Biogen International GmbH v. Accord Healthcare Inc.
Plaintiff: Biogen International GmbH
Defendant: Accord Healthcare Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00303
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Case associated with lead case: Create association to 1:17-cv-00823-LPS and all papers shall be filed in 17-823-LPS. (ntl)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATED Order Regarding Personal Jurisdiction, Venue, Consolidation of Actions, and Stay of Action filed by Biogen International GmbH -- Case Stayed. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/25/19. (ntl)
February 21, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00303-UNA, 1:19-cv-00333-UNA(bkb)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION and Order Regarding Personal Jurisdiction, Venue, Consolidation of Actions, and Stay of Action, filed by Biogen International GmbH. (ceg)
February 12, 2019 No Summons Issued. (ceg)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Biogen Inc., Corporate Parent Biogen MA Inc., Corporate Parent Biogen Luxembourg Holding Sarl, Corporate Parent Biogen Switzerland Holdings GmbH for Biogen International GmbH filed by Biogen International GmbH. (ceg)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,619,001. (ceg)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 12/31/2019. Date of Expiration of Patent: 6/20/2020.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 9/27/2020. (ceg)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ceg)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Accord Healthcare Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2568879.) - filed by Biogen International GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (ceg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Biogen International GmbH v. Accord Healthcare Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Biogen International GmbH
Represented By: Steven J. Balick
Represented By: Andrew Colin Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accord Healthcare Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?