In Re: LTC Holdings, Inc., et al
Debtor: LTC Holdings, Inc., et al.
Appellant: Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania
Appellee: Alfred Thomas Giuliano and BMO Harris Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00327
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORAL ORDER Setting Teleconference: A Telephone Conference is set for 6/5/2029 at 8:30 AM Eastern Time before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. Counsel for Appellee to initiate the call. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 4/2/19. (cak)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORAL ORDER Setting Teleconference: Pursuant to this Courts Standing Order dated September 11, 2012, regarding procedures to govern mediation of all appeals from the Bankruptcy Court under to 28 U.S.C. 158; IT IS ORDERED that a teleconference has been scheduled for Tuesday, April 2, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. Eastern Time with Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge related to the screening process for mediation. Counsel for the appellant shall initiate the teleconference call. Local counsel are reminded of their obligations to inform out-of-state counsel of this Order. To avoid the imposition of sanctions, counsel shall advise the Court immediately of any problems regarding compliance with this Order. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge 3/29/19. (cak)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew Kent, Esquire filed by Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/15/2019. (dlw)
March 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew Kent, Esquire - filed by Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania. (Wilcox, Scott)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Statement of Issues to be Presented and Designation of Record on Appeal by Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wilcox, Scott)
February 21, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (bkb)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 ORAL ORDER: Pursuant to this Court's Standing Order dated September 11, 2012, regarding procedures to govern mediation of all appeals from the Bankruptcy Court which places such appeals in mandatory mediation; IT IS ORDERED that on or before 4:00 p.m., Tuesday, March 5, 2019, the parties shall advise in a joint written submission, no longer than three (3) pages in 12 point font, directed to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, their respective positions regarding mediation and reasoning for their positions, including whether the parties were previously or are presently involved in mediation or other ADR process. Should the parties jointly request the matter be removed from the mandatory mediation requirement, they are to provide a proposed briefing schedule and/or advise whether they feel a teleconference with a Magistrate Judge would be of assistance and why. This submission shall not be docketed, but shall be delivered to the Clerks Office of the District Court. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 2/19/19. (cak)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (nmg)
February 15, 2019 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (nmg)
February 15, 2019 NO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED (nmg)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on 2/4/2019 by Chief Judge Christopher S. Sontchi in Bankruptcy case number 14-11111 CSS. Fee Status Paid.- filed by Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Order on Appeal, #2 Opinion on Appeal, #3 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: LTC Holdings, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: LTC Holdings, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Scott G. Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Alfred Thomas Giuliano
Represented By: Seth Andrew Niederman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BMO Harris Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Richard M. Beck, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?