louis) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
February 15, 2018 NOTICE: A settlement conference will be held on 3/1/2018 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 8B South before Judge I. Leo Glasser. (Kessler, Stanley) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
February 12, 2018 109 MEMORANDUM in Support of Yahoo's Responsive Claim Construction Brief filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, Part 1, #4 Exhibit 3, Part 2, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23) (Curran, Patrick) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
February 12, 2018 108 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge I. Leo Glasser on 2/12/2018: Counsel for all parties present. Oral argument is heard on defendants motion for reconsideration of the Courts prior order denying Yahoos motion to dismiss for improper venue (Dkt. 85) in light of the Federal Circuits decision in In re Micron Technology, Inc. Decision reserved. (Court Reporter Lisa Schmid.) (Kessler, Stanley) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
February 12, 2018 107 NOTICE of Appearance by Miles Davenport Freeman on behalf of Yahoo! Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Freeman, Miles) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
January 25, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: Oral argument of defendant's motion for reconsideration of the Courts prior order denying Yahoos motion to dismiss for improper venue will be heard on 2/12/2018 at 12:00 Noon. (Kessler, Stanley) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
January 12, 2018 106 Minute Entry: Telephone Conference held on 1/12/2018 before Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Hoffman for plaintiff, Curran for defendant. Defendant's opposition brief on claim construction will be filed by February 12, and plaintiff's reply will be filed by February 26. THE HEARING PREVIOUSLY SET FOR FEBRUARY 26 WILL BE HELD INSTEAD AT 2:00 PM ON MARCH 20, 2018. (FTR Log #4:02-4:20.) (Gillespie, Saudia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
January 12, 2018 105 REPLY in Support re #97 MOTION for Reconsideration re #85 Order & Opposition to #101 Renewed Conditional Motion to Transfer filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Curran, Patrick) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting in part and denying in part #103 Motion to Stay as indicated on the record of the proceedings held today. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 1/12/2018. (Gold, Steven) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
January 12, 2018 104 RESPONSE in Opposition re #103 Letter MOTION to Stay as Relief from Unauthorized Over-Length Brief filed by All Plaintiffs. (Hoffman, Louis) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: A Telephone Conference will be held TODAY, JANUARY 12, 2018 at 4:00 p.m. in Courtroom 13D South before the undersigned. Counsel for plaintiff shall arrange the call and, when all parties are on the line, call my chambers at 718-613-2560. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 1/12/2018. (Metzger, Daniel) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
January 11, 2018 103 Letter MOTION to Stay as Relief from Unauthorized Over-Length Brief by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Curran, Patrick) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
January 8, 2018 102 Letter Claim Construction Brief by AlmondNet, Inc., Datonics, LLC, Intent IQ, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit US Patent 7822639, #2 Exhibit US Patent 7979307, #3 Exhibit US Patent 8244574, #4 Exhibit US Patent 8244582, #5 Exhibit US Patent 8244586, #6 Exhibit US Patent 8494904, #7 Exhibit US Patent 8671139, #8 Exhibit US Patent 8677398, #9 Exhibit US Patent 8775249, #10 Exhibit US Patent 8959146, #11 Exhibit US Patent 9508089, #12 Exhibit 1, #13 Exhibit 2, #14 Exhibit 3, #15 Exhibit 4, #16 Exhibit 5, #17 Exhibit 6, #18 Exhibit 7, #19 Exhibit 8, #20 Exhibit 9, #21 Exhibit 10, #22 Exhibit 11, #23 Exhibit 12, #24 Exhibit 13, #25 Exhibit 14, #26 Exhibit 15, #27 Exhibit 16, #28 Exhibit 17, #29 Exhibit 18, #30 Exhibit 19, #31 Exhibit 20, #32 Exhibit 21, #33 Exhibit 22, #34 Exhibit 23, #35 Exhibit 24, #36 Exhibit 25, #37 Exhibit 26) (Hoffman, Louis) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
January 5, 2018 101 RESPONSE in Opposition re #97 MOTION for Reconsideration re #85 Order , and Renewal of Conditional Motion to Transfer filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ian Crosby in Support of AlmondNet's Renewed Conditional Motion to Transfer, #2 Declaration of Roy Shkedi in Support of AlmondNet's Renewed Conditional Motion to Transfer) (Hoffman, Louis) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #100 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The proposed order extending the time by which plaintiffs must respond to defendant's Motion for Reconsideration is hereby approved and entered as an Order of the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 12/29/17. (Metzger, Daniel) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
December 27, 2017 100 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #97 MOTION for Reconsideration re #85 Order by AlmondNet, Inc., Datonics, LLC, Intent IQ, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Crosby, Ian) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
December 19, 2017 99 RESPONSE in Opposition re #93 Letter MOTION to Stay Pending Reconsideration of Order Denying Yahoo's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue SUR-REPLY TO MOTION TO STAY filed by AlmondNet, Inc., Datonics, LLC, Intent IQ, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10) (Crosby, Ian) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
December 18, 2017 98 REPLY to Response to Motion re #93 Letter MOTION to Stay Pending Reconsideration of Order Denying Yahoo's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Curran, Patrick) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
December 15, 2017 97 MOTION for Reconsideration re #85 Order by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of David Brightman, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B) (Curran, Patrick) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
December 14, 2017 96 RESPONSE to Motion re #93 Letter MOTION to Stay Pending Reconsideration of Order Denying Yahoo's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by AlmondNet, Inc.. (Crosby, Ian) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #95 Motion for Extension of Time to File; granting #95 Motion to Continue. The proposed extended schedule is hereby approved and entered as an Order of the Court, subject to one exception. The Court is unavailable on March 26, 2018. Accordingly, an in-person HEARING ON CLAIM CONSTRUCTION will be held at 2:00 p.m. on FEBRUARY 26, 2018. A STATUS CONFERENCE will be held at 2:30 p.m. on MARCH 29, 2018 in Courtroom 13D South before the undersigned. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 12/7/2017. (Metzger, Daniel) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
December 7, 2017 95 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Claim Construction Briefs, Joint MOTION to Continue Claim Construction Hearing by Yahoo! Inc.. (Curran, Patrick) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
December 1, 2017 93 Letter MOTION to Stay Pending Reconsideration of Order Denying Yahoo's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue by Yahoo! Inc.. (Curran, Patrick) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
November 22, 2017 94 USCA FEDERAL CIRCUIT ORDER - It is Ordered that the Petition for a Writ of Mandamus is denied. See document for further details. USCAFC #2018-103. (McGee, Mary Ann) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
October 31, 2017 92 FEDERAL CIRCUIT ORDER - Yahoo Holdings, Inc. submits a petition for a writ of mandamus directing the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York to dismiss this case for improper venue. IT IS ORDERED THAT: Respondents AlmondNet, Inc., Datonics, LLC, and Intent IQ, LLC are directed to respond to the petition within seven days from the date of this order. Any reply is due within three days of the respondents response. Certified Copy Issued: 10/26/17. USCAFC: 18-103. (McGee, Mary Ann) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER: #91 The proposed amended schedule is hereby approved and entered as an Order of the Court. An in-person HEARING ON CLAIM CONSTRUCTION will be held at 2:00 p.m. on JANUARY 26, 2018. AND a STATUS CONFERENCE will be held at 2:30 p.m. on FEBRUARY 26, 2018. in Courtroom 13D South before the undersigned. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 10/10/2017. (Gillespie, Saudia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
October 6, 2017 91 Letter Regarding Proposed Schedule Amendments in Response to September 29, 2017 Order by Yahoo! Inc. (Curran, Patrick) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
October 2, 2017 90 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/1/17, before Judge Glasser. Court Reporter/Transcriber Angela Grant. Email address: Angela.grant207@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 10/23/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/2/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/1/2018. (Grant, Angela) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order 89 ORDER re #75 Letter filed by Yahoo! Inc. Defendant's August 24, 2017 discovery request is granted. AlmondNet is directed to provide defendant with the narrowed contention response described in the second numbered paragraph of Yahoo's September 11, 2017 letter. The Court recognizes that the current case management schedule does not permit sufficient time for AlmondNet to comply. Accordingly, the parties shall confer and jointly propose an amended schedule by October 6, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 9/29/2017. (Metzger, Daniel) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
September 11, 2017 88 Letter Re Discovery Dispute by AlmondNet, Inc., Datonics, LLC, Intent IQ, LLC (Crosby, Ian) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
September 11, 2017 87 Letter re Status of Pending Discovery Dispute by Yahoo! Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Curran, Patrick) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
September 7, 2017 86 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on September 1, 2017, before Judge Gold. Court Transcriber: Transcription Plus II. Email address: laferrara44@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 9/28/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/9/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/6/2017. (Rocco, Christine) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order 85 ORDER denying the defendant's motion to dismiss and denying as moot the plaintiffs' cross-motion to transfer. Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 9/7/2017. (Kessler, Stanley) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
September 6, 2017 84 NOTICE by AlmondNet, Inc., Datonics, LLC, Intent IQ, LLC re #82 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Motion Hearing, [Proposed] Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Crosby, Ian) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
September 1, 2017 83 Minute Entry: Status Conference held on 9/1/2017 before Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Crosby for plaintiffs; Verhoeven, Curran and McKee for defendant. Discovery and case management issues discussed on the record. Decision on Yahoo's motion to compel disclosure of plaintiffs' validity contentions taken under advisement. The parties are urged to continue their efforts to resolve or narrow this dispute. The Court will grant any reasonable joint application to adjust the existing case management schedule to accommodate any agreement reached. To the extent plaintiffs are concerned with the expense of providing the information sought by defendant, the Court suggests the parties consider whether awaiting the PTAB's decision on whether to review all or some of the matters the parties have raised might be more efficient than proceeding to litigate them in this action simultaneously. COUNSEL WILL SUBMIT A LETTER REPORT ON THE STATUS OF THEIR EFFORTS TO RESOLVE THE PENDING DISCOVERY DISPUTE BY SEPTEMBER 11, 2017. (FTR Log #1:10-1:45.) (Gillespie, Saudia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
September 1, 2017 82 Minute Order. for proceedings held before Judge I. Leo Glasser on 9/1/2017: Counsel for all parties present. Defendants motion to dismiss #70 is argued. The motion is denied for the reasons stated on the record. Plaintiffs counsel is to submit an order. (Court Reporter Angela Grant.) (Kessler, Stanley) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
August 30, 2017 81 Letter AlmondNet Response to Yahoos Letter (Dkt. 80), by AlmondNet, Inc., Datonics, LLC, Intent IQ, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Crosby, Ian) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
August 30, 2017 80 Letter Regarding Plaintiffs' August 28, 2017 Letter (Dkt. 78) by Yahoo! Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Curran, Patrick) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
August 29, 2017 79 Letter Regarding Supplemental Authority in Relation to Yahoos Pending Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. No. 70) by AlmondNet, Inc., Datonics, LLC, Intent IQ, LLC (Crosby, Ian) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
August 28, 2017 78 Letter Response to Yahoo! Inc.'s Letter re Discovery Dispute by AlmondNet, Inc., Datonics, LLC, Intent IQ, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Crosby, Ian) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
August 28, 2017 77 Letter Regarding Supplemental Authority in Support of Yahoo's Motion to Dismiss by Yahoo! Inc. (Curran, Patrick) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
August 25, 2017 76 NOTICE by AlmondNet, Inc., Datonics, LLC, Intent IQ, LLC PARTIES JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT UNDER PATENT RULE 4-3 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Crosby, Ian) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
August 24, 2017 75 Letter Regarding Discovery Dispute Pursuant to August 22 Scheduling Order by Yahoo! Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Curran, Patrick) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: On consent of all parties, the status conference previously scheduled for September 8, 2017, will now be held on September 1, 2017, at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 13D South before the undersigned. If the oral argument before Senior United States District Judge I. Leo Glasser concludes after 1:00 p.m., the status conference will commence immediately thereafter. Counsel shall be prepared to report on whether they have met the proposed deadline for completion of claim construction discovery and shall raise any discovery disputes they seek to address at the conference by letter dated no later than August 24, with responses to be filed no later than August 28. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 8/22/2017. (Kaufman, Zachary) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
July 17, 2017 74 REPLY in Support of Conditional Cross-Motion to Transfer Venue filed by All Plaintiffs. (Hoffman, Louis) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
July 12, 2017 73 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Yahoo! Inc. (Curran, Patrick) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
July 10, 2017 72 REPLY in Support re #70 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Conditional Cross-Motion to Transfer filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Curran, Patrick) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
June 26, 2017 71 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #70 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue and Conditional Cross-Motion to Transfer Venue filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Opposition, #2 Proposed Order) (Hoffman, Louis) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
June 12, 2017 70 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of David Brightman) (Curran, Patrick) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER: The scheduling order filed as docket entry 69-1 is entered as an Order of the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 6/12/2017. (Gillespie, Saudia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
June 9, 2017 69 Proposed Scheduling Order (Agreed) by AlmondNet, Inc., Datonics, LLC, Intent IQ, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Crosby, Ian) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
April 6, 2017 68 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) against Yahoo! Inc., filed by AlmondNet, Inc., Intent IQ, LLC, Datonics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit B-1, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit D-1, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit I-1, #14 Exhibit J, #15 Exhibit K) (Hoffman, Louis) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
April 6, 2017 67 NOTICE by AlmondNet, Inc., Datonics, LLC, Intent IQ, LLC of Service of Patent Rule 3-1 and 3-2 Disclosures (Hoffman, Louis) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER finding as moot #48 Motion for Discovery in light of subsequent proceedings in the case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 3/21/2017. (Gold, Steven) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #66 Motion to Adjourn Conference and adopting the proposed case management order submitted by the parties jointly as Docket Entry 66-1. THE CONFERENCE PREVIOUSLY SET FOR MARCH 27, 2017 IS CANCELED. THE COURT WILL HOLD A CONFERENCE AT 11:00 AM ON SEPTEMBER 8, 2017. Counsel shall be prepared to report on whether they have met the proposed deadline for completion of claim construction discovery and shall raise any discovery disputes they seek to address at the conference by letter dated no later than August 25, with responses to be filed no later than August 31. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 3/21/2017. (Gold, Steven) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
March 20, 2017 66 Joint MOTION to Adjourn Conference and Enter Agreed Order on Procedure by AlmondNet, Inc., Datonics, LLC, Intent IQ, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Certain Scheduling, Rules, and Amendment Issues) (Hoffman, Louis) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: An in person status conference will be held at 11:30 a.m. on March 27, 2017 before the undersigned in Courtroom 13-D South. Counsel for all parties must attend. Counsel for plaintiff is directed to immediately confirm this conference date and time with defendant's counsel. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 3/13/2017. (Gillespie, Saudia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
March 9, 2017 65 NOTICE by AlmondNet, Inc., Datonics, LLC, Intent IQ, LLC JOINT NOTICE OF MEDIATION (Crosby, Ian) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER: #59 Motion for Protective Order is terminated per Order dated 02/03/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 2/15/2017. (Gillespie, Saudia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER: The conference previously scheduled for February 15, 2017 is hereby cancelled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 2/13/2017. (Gillespie, Saudia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER re #64 Letter filed by Yahoo! Inc. : The protective order jointly proposed by the parties and submitted as Docket Entry 64-1 is hereby approved and entered as an Order of the Court, with the following modification: The wording of paragraph 16 suggests that DESIGNATED MATERIAL submitted to the Court will be physically filed in hard copy and sealed by the Clerk of Court. The parties are directed that, instead, DESIGNATED MATERIAL they seek to submit to the Court shall be filed electronically pursuant to the Court's procedures for ECF filing UNDER SEAL, and that no hard copies of DESIGNATED MATERIAL shall be submitted for filing without first seeking and obtaining leave of the Court. Counsel are expected, of course, to comply with any chambers practices requesting courtesy copies. In addition, the provision in paragraph 16 that counsel will publicly file versions of documents filed under seal with disclosures of DESIGNATED MATERIAL redacted remains in force. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 2/3/2017. (Gold, Steven) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER: The parties having reported that the language of a protective order has been agreed to, Docket Entry 64, the status conference scheduled for tomorrow, February 3rd, is hereby cancelled. The Court will review the proposed order and advise counsel if it has any specific questions. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 2/2/2017. (Kaufman, Zachary) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
February 2, 2017 64 Letter regarding Protective Order by Yahoo! Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - [Proposed] Protective Order) (Curran, Patrick) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: The status conference scheduled for tomorrow, February 2, 2017, at 4:00 p.m. is adjourned and will now be held on Friday, February 3rd, at 12:00 p.m. in Courtroom 13D South before the undersigned. If the dispute can be distilled to a limited number of issues that can be discussed productively by telephone, the parties may submit a JOINT application, no later than 6:00 p.m. tomorrow, identifying the remaining issues to be discussed, submitting alternative language proposed by the respective parties, and requesting that the conference be held over the telephone. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 2/1/2017. (Kaufman, Zachary) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
February 1, 2017 63 Letter to Hon. Steven M. Gold by AlmondNet, Inc. (Hatch-Miller, Mark) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
February 1, 2017 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Howard Hatch-Miller on behalf of AlmondNet, Inc., Datonics, LLC, Intent IQ, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Hatch-Miller, Mark) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER: If counselor is available, the Court would prefer to hold the conference at 3:00 pm instead of the scheduled time of 4:00 pm. Counsel shall confer and submit a letter indicating their availability and describing any progress they have made narrowing their dispute. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 2/1/2017. (Gillespie, Saudia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
January 31, 2017 61 RESPONSE to Motion re #59 MOTION for Protective Order and to Reschedule Hearing (Expedited) filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M) (Curran, Patrick) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
January 30, 2017 60 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on January 11, 2017, before Judge Gold. Court Reporter/Transcriber TypeWrite Word Processing Service, Telephone number 718-966-1401. Email address: transcripts@typewp.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 2/20/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/2/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/1/2017. (Hong, Loan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court will hold an in-person conference addressing AlmondNet's motion dated January 27, 2017, Docket Entry #59 , concerning the parties' dispute over the terms of a confidentiality order, at 4:00 pm on February 2, 2017, in Courtroom 13D South before the undersigned. Counsel shall appear with electronic devices with the two competing drafts, and any compromise drafts, accessible for editing so that a final document may be created during the conference. Yahoo!'s response to AlmondNet's January 27 letter shall be filed no later than 6:00 p.m. on January 31, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 1/30/2017. (Kaufman, Zachary) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
January 27, 2017 59 MOTION for Protective Order and to Reschedule Hearing (Expedited) by AlmondNet, Inc., Datonics, LLC, Intent IQ, LLC. (Hoffman, Louis) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
January 24, 2017 58 Letter (Joint) Regarding Scheduling by Yahoo! Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (Curran, Patrick) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
January 20, 2017 57 Minute Entry: Telephone Conference held on 1/20/2017 before Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Crosby for plaintiff, Curran for defendant. BECAUSE THE PARTIES REPORT THAT THEY HAVE DECIDED TO PURSUE PRIVATE MEDIATION, THE REFERENCE TO COURT-ANNEXED MEDIATION IS WITHDRAWN. The parties will submit a proposed order setting forth the agreements described on the record of today's proceeding by January 24. The parties will also submit a copy of the E.D. Tex. Patent Rules, which they have agreed to follow in this case. THE COURT WILL HOLD A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE AT 4:00 PM ON FEBRUARY 15, 2017. The purpose of the conference will be to resolve any disputes over the protective order the parties anticipate presenting for court approval, and for the parties to report on their progress moving forward with mediation. Counsel for plaintiff will arrange the conference call. (Tape #5:01-5:17.) (Gillespie, Saudia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
January 20, 2017 56 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Yahoo! Inc. (Curran, Patrick) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
January 20, 2017 55 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Yahoo! Inc.. (Curran, Patrick) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
January 11, 2017 54 Minute Entry: Status Conference held on 1/11/2017 before Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Crosby and Hoffman for plaintiffs, Verhoeven, McKee, and Curran for defendant. Motion for stay of discovery pending CBM review before the PTAB as well as possibility of engaging in court-annexed mediation discussed. Decision reserved. THIS CASE IS HEREBY REFERRED TO COURT-ANNEXED MEDIATION. In the event the parties wish to hire a private mediator instead, they shall inform the Court forthwith of their intentions to do so. Counsel shall confer and determine among themselves which judicial district's set of rules will govern case management and jointly prepare a proposed case management schedule in conformity therewith. THE COURT WILL HOLD A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE AT 5:00 P.M. ON JANUARY 20, 2017; counsel shall provide the Court with forty-eight hours' notice if they wish to convert the telephone conference to a video conference. Counsel will file a joint letter by January 18, 2017, reporting on (i) whether defendant intends to pursue CBM review, and if so, how soon they intend to proceed with those efforts, and (ii) whether they have elected to follow the local patent rules of a particular district which require more detailed disclosures, and if they have, they shall also provide the Court with a proposed case management schedule. (Tape #3:03-3:44.) (Gillespie, Saudia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
January 11, 2017 53 Letter Reply to Letter Opposing Stay by Yahoo! Inc. (Curran, Patrick) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
January 9, 2017 52 RESPONSE to Motion re #48 Letter MOTION for Discovery (to remedy Yahoos lack of compliance with Local Patent Rule 7) filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I) (Curran, Patrick) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
January 6, 2017 51 Letter Opposing Stay by AlmondNet, Inc., Datonics, LLC, Intent IQ, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Hoffman, Louis) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Joint Motion for Entry of Order Regarding E-Discovery, Docket Entry #50 , is granted, and the proposed order filed as Docket Entry 50-1 is hereby entered as an Order of the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 1/6/2017. (Gillespie, Saudia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
January 5, 2017 50 Joint MOTION for Discovery Order Regarding E-Discovery by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order Regarding E-Discovery) (Curran, Patrick) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER: Yahoo's #49 application to extend its time to respond to plaintiffs' letter motion to January 9, 2017 is granted. If plaintiffs seek a brief adjournment of the conference set for January 11, 2017, they may submit a letter application after attempting to agree on mutually convenient dates with defendant. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 12/29/2016. (Gillespie, Saudia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
December 28, 2016 49 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #48 Letter MOTION for Discovery (to remedy Yahoos lack of compliance with Local Patent Rule 7) by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Curran, Patrick) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
December 28, 2016 48 Letter MOTION for Discovery (to remedy Yahoos lack of compliance with Local Patent Rule 7) by AlmondNet, Inc., Datonics, LLC, Intent IQ, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Hoffman, Louis) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER: #47 Stipulation for Service by Electronic Means is hereby approved. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 12/27/2016. (Gillespie, Saudia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
December 23, 2016 47 STIPULATION for Service by Electronic Means by Yahoo! Inc. (Curran, Patrick) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order 46 ORDER, withdrawing #22 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by deft. Yahoo! Inc.. Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 12/16/2016. (Layne, Monique) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
December 16, 2016 45 Letter re Court's Order of November 1, 2016 by Yahoo! Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Curran, Patrick) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
December 16, 2016 44 Letter re Courts Order of November 1, 2016 by AlmondNet, Inc., Datonics, LLC, Intent IQ, LLC (Crosby, Ian) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
December 13, 2016 43 NOTICE by Yahoo! Inc. re #22 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss (Curran, Patrick) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER: #42 Motion to Adjourn Conference is hereby GRANTED. The previously scheduled status Conference set for December 21, 2016 is adjourned to JANUARY 11, 2017 AT 3:00 PM in Courtroom 13D South before the undersigned. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 12/5/2016. (Gillespie, Saudia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
December 5, 2016 42 Joint MOTION to Adjourn Conference by AlmondNet, Inc., Datonics, LLC, Intent IQ, LLC. (Crosby, Ian) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: An in person status conference is set for December 21, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 13D South before the undersigned. The parties will submit an updated joint letter to the Court reporting on the status of the Rule 12 motion by December 16. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 11/1/2016. (Gillespie, Saudia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
October 28, 2016 41 NOTICE by AlmondNet, Inc., Datonics, LLC, Intent IQ, LLC of Service of Patent Rule 6 Disclosures (Hoffman, Louis) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
October 28, 2016 40 Letter (Joint) Reporting on Status of Rule 12 Motion and Proposing Next Steps by AlmondNet, Inc., Datonics, LLC, Intent IQ, LLC (Hoffman, Louis) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER: #39 Motion for Extension of Time to File is GRANTED. The parties will submit a joint letter to the Court by October 28, 2016, reporting on the status of their efforts to resolve the pending rule 12 motion and proposing next steps to be taken in the litigation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 10/24/2016. (Gillespie, Saudia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
October 21, 2016 39 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Letter by Yahoo! Inc.. (Curran, Patrick) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
October 11, 2016 38 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on September 29, 2016, before Judge Gold. Court Transcriber: TypeWrite Word Processing Service, Telephone number 718-966-1401. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 11/1/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/11/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/9/2017. (Rocco, Christine) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
September 30, 2016 36 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge I. Leo Glasser on 9/29/2016: Counsel for all parties present. Defendants motion to dismiss is argued. Counsel will meet with Magistrate Judge Gold today to determine whether the motion can be resolved by the parties. (Court Reporter Stacy Mace.) (Kessler, Stanley) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
September 29, 2016 37 Minute Entry: Initial Conference Hearing held on 9/29/2016 before Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Crosby and Hoffman for plaintiffs, Verhoeven, McKee and Curran for defendant. Claims and defenses informally discussed. Counsel will confer with respect to case management generally and whether plaintiffs are able to offer sufficient specificity about their causes of action to induce defendant to withdraw its pending motion to dismiss. THE PARTIES WILL SUBMIT A JOINT LETTER TO THE COURT BY OCTOBER 22, 2016, REPORTING ON THE STATUS OF THEIR EFFORTS TOR RESOLVE THE PENDING RULE 12 MOTION AND PROPOSING NEXT STEPS TO BE TAKEN IN THE LITIGATION. (Tape #3:27-4:31.) (Gillespie, Saudia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
September 27, 2016 35 Letter re Notice Regarding Initial Scheduling Conference by AlmondNet, Inc., Datonics, LLC, Intent IQ, LLC (Crosby, Ian) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: The initial conference previously scheduled for September 27, 2016 at 11:00 a.m. is adjourned to September 29, 2016 at 3:30 p.m. in Courtroom 13D South before the undersigned. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 9/1/2016. (Gillespie, Saudia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
August 18, 2016 34 REPLY to Response to Motion re #22 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Curran, Patrick) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER: #33 Motion to Adjourn Initial Conference is GRANTED. The Initial Conference previously scheduled for 8/23/2016 is adjourned for 9/27/2016 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 13D South before the undersigned. Counsel are reminded to comply with the Court Order and Chambers Individual Rules attached in docket entry #19 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 8/17/2016. (Gillespie, Saudia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
August 17, 2016 33 Joint MOTION to Adjourn Conference by AlmondNet, Inc.. (Crosby, Ian) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
August 17, 2016 32 Joint MOTION to Adjourn Conference Joint Letter Motion for Adjournment of Initial Conference by AlmondNet, Inc., Datonics, LLC, Intent IQ, LLC. (Crosby, Ian) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
August 12, 2016 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Kash on behalf of Yahoo! Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Kash, Jennifer) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order 30 ORDER, granting #28 MOTION for admitted attorney Jennifer A. Kash, Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 8/12/2016. (Layne, Monique) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #28 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at the NYEDs homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 8/12/2016. (Faubion, Maxwell) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
August 11, 2016 29 DECLARATION re #28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jennifer A. Kash Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-8833330. Jennifer A. Kash by Yahoo! Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Kash, Jennifer) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
August 11, 2016 28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jennifer A. Kash Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-8833330. by Yahoo! Inc.. (Kash, Jennifer) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
August 4, 2016 27 NOTICE of Change of Address by Louis James Hoffman (Hoffman, Louis) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
August 4, 2016 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by All Plaintiffs. (Hoffman, Louis) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
July 14, 2016 25 NOTICE of Appearance by John T. McKee on behalf of Yahoo! Inc. (aty to be noticed) (McKee, John) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order 24 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Plaintiffs may respond to the Defendant's motion to dismiss #22 on or before August 4, 2016. The Defendant may reply on or before August 18, 2016. Oral argument will be held on September 26, 2016 at 10:00 a.m.. Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 7/14/2016. (Shamah, Adam) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
July 11, 2016 23 MEMORANDUM in Support re #22 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Curran, Patrick) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
July 11, 2016 22 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Yahoo! Inc.. (Curran, Patrick) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
July 7, 2016 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick D. Curran on behalf of Yahoo! Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Curran, Patrick) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
July 7, 2016 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles K. Verhoeven on behalf of Yahoo! Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Verhoeven, Charles) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 8/23/2016 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 13D South before Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Counsel are directed to refer to and comply with the attached order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 6/23/2016. (Attachments: #1 CHAMBERS INDIVIDUAL RULES) (Richardson, Jacqueline) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at the NYEDs homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 6/23/2016. (Collins, Anne) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
June 22, 2016 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-8706724. by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration ISO of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing) (Mack, Brian) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
June 10, 2016 17 NOTICE of Change of Address by William Christopher Carmody , Susman Godfrey L.L.P. (Carmody, William) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,Defendant Yahoo! Inc. shall have until July 11, 2016 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 5/25/2016. (Richardson, Jacqueline) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
May 24, 2016 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by AlmondNet, Inc., Datonics, LLC, Intent IQ, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Crosby, Ian) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
May 17, 2016 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis James Hoffman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Hoffman, Louis) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
May 9, 2016 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AlmondNet, Inc., Intent IQ, LLC, Datonics, LLC. Yahoo! Inc. served on 5/5/2016, answer due 5/26/2016. (Crosby, Ian) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at the NYEDs homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 5/4/2016. (Gold, Steven) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
May 2, 2016 13 FILING FEE: $ 150.00, receipt number 4653101284 re #12 PHV Motion. (Layne, Monique) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
May 2, 2016 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Louis J. Hoffman, to argue or try this case as counsel for Plaintiffs AlmondNet, Inc., Datonics, LLC, Intent IQ, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Decl. In Support, #2 Certficate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Layne, Monique). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/4/2016: #4 Fee Paid) (Layne, Monique). [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
April 28, 2016 11 NOTICE by AlmondNet, Inc., Datonics, LLC, Intent IQ, LLC PLAINTIFFS' CERTIFICATION OF DAMAGES IN EXCESS OF $150,000 (Crosby, Ian) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
April 7, 2016 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian B. Crosby on behalf of AlmondNet, Inc., Datonics, LLC, Intent IQ, LLC (notification declined or already on case) (Crosby, Ian) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
April 7, 2016 Opinion or Order 9 ORDER, granting admitted attorney Ian B. Crosby's #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice in whole or part as counsel for plaintiffs. Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 4/7/2016. (Layne, Monique) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/7/2016: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Layne, Monique). [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave for Ian B. Crosby to Appear Pro Hac Vice for plaintiffs. If not already done, the attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at the NYEDs homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 4/6/2016. (Vasquez, Lea) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
April 6, 2016 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ian B. Crosby Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-8511596. by AlmondNet, Inc., Datonics, LLC, Intent IQ, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Good Standing) (Crosby, Ian) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
April 5, 2016 7 #6 Application for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. Approved by August Marziliano, Operations Manager on 4/5/2016. (Marziliano, August) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
April 4, 2016 6 MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically of $400 for filing of the Complaint by AlmondNet, Inc., Datonics, LLC, Intent IQ, LLC. (Carmody, William) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
March 31, 2016 5 Notice of Report on the filing of an action regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit A-1, #4 Exhibit b, #5 Exhibit B1, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit D 1, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit H, #13 Exhibit I, #14 Exhibit I 1, #15 Exhibit J) (Rocco, Christine) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
March 31, 2016 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
March 31, 2016 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
March 30, 2016 This is a patent case and is eligible for the Patent Pilot Project. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
March 30, 2016 2 Summons Issued as to Yahoo! Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
March 30, 2016 1 COMPLAINT against Yahoo! Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-8493274 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by AlmondNet, Inc., Intent IQ, LLC, Datonics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit A-1, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit B-1, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit D-1, #10 Exhibit E, #11 Exhibit F, #12 Exhibit G, #13 Exhibit H, #14 Exhibit I, #15 Exhibit I-1, #16 Exhibit J) (Carmody, William) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AlmondNet, Inc. et al v. Yahoo! Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yahoo Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Datonics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Intent IQ, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: AlmondNet, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?