In re: Jami Lechel Phillips
Appellant: Jami Lechel Phillips
Appellee: Michael B. Joseph
Case Number: 1:2019cv00287
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Remark: Case assignment and TPO re-mailed to appellant at updated address. (nmg)
March 18, 2019 Address updated per: #3 Notice of Appeal to the Third Circuit (nmg)
March 14, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Undeliverable Mail sent to Jami Lechel Phillips. (ceg)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Undeliverable Mail sent to Jami Lechel Phillips. (nmg)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Third Circuit re #3 Notice of Appeal to the Third Circuit filed by Jami Lechel Phillips. USCA Case Number 19-1420. USCA Case Manager: Pamela (DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND CAN ONLY BE VIEWED BY COURT STAFF) (pb, )
February 25, 2019 Remark: TPO mailed to Appellant at P.O. Box 769, Felton, DE 19934. (nmg)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Third Circuit as to D.I. #1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order. Appeal filed by Jami Lechel Phillips. (No Fee Paid, No IFP) (nmg) Modified on 2/25/2019 (nmg).
February 13, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (lak)
February 11, 2019 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (lak)
February 11, 2019 NO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED (lak)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on 1/29/2019 by The Honorable Brendan Linehan Shannon in Bankruptcy case number 19-10094 (BLS). Fee Status not paid. - filed by Jami Lechel Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal) (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Jami Lechel Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Jami Lechel Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Michael B. Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?