Riveria v. State Of Delaware et al

Petitioner: Efrain Riveria
Respondent: Kathleen Jennings and State Of Delaware
Case Number: 1:2019cv00289
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 5 Trust Fund Account Statement - filed by Efrain Riveria (ceg)
March 11, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Efrain Riveria. (ceg)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, Part 1 filed by Efrain Riveria. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/19/2019. (ddp)
February 13, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sar)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - filed by Efrain Riveria. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(NO FEE PAID, NO IFP)(sar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riveria v. State Of Delaware et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kathleen Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State Of Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Efrain Riveria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?