Dale Progress Ltd. v. Nissan North America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dale Progress Ltd.
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00259
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Filing 10 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,320,461 B2; US 9,686,504 B2. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal)(nms)
March 27, 2019 CASE CLOSED per D.I. #9 . (nms)
March 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dale Progress Ltd. as to Nissan North America, Inc. (Devlin, Timothy)
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 First AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Nissan North America, Inc. - filed by Dale Progress Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Devlin, Timothy) Modified on 2/26/2019 (nms).
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to April 1, 2019 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Nissan North America, Inc. answer due 4/1/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/19/2019. (nms)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to April 1, 2019 - filed by Dale Progress Ltd.. (Devlin, Timothy)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Dale Progress Ltd.. (Devlin, Timothy)
February 13, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00253-RGA through 1:19-cv-00261-RGA (rjb)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dale Progress Ltd.. Nissan North America, Inc. served on 2/8/2019, answer due 3/1/2019. (Devlin, Timothy)
February 7, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Nissan North America, Inc. on 2/7/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (ceg)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,320,461 B2; US 9,686,504 B2. (ceg)
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ceg)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Nissan North America, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2564345.) - filed by Dale Progress Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ceg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dale Progress Ltd. v. Nissan North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Progress Ltd.
Represented By: Timothy Devlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?