OI European Group B.V. v. Bolivarian Republic of Venezuela et al
Plaintiff: OI European Group B.V.
Defendant: Bolivarian Republic of Venezuela, CITGO Holding, Inc., Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A., PDV Holding, Inc., Rosneft Trading, S.A., GLAS Americas LLC, Eulogio Del Pino, Maria Del Carmen Martinez, Citgo Petroleum Corporation, Anton Castillo, MUFG Union Bank, N.A., Orlando Chacin and Jesus Luongo
Case Number: 1:2019cv00290
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION to Stay filed by CITGO Holding, Inc., Citgo Petroleum Corporation, PDV Holding, Inc.. (Nachbar, Kenneth)
April 1, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #19 MOTION to Stay - Opposition filed by OI European Group B.V.. (Barillare, Jody)
March 22, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Bolivarian Republic of Venezuela on 3/22/2019; Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A. on 3/22/2019; Rosneft Trading, S.A. on 3/22/2019. (sar)
March 18, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Stay - filed by CITGO Holding, Inc., Citgo Petroleum Corporation, PDV Holding, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 7.1.1 Certification)(Nachbar, Kenneth)
March 14, 2019 Filing 18 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Owens-Illinois, Inc. for OI European Group B.V. filed by OI European Group B.V.. (Barillare, Jody)
March 11, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney John C. Goodchild for OI European Group B.V. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ddp)
March 11, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Nathan P. Eimer and Lisa S. Meyer for CITGO Holding, Inc., Citgo Petroleum Corporation and PDV Holding, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ddp)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Nathan P. Eimer and Lisa S. Meyer filed by CITGO Holding, Inc., Citgo Petroleum Corporation, PDV Holding, Inc., Citgo Holding, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/11/19. (ntl)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #17 STIPULATION For Adjournment of Answer Date for Defendants PDV Holding, Inc., CITGO Holding, Inc., and CITIGO Petroleum Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/11/19. (ntl)
March 7, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION For Adjournment of Answer Date for Defendants PDV Holding, Inc., CITGO Holding, Inc., and CITIGO Petroleum Corporation re #1 Complaint, by CITGO Holding, Inc., Citgo Petroleum Corporation, PDV Holding, Inc.. (Cumings, Alexandra)
March 6, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Nathan P. Eimer and Lisa S. Meyer - filed by CITGO Holding, Inc., Citgo Petroleum Corporation, PDV Holding, Inc.. (Cumings, Alexandra)
March 6, 2019 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A. for PDV Holding, Inc. filed by PDV Holding, Inc.. (Cumings, Alexandra)
March 6, 2019 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A., Corporate Parent PDV Holding, Inc., Corporate Parent Citgo Holding, Inc. for Citgo Petroleum Corporation filed by Citgo Petroleum Corporation. (Cumings, Alexandra)
March 6, 2019 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A., Corporate Parent PDV Holding, Inc. for CITGO Holding, Inc. filed by CITGO Holding, Inc.. (Cumings, Alexandra)
March 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra M. Cumings on behalf of CITGO Holding, Inc., Citgo Petroleum Corporation, PDV Holding, Inc. (Cumings, Alexandra)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney P. Sabin Willett, John C. Goodchild, III, Christopher L. Carter, and Arcangelo S. Cella filed by OI European Group B.V. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/5/19. (ntl)
March 4, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney P. Sabin Willett, John C. Goodchild, III, Christopher L. Carter, and Arcangelo S. Cella - filed by OI European Group B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of P. Sabin Willett, #2 Certification of John C. Goodchild, III, #3 Certification of Christopher L. Carter, #4 Certification of Arcangelo S. Cella)(Barillare, Jody)
February 19, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OI European Group B.V.. PDV Holding, Inc. served on 2/19/2019, answer due 3/12/2019. (Barillare, Jody)
February 19, 2019 Summons Reissued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to PDV Holding, Inc. (nmg)
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OI European Group B.V.. Eulogio Del Pino served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Barillare, Jody)
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OI European Group B.V.. Maria Del Carmen Martinez served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Barillare, Jody)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OI European Group B.V.. Anton Castillo served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Barillare, Jody)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OI European Group B.V.. Orlando Chacin served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Barillare, Jody)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OI European Group B.V.. Jesus Luongo served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Barillare, Jody)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OI European Group B.V.. Citgo Petroleum Corporation served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Barillare, Jody)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OI European Group B.V.. CITGO Holding, Inc. served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Barillare, Jody)
February 14, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to CITGO Holding, Inc. on 2/14/2019; Anton Castillo on 2/14/2019; Orlando Chacin on 2/14/2019; Citgo Petroleum Corporation on 2/14/2019; Eulogio Del Pino on 2/14/2019; GLAS Americas LLC on 2/14/2019; Jesus Luongo on 2/14/2019; Maria Del Carmen Martinez on 2/14/2019; PDV Holding, Inc. on 2/14/2019. (2 copies each of each Summons) (lak)
February 13, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
February 11, 2019 No Summons Issued. (nmg)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Bolivarian Republic of Venezuela, CITGO Holding, Inc., Anton Castillo, Orlando Chacin, Citgo Petroleum Corporation, Eulogio Del Pino, GLAS Americas LLC, Jesus Luongo, MUFG Union Bank, N.A., Maria Del Carmen Martinez, PDV Holding, Inc., Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A., Rosneft Trading, S.A. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2567228.) - filed by OI European Group B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OI European Group B.V. v. Bolivarian Republic of Venezuela et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bolivarian Republic of Venezuela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITGO Holding, Inc.
Represented By: Lisa S. Meyer
Represented By: Nathan P. Eimer
Represented By: Kenneth J. Nachbar
Represented By: Alexandra M. Cumings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PDV Holding, Inc.
Represented By: Lisa S. Meyer
Represented By: Nathan P. Eimer
Represented By: Kenneth J. Nachbar
Represented By: Alexandra M. Cumings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosneft Trading, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLAS Americas LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eulogio Del Pino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Del Carmen Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citgo Petroleum Corporation
Represented By: Lisa S. Meyer
Represented By: Nathan P. Eimer
Represented By: Kenneth J. Nachbar
Represented By: Alexandra M. Cumings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anton Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUFG Union Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orlando Chacin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesus Luongo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OI European Group B.V.
Represented By: Jody Barillare
Represented By: John C. Goodchild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?