Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. v. Lupin Limited et al
Plaintiff: Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
Defendant: Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Lupin Limited
Case Number: 1:2019cv00347
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William R. Zimmerman, Jonathan E. Bachand and Andrea L. Cheek, filed by Lupin Limited, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/12/2019. (nms)
March 11, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William R. Zimmerman, Jonathan E. Bachand and Andrea L. Cheek - filed by Lupin Limited, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Ewing, Alexandra)
March 8, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Anthony H. Sheh for Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00310-RGA et al.(ceg)
March 8, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Anthony H. Sheh for Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00310-RGA et al.(ddp)
March 7, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jingyuan Luo for Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00310-RGA et al.(ceg)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to April 22, 2019 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Lupin Limited answer due 4/22/2019; Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. answer due 4/22/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/27/2019. (nms)
February 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick L. Cottrell, III on behalf of Lupin Limited, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Cottrell, Frederick)
February 27, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to April 22, 2019 - filed by Lupin Limited, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Ewing, Alexandra)
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 2/21/2019, answer due 3/14/2019. (Silver, Daniel)
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Mailing regarding service on Lupin Limited made on February 21, 2019, by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B)(Silver, Daniel) Modified on 2/25/2019 (nms).
February 25, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The declaration at D.I. 7 and the summons at D.I. 8 have been removed from the docket per counsel's request as they contained errors. Counsel will refile. (nms)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (6 in 19-cv-321-RGA, 6 in 19-cv-318-RGA, 6 in 19-cv-312-RGA, 6 in 19-cv-314-RGA, 6 in 19-cv-310-RGA, 6 in 19-cv-316-RGA, 6 in 19-cv-313-RGA, 6 in 19-cv-320-RGA, 6 in 19-cv-347-RGA, 6 in 1:19-cv-00319-RGA, 6 in 19-cv-317-RGA, 6 in 19-cv-311-RGA, 6 in 19-cv-315-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bruce R. Genderson, Jessamyn S. Berniker, Stanley E. Fisher, Shaun P. Mahaffy, Anthony H. Sheh, and Jinyuan Luo, filed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/22/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00310-RGA et al.(nms)
February 21, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00310-UNA et al.(bkb)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bruce R. Genderson, Jessamyn S. Berniker, Stanley E. Fisher, Shaun P. Mahaffy, Anthony H. Sheh, and Jingyuan Luo - filed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Certifications)(Silver, Daniel) Modified on 2/22/2019 (nms).
February 19, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Lupin Limited on 2/19/2019; Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. on 2/19/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (lak)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Merck & Co., Inc. for Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. filed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (lak)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,326,708. (lak)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: No earlier than 2/14/2019. Date of Expiration of Patent: 11/24/2026.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: No earlier than 8/14/2021. (lak)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - filed against Lupin Limited, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2573326.) - filed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. v. Lupin Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Limited
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Anthony H. Sheh
Represented By: Jingyuan Luo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?